Photograph was in possession of Mrs. Ruby Miles, who passed the image on to Fred McGuinness. McGuinness makes reference to Mrs. Miles and this photograph in his Sunbeams column (Brandon Sun 14 September 1978).
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the interior of the Hanbury Manufacturing Co. Mill. Men identified in the photograph include: Mr. Tom McKenzie (right), Elden Darrow, and Jack Silliker.
Notes
Writing on the back of the photograph reads: Mrs. R. Miles. Provenience and identifications obtained from Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Cando Contracting Ltd. was found in 1978 by Gord Peters and Rick Hammond. The company began as a small rail line dismantling and salvage company operating out of Brandon, Manitoba. The company changed its name in 2013 to Cando Rail Services Ltd., which supplies railway support services (e.g., engineering and track services, industrial rail services, mechanical services, rail car storage, railway material sales, short line operations, transload services) to industry and the rail sector. The company maintains its headquarters in Brandon, Manitoba, and has regional offices located in Calgary, Edmonton, Winnipeg, Whitby, and Adel (Iowa). (Source: www.candoltd.com, accessed 05 Dec 2015)
Scope and Content
Photograph shows Gord Peters standing in front of the rail car that forms the entrance of Cando Contracting Ltd. in Brandon, Manitoba
The Hanbury Manufacturing Company was located at 600-698 Assiniboine Avenue. Hanbury advertised themselves as sash, door, and blind manufacturers; lumber dealers;
Scope and Content
Photograph shows six men/carpenters in a window framing workshop.
Notes
Writing on the back of the photograph reads: This was taken before Edna ws born. Ntocie the stove & pipes. This was the hard way of working & yet they never had a fire, everything was O.K. & good times. Dad, Ross Deitz, Charlie James, - , - , Cliff Sanford leaning on desk. 1900.
[St. Joseph’s Academy provided education to the children of Brandon’s Catholic community and was overseen by its own Catholic school board. Many non-secular school boards would be eliminated in Manitoba in 1890. (Mitchell, T. 1986. In the Image of Ontario: Public Schools in Brandon 1881-1890. Manitoba History, Number 12, Autumn 1986)]
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Teaching Fathers of St. Joseph's Academy
Notes
St. Joseph's Academy was built 1883, closed 1895; Copy neg.; From St. Michael's Academy Collection
1930's minister St. George's Church 10th St. & College Ave.; 1940's Squ./Ldr. RCAF chief Anglican chaplain; 1945-1950 Canon, secretary of diocese; Apr. 16, 1950 Consecrated Bishop of Brandon (2nd); Died Jan. 24, 1969.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Rt. Rev. Ivor Arthur Norris
Notes
[Mr. Stuckey put 3 negatives in the same envelope. We have separated them and numbered them AE10(1) through AE10(3).]
1930's minister St. George's Church 10th St. & College Ave.; 1940's Squ./Ldr. RCAF chief Anglican chaplain; 1945-1950 Canon, secretary of diocese; Apr. 16, 1950 Consecrated Bishop of Brandon (2nd); Died Jan. 24, 1969.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Rt. Rev. Ivor Arthur Norris
Notes
[Mr. Stuckey put 3 negatives in the same envelope. We have separated them and numbered them AE10(1) through AE10(3).]
1930's minister St. George's Church 10th St. & College Ave.; 1940's Squ./Ldr. RCAF chief Anglican chaplain; 1945-1950 Canon, secretary of diocese; Apr. 16, 1950 Consecrated Bishop of Brandon (2nd); Died Jan. 24, 1969.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Rt. Rev. Ivor Arthur Norris
Notes
[Mr. Stuckey put 3 negatives in the same envelope. We have separated them and numbered them AE10(1) through AE10(3).]
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Brandon City O.Y.B. Band
Notes
Names written on a piece of paper inside the envelope are now on the label. Top row (l-r): (boy), ?, Arnold Rice, Frank Roberts, Jack Pritchard, Tom Prue, ?, ?, Ab. Scott, ?, ?, Anthony Rogerson, ?, Bill Fisher, Al. Crane, (boy). 2nd row: Angus Munroe, Harry McKenzie, Adam Petrick, ?, Cec. Arthur, Alex. Pue (band leader), Temp. Roberts, Jack Melhuish, Dan Craig. 3rd row: ?, ?, Gordon Rice, Harry Wells (drummer), Roy Rice, W. Hayward, Bill McRory; Source: Mr. P.K. Roberts
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Brandon City Band
Notes
Top row (l-r): F. Scott, A. McPhail, W. Marshall, L. Neilly, W. Lemay, W.G. Stuckey, W. Murdock, A. Smith, W. McLean, R. Barrett. 2nd row: W. Graham, M. Parkin, B. Treherne, J. Whitney, Geo. Mutter, L. Hammell, T. Rife, E. Rife, L. Purdon, E. Mathewson, J. Scott. 3rd row: J. Ober, A. Ober, F. Lepard, T. Mathewson, Paul Joubert, T.H. Miller, T.H. Farrar, E. Teeple, F. Harriet, F.A. Lewis. Bottom row: B. Neumeyer, Frank Parks, O. Olson, H. Lepard, W. Broadie, G. Sherman, B.T. Stuckey, Gordon Sampson, Frank Harris. T.H. Miller was band leader, W. Graham was secretary. A.C. Davidson was also a member but does not appear because he was the professional photographer; From George Lepard.
[The organization of the boys' pipe band was initiated by a group of citizens of Scottish origin in 1934. The same group engaged an instructor for the band from Scotland; the kilts were discovered in Park School and permission was given by the School Board for their use by the band.]
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Brandon Boys Pipe Band
Notes
[History/Bio information is from Mary Hume's Brandon: A Prospect of a City, p. 129.]
Named "Imperial" as building was owned by Imperial Oil Co., which had offices on the ground floor. Located on the east side of Tenth Street, south of Princess Avenue.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Imperial Dance Gardens (bandstand). Inset: Jack Jewsbury - opened Imperial in the spring of 1934.
Notes
From Roy Brown collection
Additional historical information provided by the Fred McGuinness collection (20-2009).