See fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This artificially created sub-series MPE B.9 consists of memos, letters to secretaries of locals, questionnaires, general correspondence, and responses. See Box level entries for B.9 for detailed contents of records.
This box contains correspondence to the secretaries of locals, memorandums, resolutions, questionnaires and general corresponce. The records include the following:
1. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals June 30 1924 – July 16 1929
2. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals July 19 1929 – Sept 28 1931
3a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Oct 16 1931 – Jan 26 1940
3b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 29 1940 – Nov 26 1942
4. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 7 1943 – Nov 3 1948
5. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Dec 1948 – August 4 1953
6. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Sept 21 1953 – Oct 21 1959
7a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 6 1960 – March 2 1964
7b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals March 11 1964 – Nov 12 1968
8a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Sept 23 1968 – Dec 3 1970
9a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals June 22 1973 – July 11 1975
9b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals July 25 1975 – Dec 1979
10. Memorandums 1926 – 1974
11. Resolutions 1927 – 1956
12. Resolutions 1957 – 1974
13. Questionnaires 1941; 1949; 1954; 1963; 1967
14a. General Correspondence Feb 14 1925 – May 7 1931
14b. General Correspondence July 3 1931 – Dec 1954
See series level description of the administrative history of the Office of the President/General Manager
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes publications covering a variety of topics related to the seed industry and/or McKenzie Seeds. Publications include:
1. Building Bigger Business/by Charles Austen Bates. Winnipeg, 1925, 4 pp.
2. Business Correspondence/ by C.A. Burt. Chicago, 1905, 221 pp.
3. The Production of Timothy Seed in Alberta/ by H. A. Craig. Edmonton, [no date], 8 pp.
4. Sweet Peas for All Purposes/by A. J. Macself. London, [no date], vi, 84 pp.
5. Growing Quality Beans in Manitoba/by the Manitoba Department of Agriculture, 1976, 12 pp.
6. 1979 Field Crop Recommendations for Manitoba/by the Manitoba Department of Agriculture. Winnipeg, 1979, 69 pp.
7. The Canada Year Book 1915/by the Minister of Trade and Commerce. Ottawa, 1916, xvi, 707 pp.
8. 1974 Vegetable Production Recommendations/by New York State College of Agriculture and Life Sciences, 36 pp.
9. Lawn Care: A Bulletin Service for Turf Enthusiasts/by O. M. Scott & Sons Co. Marysville, Ohio, August 1928 - 1943(?), plus index
10. 1965 Guide to Chemical Weed Control/by the Ontario Department of Agriculture. Toronto, 1965, 67 pp.
11. 1968 Ontario Vegetable Production Recommendations/ by the Ontario Department of Agriculture and Food. Toronto, 1968, 47 pp.
12. 1978 Vegetable Production Recommendations/by the Ontario Ministry of Agriculture and Food. 72 pp.
13. The Canadian Newspaper Directory, seventh edition. Montreal, 1911, xx, 138 pp.
14. The Shareholders' and Directors' Manual/by J. D. Warde. Seventh edition. Toronto, 1907, 617 pp.
THE BUSINESS MAN'S LIBRARY:
15. The Business Man's Library, volume II - Business Correspondence/ by Glenn S. Noble, et al. Chicago, 1907, 221 pp.
16. The Business Man's Library, volume III - Cost of Production/ by Alexander H. Revell, et al. Chicago, 1907, viii, 196 pp.
17. The Business Man's Library, volume V - Book on Buying/ by H.T. Kett, et al. Chicago, 1907, 216 pp.
18. The Business Man's Library, volume VI - Organizing a Factory/ by Clinton E. Woods. Chicago, 1907, 190 pp.
19. The Business Man's Library, volume VII - Book on Advertising/ by Truman A. DeWeese. Chicago, 1907, v, 165 pp.
20. The Business Man's Library, volume X - Accounting and Office Methods/ by W. Vernon Booth, et al. Chicago, 1907, v, 136pp, plus 45 p. index.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 2 Office of the President/General Manager
DIRECTORS OF DEVELOPMENT/INSTITUTIONAL ADVANCEMENT:
D.R. MACKAY (1973-1984)
See RG 6 4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration & Finance) for biographical information on D.R. MacKay.
