"For pupils preparing for promotion examinations ... entrance examinations ... public school leaving examinations ... junior and senior leaving examinations, students preparing for teachers' certificates, and all other official examinations"
Box contains bound volumes of Manitoba Wheat Pool and Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Volumes in this box include:
Manitoba Wheat Co-operative Producers, Ltd. July 1923 – May 1929; Manitoba Wheat Pool June 1929 – June 1934
MPE Minute Book May 1925 – July 1937
MPE Minute Book Sept 1953 – July 1959
MPE Minute Book August 1946 – July 1953
Box contains bound volumes of Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Volumes in this box include:
MPE Minute Book Sept 1953 – July 1959
MPE Minute Book Oct 1959 – July 1964
MPE Minute Book Oct 1964 – Oct 1968
MPE Minute Book Oct 1968 – July 1971
Box contains unbound Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes including MPE Board of Directors minutes January 15-16,1985 to July 17,1996.
Box contains unbound Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Folders in this box include: unbound minutes of MPE Annual and Special Meetings 1976-98; Prospectus Nov 28 1997; MPE Annual Meeting Minutes 1990 and 1991; MPE Delegates Meetings 1989-1998; MPE Board of Directors Meetings July 16 1997 – May 19 1998; MPE Board of Directors Meetings August 20 1996 - June 18 1997; Agricore / AWP / MPE Board of Directors Meetings June 12 1998 – Oct 30 1998.
Ray Bailey was born in Brandon Manitoba in 1922. A Bachelor of Science degree from Brandon College in 1944 completed his education there. Following a short stint as a Chemist he entered the University of Manitoba. There, in 1946, he earned a Diploma in Education. Subsequent study brought a Master of Education degree in 1966. In 1973, he was awareded a Canada Council grant for additional studies.
He began his teaching career at Killarney, MB in March 1946, teaching science. Later he held teaching and adminitrative positions in Melita, Morris and Seven Oaks School Divisions. He retired as Principal of Arthur E. Wright Elementary School in 1986. Bailey was active in the Manitoba Teachers Society and the Manitoba Library Trustees Association. In 1973, the city of Winnipeg gave him a community service award. In 2005, he was a recipient of the Brandon University Alumni Association's Distinguished Alumni Award.
He married Joan Pettipher in 1949. They had four children, Ronald, Ann, Mary and Robert. Joan Bailey died in 1988. Raymond Bailey lived in Winnipeg with his wife Barbara until his death on July 23, 2015.
Custodial History
Book was acquired at a book launch sponsored by Pennywise Books, Brandon, Manitoba in January 2006. The Brandon College documents were probably collected by Bailey during his time as a student in the early 1940s. He donated them to the McKee Archives in November 1994. The yearbooks were delivered to the Archives by Gerald Brown for Bailey in April 2008.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of an autographed copy of Bailey's book "tadpole to Little Frong (in a big pond)." It also includes three Brandon Collegiate Institute yearbooks the New Era for 1938-40, one file of Brandon College records, including eligibility lists for the Students' Association, a Physics IV test, a letter to Bailey excusing him from non-combat duty due to his work as an assistant in the Chemistry Department, a dance program for the Valentine Formal (1943), a freshman reception list and a program/invitation to a musical evening at the home of Martin Johns, Professor in the Physics Department.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the author description in Bailey's book. Description by Christy Henry.
The By-laws and Nominating Committee of the Board of Governors is a standing committee that meets as required to discuss matters relating to the by-laws governing the Board of Governors and, when appropriate, to present a slate of officers and committee member to the Board. The membership of the By-laws and Nominating Committee consists of the Secretary of the Board as Chair and up to four members of the Board of Governors, one of which is a student. Elections take place at the August meeting of the Board of Governors every year.
The By-laws and Nominating Committee is responsible for: developing the terms of reference for the standing committees of the Board of Governors; developing and recommending by-laws for the operation of the Brandon University Board of Governors; maintaining Board policies and making reocmmendations to the Board of Governors on such matters; preparing a list of nominees for membership on each of the standing and ad hoc committees of theBoard of Governors; and identifying potential Board appointees as required from the internal and external community.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consist of 1 file containing reports, executive and committee lists and correspondence.
Notes
History/Bio information takend from Board of Governors By-law No. 11 - Committees of the Board of Governors, Section IV - By-laws and Nominating Committee (revised November 23, 2006).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees
The Executive Committee assumed the responsibilities of the former Planning and Finance Committee on January 6, 2000.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of 1 file containing minutes, agendas, correspondence, financial information and records of the Budget Committee.
Notes
History/Bio information takend from Board of Governors By-law No. 11 - Committees of the Board of Governors, Section III - Executive Committee (revised November 23, 2006).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees
Sub sub series consists of Board of Governors member lists, correspondence, a memorandum, appointments for January 1970, a voting ballot and orders-in-council for Robert Martin and Gary Sallows.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees