Box contains minutes geenrated by local MPE associations, collected and microfilmed by the central office. Rolls in this box include the following:
Roll 13: Oakbank 1940-51; Oakburn 1940-51; Oak Lake 1928-51; Oakland 1928-51; Oakville 1928-51; Osbourne 1927-51; Rapid City 1926-51; Pierson 1928-51; Pilot Mound 1928-51; Pipestone 1929-51; Poplar Point 1947-51; Portage 1927-51; Purves 1928-51
Roll 14: Rapid City 1926-27; Rathwell 1928-51; Regent 1927-51; Reston 1927-51; Rhodes 1928-48; Riverton 1948-51; Sandy Lake 1943-51; Selkirk 1947-51; Roblin 1926-51; Rossburn 1929-51; Roundthwaite 1928-51; Russell 1940-51; Ste Agathe 1946-51; St Jean 1949-51; Sanford 1927-51; Scrick 1944-51
Roll 15: missing
Roll 16: Starbuck 1927-40; Stonewall 1939-51; Strathclair 1947-51; Swan Lake 1928-51; Teulon 1940-51; Thorn Hill 1926-51; Tilston 1928-51; Treherne 1928-51; Vista 1940-51; Warren 1947-51; Waskada 1925-51; Wawanesa 1927-51; Wood Bay 1937-51; Wood Bay 1926-37; Wood North 1928-51
Roll 17: Side 1 Alexander to Birdtail Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Birnie to Cartwright Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 18: Side 1 Chillon to Ebor Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Eden to Fork River Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 19: Side 1 Forrest to Hamiota Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Harding to Kronsgart Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 20: Side 1 Landseer to Maples Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Margaret to Napinka Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 21: Side 1 Neelin to Purvis Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Rapid City to Silverton Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 22: Side 1 Sinclair to Warren Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Waskada to Woodnorth Oct 1951 – June 1957
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Assoctiation Financial Statements 1925-26; 1926-27; 1927-28; 1928-29 A-H; 1928-29 I-W; 1929-30 A-H; 1929-30 I-W; 1930-31 A-H; 1930-31 I-W; 1931-32 A-Ed; 1931-32 El-Md
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1931-32 McA-Wo; 1932-33 A-Ed; 1932-33 El-Md; 1932-33 McA-Wo; 1933-34 A-Ed; 1933-34 El-Md; 1933-34 McA-Wo; 1934-35 A-Ed; 1934-35 El-Ma; 1934-35 McA-Wo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1935-36 A-Ed; 1935-36 El-Ma; 1935-36 McA-Wo; 1936-37 A-Ed; 1936-37 El-Ma; 1936-37 McA-Wo; 1937-38 A-Elm; 1937-38 Elp-McC; 1937-38 McT-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1938-39 A-Elm; 1938-39 Elp-McC; 1938-39 McT-Wo; 1939-40 A-Elm; 1939-40 Elp-McC; 1939-40 McT-Woo; 1940-41 A-Ewa; 1940-41 Fai-McC; 1940-41 McT-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1944-45 A-Ewa; 1944-45 Fai-McC; 1944-45 McT-Woo; 1945-46 A-Fan; 1945-46 For-Men; 1945-46 Men-Woo; 1946-47 A-Fan; 1946-47 For-Men; 1946-47 Men-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1947-48 A-Fan; 1947-48 For-Men; 1947-48 Men-Woo; 1948-49 A-Fan; 1948-49 For-Men; 1948-49 Men-Woo; 1949-50 A-Fan
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1949-50 For-Men; 1949-50 Men-Woo; 1950-51 A-Fan; 1950-51 For-Men; 1950-51 Men-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1952-53 A-Fan; 1952-53 Fis-Men; 1952-53 Mia-Woo; 1953-54 A-Fan; 1953-54 Fis-Men; 1953-54 Mia-Woo; 1954-55 A-Fan; 1954-55 Fis-Men; 1954-55 Mia-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1955-56 A-Dro; 1955-56 Duf-Kat; 1955-56 Kel-Oak; 1955-56 Oak-Woo; 1956-57 A-Fan; 1956-57 Fis-Men; 1956-57 Mia-Woo; 1957-58 A-Fan; 1957-58 Fis-Men; 1957-58 Mia-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1958-59 A-Fan; 1958-59 Fis-Men; 1958-59 Mia-Woo; 1959-60 A-Fre; 1959-60 Gil-Mor; 1959-60 Nap-Woo; 1960-61 A-Fre; 1960-61 Gil-Mor; 1960-61 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1961-62 A-Fre; 1961-62 Gil-Mor; 1961-62 Nap-Woo; 1962-63 A-Fre; 1962-63 Gil-Mor; 1962-63 Nap-Woo; 1963-64 A-Fre; 1963-64 Gil-Mor; 1963-64 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1964-65 A-Fre; 1964-65 Gil-Mor; 1964-65 Nap-Woo; 1965-66 A-K; 1965-66 L-W; 1966-67 A-K; 1966-67 L-W; 1967-68 A-K; 1967-68 L-W
Photograph shows the interior of Fred McGuinness' office at the Medicine Hat News. Fred is seen scribbling on a notepad at his desk. The newspaper was located at Second Street and Sixth Avenue in downtown Medicine Hat until it moved in 1981.
The offices of the President and General Manager were established in 1896 with the creation of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. These positions were held jointly by the one officer of company until 1975, when the Board of Directors of the Company divided the two positions, thereby relieving the President from management of plant operations.
Under the General By-Laws of the Company, the President, when present, presided over all Board of Directors meetings. He also signed all documents that may have required his signature and performed any other duties assigned to him by the board. The President exercised general supervision and control over the business of the Company and performed such duties as are usually associated with the office of President of Chief Executive officer of a company.
The General Manager had full power and authority to manage and direct the business and affairs of the Company. He was also responsible for employing and discharging agents and employees of the Company. After A.E. McKenzie gifted the majority of his company shares to the Government of Manitoba in 1945, the General Manager remained responsible for all operations of the Company. However, the General Manager found himself accountable to a Board of Directors comprised mainly of government appointees.
A. E. McKenzie held the offices of President/General Manager from 1896 until his death in 1964, at which time J. Lasby Lowes succeeded him. Following Lowes' retirement in 1968, A.R. Swanson was appointed by the government to fill the positions. Anthony J. Maruca became President of A.E. McKenzie Co. Ltd. in 1972. In 1975, the Board of Directors appointed William Moore the first individual to hold the position of General Manager without also occupying the President's office. At the same time, Mr. Pat Kelleher was named the new interim President. Following Kelleher's resignation, Moore was appointed President of the company. Keith Guelpa became President around 1984 following Moore's departure from the company to face criminal charges arising from his activities as an officer of the company. Raymond West assumed the position after Guelpa’s departure.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Series consists almost entirely of records and documents generated by the first two President/General Managers of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. In addition to the records created by A.E. McKenzie and J. Lasby Lowes in their capacity as President/General Manager, records pertaining to the various properties owned by the Company are also included. The series also contains marketing documents, including catalogues and sales literature, as well as a reference library comprised of twenty titles dealing with business and the seed industry and some records dealing with the President/General Managers following Lowes' retirement.
The series has been divided into seven sub-series, including: (1) A.E. McKenzie; (2) J. Lasby Lowes; (3) Comptroller; (4) Properites; (5) Marketing; (6) Reference Library; and (7) Miscellaneous Publications/Correspondence.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 2 Office of the President/General Manager