GORDON MCDIARMID (1986 - 1991)
Gordon McDiarmid attended the University of Winnipeg and George Williams College (Chicago). His B.A. included a double major in Social Science and Group Work. His Masters degree was in Counseling Psychology with added course work and aplied research in Organization Dynamics. McDiarmid's psychiatric research and interships were undertaken at Michael Rease and Mount Sinai Hospitals in Chicago.
Prior to taking the posistion of Director of Private Funding at Brandon University, McDiarmid was President and CEO of U-Rent It Ltd. and Wallace & Wallace Fences Ltd. in Winnipeg (1973-1985) and Campaign Director fo the United Way of Calgary (1985-1986).
During his time at Brandon University McDiarmid: established a new University Foundation; organized annual and special gifts campaigns, endowments and the planned gift program; upgraded publications, initiated print standards policy, introduced desktop publishing and managed the media relations program for Communications; and as acting Director of Alumni and External Relations for two and a half years he revitalized the Board, expanded membership, initiated the affinity card program, the alumni directory, the IDC phone/mail program and expanded the national reunion program.
McDiarmid left Brandon University in 1991, to assume the post of Vice-President, Development, at the Banff Centre. He held this position until 1994, when he became the owner of Assiniboine Consulting Group Ltd. (Calgary) and the Vice President Western Canada of Navion Financial Management Ltd. (Vancouver). From 1998-2000, McDiarmid was the Director of Development - Special Projects for Lions Club of Winnipeg Housing Centres. From 2000-2003, he was the Interim Executive Director and an independant consultant for the Art Gallery of Southwestern Manitoba. McDiarmid also owned a private consulting practice from 1995-2006.
As of June 2010, Gordon McDiarmid lives in Winnipeg, MB.
L. JOHNSON (July 15, 1991 - 1994)
Lorraine Johnson was appointed Executive Director, Development and External Relations, effective July 15, 1991. From 1985-1989, she served as Director of University Relations for Mount Saint Vincent University in Halifax. Prior to her appointment at Brandon University she was a partner with a management and fund raising consulting firm in Nelson, BC.
S. DECTER HIRST (1994 - 1997/1998)
No biographical information yet.
BRUCE SHAVERS (1998 - 1999)
No biographical information yet.
B. PROVEN (August 1998 - March 2003)
Beth M. Proven attended high school in Carberry, MB in the late 1980s. In 1991, she graduated from the University of Manitoba with a B.A. She continued her education through an international agricultural exchange program in Kianga, Queensland (1992), an Arts Administration Certificate from Grant MacEwan Community College (1995), Certified Fundraising Executive Accreditation (CFRE) (2004) and a four-year Certificate in Management and Administration (CIM) from the University of Manitoba (2006).
Proven began her marketing and fundraising career in the arts, working for Wanuskewin Heritage Park, the Saskatoon International Fringe festival, the Edmonton Symphony Orchestra and Shakespeare by the Sea. She moved into university fundraising in 1997 as Development Officer for Dalhousie University's Captial Ideas Campaign.
In August 1998, Proven came to Brandon University where she served as the Director of Development and Alumni Relations. In addition, she also managed the activites of the Brandon University Foundation and participated in the Presidents Advisory Committee. She left Brandon University in March 2003. Since that time she has been employed as the Director of Development for St. Paul's College at the University of Manitoba (2003-2004) and as Manager Planned Giving at the University of Manitoba (2004 - present).
Currently (February 2007), Beth Proven lives in Winnipeg, MB.
K. WHELPTON - acting (2003-2004)
Kate Whelpton was born on January 9, 1973 in Windsor, ON. She received her Honours B.A. in Geography and Political Studies from the University of Guelph in 1996, her B.Ed. from the University of Toronto in 1997 and her M.Ed. from Brandon University in 2005.
