Materials were in the possession of Harvey Young until their donation to the McKee Archives in 2008.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of one file containing a copy of the history of the Geology Department and a drawing of its layout when it was located in the H-Huts. Both were created by Harvey Young.
Lorelei Cederstrom (nee Sajeck) was born in Milwaukee, Wisconsin on August 16, 1938. She obtained her B.A. from Valparaiso University in 1959 with majors in English and Music, and her M.A. in English from Carleton University in 1969. She was employed by the University of Manitoba as a teaching assistant in the English Department and Lecturer in the Evening and Extension Division from 1971 - c. 1979. In 1980, she began her career at Brandon University as an Assistant English Professor with BUNTEP/Impacte.
With James C. Cederstrom she had two children, a son and a daughter. Lorelei Cederstrom passed away in Brandon, Manitoba on July 27, 2002.
Scope and Content
Fonds contains course materials, course outlines, grades, notebooks, correspondence, memos, minutes for various University committees, English Department records, publications and research. The latter includes material on Doris Lessing and Walt Whitman.
The Binscarth Women's Institute began in 1928, as a division of the Manitoba Women's Institute. It was organized for rural women to come together in a social setting. The members of the Institute participated in fund raising for community projects initiated by the Institute. The Institute also undertook to organize community events. The last meeting of the Binscarth Women's Institute took place in 1967. The organization was never formally dissolved.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned in 1997 by the McKee Archives. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Fonds contains minutes, financial records, and other material created by the Binscarth Women's Institute from its creation in 1928, to its final gathering in 1967. Aside from minutes and financial records, the fonds contains records of the Canadian Centennial celebrations of 1967, planned by the Institute.
Related women's institute collections in the McKee Archives include:
Manitoba Women's Institute; Minnedosa Women's Institute; Cordova Women's Institute; Clanwilliam Women's Institute; Rathwell Women's Institute; Strathclair Women's Institute; Crocus Women's Institute; Southwest A Region - Manitoba Women's Institute; Douglas Women's Institute
Hector Ross Hume was born on December 8, 1902, in the R.M. of Glenwood to John Hume and Jean Gordon. He grew up on the family farm, section 29-7-22, later known as Abergeldie Stock Farm, and attended Whitefield School and then Souris High School. Along with his father, Ross operated the 640-acre farm near Souris, Manitoba, where they sold purebred Angus cattle, shopshire sheep, Yorkshire swine, seed grain and had a government approved flock of hens. John Hume retired in 1947, and died in January 1953.
Ross married Mina Radcliffe on December 20, 1929. Together they had one daughter, Margaret (b. April 11, 1932). In the fall of 1953, Ross lost part of his right arm in a farming accident; he continued to operate the farm with the help of his wife for an additional year before the couple sold the farm to Henry Gordon and moved to Souris where Ross obtained a job as Business Manager of the Souris Hospital.
Mina Hume died on February 14, 1960, and shortly thereafter Ross enrolled in a correspondence course in accounting with the Central School of Chicago and in a two year course in Hospital Administration, with the University of Saskatchewan. Upon graduation in 1962, Ross became the Administrator of Souris and Hartney hospitals, a position he held until 1972. Following his retirement, Ross wrote two books - "The Hospital Tree Grows Tall" and "Tale Wagging By and Old Time" - which he published and sold locally.
During his time on the farm, Ross was a member of the Manitoba Cattle Breeders Association and a member of the local Agricultural Society. He was also secretary of the latter organization. From 1968-1981, Ross was on the Board of Directors for Victoria Park Lodge, and for a while in the 1970s, he was on the Board of Directors for the Souris Hosptial.
Ross Hume died on January 9, 1986 at Victoria Park Lodge in Souris, Manitoba.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1997. Prior custoridal history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Fonds includes Ross Hume's tabulations and tables of statistics relating to prairie agriculture. The data includes market information (sources the Winnipeg Free Press) for the years 1890 to 1940, derived from correspondence with Cora Hind of the Winnipeg Free Press. The fonds also includes a variety of other statistical data. Some of this data was derived from the work of Hume's father, John Hume. (See The Country Guide (February 1943) article included in the fonds).