After teaching in Ontario, New Brunswick and Nova Scotia for a few years, Whelpton returned to working in poast-secondary education as the Sexual Harassment Advisor for Mount Allison and Brandon Universities. Since 2000, Whelpton has assumed the position as the Director of the Office of the President, overseeing the administration of the PResiden'ts Office, including planning and implementing all aspects of the meetings of the Board of Governors, budgets, staff meetings, events, strategic initiatives, and general administrative oversight of the organization. In 2003-2004, she was appointed Acting Executive Director of Institutional Advancement.
MARC DESROSIERS (2003 - July 2007)
No biographical information yet.
CINDY YACYSHEN - acting (July 2007 - October 2009)
Cynthia Hope Yacyshen was born on May 13, 1968 in Brandon, MB. She obtained her Bachelor of Arts (Advanced - Major: Applied Economics, Minor: Business Administration) from the University of Maniotba in 1992. In 2004, she received her "National Certificate in Fundraising Management" from Ryerson University.
Prior to coming to Brandon University in 1997, Yacyshen was Marketing Coordinator for Manitoba Theatre Centre in Winnipeg, MB. At Brandon University she was Campaign Officer for the Brandon College Legacy Campaign and then Senior Development Officer. In July 2007, Yacyshen was named Acting Director of Institutional Advancement. Yacyshen left her position at Brandon University in October 2009.
Notes
A partial file level inventory for this sub-series exists as a Word document. History/Bio information for Beth Proven was taken from the resume and biography she gave to the Archives (February 2007). Kate Whelpton appears in the Brandon University records as Kate Ramsey, Kate Whelpton and Kate Gross. Kate Whelpton provided her own biographical information (August 2007). Cindy Yacyshen provided her own biographical information (September 2007). Gordon McDiarmid provided his own biographical information (May 2010). History/Bio information for Lorraine Johnson taken from the Fall 1991 issue of Alumni News.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 10: Office of Development
The offices of the President and General Manager were established in 1896 with the creation of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. These positions were held jointly by the one officer of company until 1975, when the Board of Directors of the Company divided the two positions, thereby relieving the President from management of plant operations.
Under the General By-Laws of the Company, the President, when present, presided over all Board of Directors meetings. He also signed all documents that may have required his signature and performed any other duties assigned to him by the board. The President exercised general supervision and control over the business of the Company and performed such duties as are usually associated with the office of President of Chief Executive officer of a company.
The General Manager had full power and authority to manage and direct the business and affairs of the Company. He was also responsible for employing and discharging agents and employees of the Company. After A.E. McKenzie gifted the majority of his company shares to the Government of Manitoba in 1945, the General Manager remained responsible for all operations of the Company. However, the General Manager found himself accountable to a Board of Directors comprised mainly of government appointees.
A. E. McKenzie held the offices of President/General Manager from 1896 until his death in 1964, at which time J. Lasby Lowes succeeded him. Following Lowes' retirement in 1968, A.R. Swanson was appointed by the government to fill the positions. Anthony J. Maruca became President of A.E. McKenzie Co. Ltd. in 1972. In 1975, the Board of Directors appointed William Moore the first individual to hold the position of General Manager without also occupying the President's office. At the same time, Mr. Pat Kelleher was named the new interim President. Following Kelleher's resignation, Moore was appointed President of the company. Keith Guelpa became President around 1984 following Moore's departure from the company to face criminal charges arising from his activities as an officer of the company. Raymond West assumed the position after Guelpa’s departure.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Series consists almost entirely of records and documents generated by the first two President/General Managers of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. In addition to the records created by A.E. McKenzie and J. Lasby Lowes in their capacity as President/General Manager, records pertaining to the various properties owned by the Company are also included. The series also contains marketing documents, including catalogues and sales literature, as well as a reference library comprised of twenty titles dealing with business and the seed industry and some records dealing with the President/General Managers following Lowes' retirement.
The series has been divided into seven sub-series, including: (1) A.E. McKenzie; (2) J. Lasby Lowes; (3) Comptroller; (4) Properites; (5) Marketing; (6) Reference Library; and (7) Miscellaneous Publications/Correspondence.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 2 Office of the President/General Manager