Notes
History/Bio information taken from The Hume Family entry in "The People of Souris and Glenwood: from the earliest beginnings to the present" published by Souris and District Heritage Club Inc. (2006). Description by Christy Henry.
MPE Holland Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Organizational papers: 1927 - 1967 Petition, 1927 Certificate of incorporation, 1927 Memorandum of Association, 1927 Minutes of the Provisional Directors' meeting, 26 May 1927 Minutes of the Permanent Directors' meeting, 26 May 1927 Minutes of the Shareholders' meeting, 26 May 1927 First elevator lease, 1 August 1927 Letter, 30 January 1930 By-law authorizing new lease, 30 January 1930 Lease for new elevator, 30 January 1930 Letter, 14 July 1931 Application for share, 24 July 1931 Shareholder's meeting, 24 July 1931 Draft Director's minutes, 24 July 1931 By-law nos. 12 and 13, 24 July 1931 Agenda - shareholder's meeting, 24 July 1931 Agreement between Government, Manitoba Wheat Pool, MPE and CEA, 24 July 1931 Memorandum re: elevator membership and agreement, 24 July 1931 Memorandum re: Platform shippers questions and answers at conference, 24 July 1931 Department of Education and Publicity, Memorandum re: terminals credential forms, 24 July 1931 Agreement between Holland CEA and MPE, 1 August 1931 By-law no. 14, 4 November 1931 One share, 1 December 1931 Confirmation of share allotment, 14 January 1932 Supplementary agreement between Holland CEA and MPE and covering letter, 1 February 1933 Amending supplementary agreement and covering letter, 15 October 1936 By-law no. 16, 31 October 1939 By-law cancelling share capital, 29 October 1940 By-law nos. 18, 19, 20 and General By-laws, 29 October 1941 Letter re: General By-laws and By-laws 18, 19 and 20, 6 August 1942 1945-46 Officers and Directors, November 1945 Agreement between Holland CEA and MPE, 1 August 1951 Directors' Resolution, 18 October 1961 Agreement between Holland CEA and MPE, 15 December 1966 By-law no. 26, 3 April 1967 Minutes of Executive Board meetings, volume 1, 4 June 1927 - volume 8, 24 November 1969 Minutes of Shareholders Annual meetings, 1929 - 1969 (22 reports) Financial records and statistics Statement of surplus, 1938 - 1944 (6 reports) Final statements, 1930 - 1952 (20 reports) Auditors' reports, 1928 - 1968 (25 reports) Correspondence, 1927 - 1980 Membership list, 1927 - 1969 Miscellaneous Directors' attendance lists, no date (2 reports) Blueprint for elevator and area, no date. Group Meetings of Local elevator Associations, Boards and Agents notebook March 29, no year. Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Victoria.
Box contains bound volumes of Manitoba Wheat Pool and Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Volumes in this box include:
Manitoba Wheat Co-operative Producers, Ltd. July 1923 – May 1929; Manitoba Wheat Pool June 1929 – June 1934
MPE Minute Book May 1925 – July 1937
MPE Minute Book Sept 1953 – July 1959
MPE Minute Book August 1946 – July 1953
The A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. has had a Board of Directors since its incorporation in 1906. The first Board consisted of A. E. McKenzie, S. A. Bedford, the director of the Experimental Farm, H. L. Patmore and W. A. McCracken. Following A.E. McKenzie’s death, the government of Manitoba appointed the members of the Board under the arrangements made with the establishment of the A.E. Mckenzie Foundation.
According to the general by-laws (c. 1960) of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd., the Board of Directors annually, or more often if required, elected from among themselves a President, a Vice-President and a General Manager. They were also responsible for appointing an Assistant General Manager, and a Secretary and a Treasurer. If needed, they would also appoint an Assistant Secretary and an Assistant Treasurer. A majority vote of the Board was required for the election or appointment of the above officers. Those individuals elected or appointed to their offices by the Board could be removed at the pleasure of the Board. The Board also had the power to fix the salaries of all of the officers of the Company. By resolution, it could pass this responsibility to the General Manager.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This series consists of Board minutes/meetings, management consultant reports, financial records, documents and miscellaneous records.
It has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) Documents; (2) Minutes/Meetings; (3) Management Consultant Reports; (4) Miscellaneous; and (5) Financial Records.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
File consists of correspondence, memos, a submission to the Standing Committee on Broadcasting, Films and Assistance to the Arts presented by the Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada (1968), research material on FM stations, an equipment proposal, FM Radio Committee minutes and newsclippings.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 8: Library Services
Border Fertilizers Ltd was a parnership agreement between the Pool and M.G. Smerchanski to provide better fertilizer services to Pool members. MPE entered the agreement in 1963 but sold their shares in 1969 due to heavy losses.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of legal documents, financial statements, proposals and reports.
Artifact catalogue containing records from the excavation units 45 to 55 at Lovstrom Block B.
Scope and Content
Spreadsheet containing information about the artifacts recovered, including: unit, level, artifact number, catalogue number, depth, co-ordinates, entry date, date recovered,count, weight, UTM co-ordinates, notes(excavators initials and comments) and artifact identification.
This box contains correspondence to the secretaries of locals, memorandums, resolutions, questionnaires and general corresponce. The records include the following:
1. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals June 30 1924 – July 16 1929
2. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals July 19 1929 – Sept 28 1931
3a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Oct 16 1931 – Jan 26 1940
3b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 29 1940 – Nov 26 1942
4. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 7 1943 – Nov 3 1948
5. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Dec 1948 – August 4 1953
6. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Sept 21 1953 – Oct 21 1959
7a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Jan 6 1960 – March 2 1964
7b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals March 11 1964 – Nov 12 1968
8a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals Sept 23 1968 – Dec 3 1970
9a. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals June 22 1973 – July 11 1975
9b. Correspondence to Secretaries of Locals July 25 1975 – Dec 1979
10. Memorandums 1926 – 1974
11. Resolutions 1927 – 1956
12. Resolutions 1957 – 1974
13. Questionnaires 1941; 1949; 1954; 1963; 1967
14a. General Correspondence Feb 14 1925 – May 7 1931
14b. General Correspondence July 3 1931 – Dec 1954
File consists of a request for approval in principle for financial assistance for special capital project to the Universities Grants Commission, correspondence, and a cost estimate.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.6 Board Projects
Box 1
The “Act to Incorporate Brandon College” was assented to on June 1, 1900 and specified that the Board of Directors would consist of 21 members. The Board was to control all financial matters of the College, though all decisions had to meet the approval of the Baptist Convention.
The first officers of the Board were a Chairman, a Treasurer and a Secretary. The minutes also refer to a “President,” separate from the Principal, but does not define the President’s duties. The Principal was a member ex-officio of the Board. The first duty of the Board was to create an executive consisting of all Brandon members of the Board. The main function of the executive was the operation of the College and transaction of all business arising between Board meetings.
In pursuit of a separate university charter, the Board reorganized its affairs in 1910, appointing an investment committee, a Bursar and a Registrar. The Principal was renamed “President,” and was appointed Chairman of the Executive. The university charter was denied, leading the Board to seek affiliation with McMaster University. The Board of Directors during this time was forced to take a more active role in directing college affairs. In November 1910, the Board moved: ...that the officers of the Board be authorized to make such application for such amendments to the Charter as seem necessary and advisable.
This decision led the Board to draw up the Act to Amend An Act to Incorporate Brandon College which, by 1915, granted the Board authority over all College affairs, following the stated direction of the Baptist Convention.
On May 5, 1916 a nominating committee was struck to name the persons and mandate of all new committees.
During the existence of the Board prior to 1967 the following committees were created:
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
In 1918, the Board defined the functions of the Executive Committee as:
The Board of Brandon College shall at its organization meeting each year appoint from among its members an Executive of not less than seven in number. The Executive shall be responsible to the Board and shall exercise all the powers usually incidental to an Executive other than those delegated to the Finance Committee and Endowment Fund Committee, which two Committees shall also be responsible to the Board direct.
FINANCE COMMITTEE, 1918-1926
The Finance Committee was to consist of no fewer than seven members which:
...shall be responsible to the Board and shall under the Board have the general oversight and control of the financial policy of the College insofar as the raising of funds is concerned. The Finance Committee shall not have the power to make any expenditures except such as it may deem necessary to incur in connection with its efforts in raising funds. The Finance Committee shall report to the Board of the College at each meeting of the Board and for the purpose of keeping the Executive in close touch with its activities and of enabling the two committees to work in closest cooperation shall transmit to the Executive a copy of the minutes of each of its meetings to be read at the regular meetings of the Executive and shall give account of the progress made by the Finance Committee and generally of its plans for the future. Members of the Finance Committee shall not all necessarily be members of the Board.
ENDOWMENT FUND COMMITTEE, 1918-1926
The Endowment Fund Committee was created by the following resolution:
The Board of Brandon College shall at its Organization Meeting each year appoint an Endowment Fund Committee which shall under the Board manage the Endowment Fund and direct the re-investment of its principal. The Endowment Fund Committee shall consist of not less than three members who shall not all necessarily be members of the Board.
The creation of the latter two committees was significant because it was the first time that Brandon citizens, not necessarily Baptists, were brought into the administration.
HOUSE AND GROUNDS COMMITTEE, 1923-1926
NEW INSTRUCTORS COMMITTEE, 1923-1936
ADVERTISING COMMITTEE, 1923-1936
BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION AND ENDOWMENT COMMITTEE, 1926-1936
TEACHERS COMMITTEE, 1929-1936
GENERAL PUBLICITY COMMITTEE, 1930-1936
By 1936, however, all Committees were abandoned as Brandon College struggled for its financial survival. After the Baptist Convention withdrew all of its support in 1938, a Provisional Board was established through the Brandon Board of Trade to negotiate with the government for the transfer of Brandon College to the Government of Manitoba. The provisional board succeeded in gathering the needed support for government intervention, and resurrected the College under “An Act to Incorporate Brandon College Incorporated.”
The new Board of Directors was appointed October 11, 1939 during a general shareholders meeting. The officers of the Board were a Chairman, a Secretary and a Treasurer. There were also six new standing committees appointed, with mandates listed under clause 16 of by-law 1:
FINANCE COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty it shall be to oversee the finances of the Corporation and make recommendations to the Board as to investments of Monies received for endowment or scholarship purposes, and to prepare and submit the annual budget.
PROPERTY COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... who shall have general supervision of the real and personal property of the Corporation.
ENROLLMENT COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to obtain a student body for the College, to co-operate with the President and Faculty for such purpose and report to the Board as may be required from time to time.
FACULTY COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to make preliminary arrangements for the engagement of teachers and who shall make recommendations to the Board for consideration in the engagement of such teachers.
MEMBERSHIP COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to maintain the membership of the Corporation and see that proper records of the same are maintained.
ENDOWMENT COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to obtain endowments for the future operation of the College and to obtain gifts for scholarship purposes.
In 1942 the Public Relations and Progress Committee was established and a Public Relations Officer was hired. A Consultant Committee was appointed in 1948 with the sole purpose of overseeing the transfer of McKenzie Seeds to the provincial government for financial support through the McKenzie Foundation.
Scope and Content
Series consists mainly of minutes of meetings and correspondence between various Board members and the College. It is a very detailed and descriptive compilation of the decision-making processes at a higher education institution. There are copies of minutes from the Executive Committee in amongst the general Board Minutes. Series also contains a copy of an appraisment of Brandon College Inc. by the General Appraisal Company Ltd. (Vancouver) completed in 1957.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 1: Board of Directors
Arrangement
Series has been divided into one sub-series: (1) Minutes of General Board Meetings.