This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Assoctiation Financial Statements 1925-26; 1926-27; 1927-28; 1928-29 A-H; 1928-29 I-W; 1929-30 A-H; 1929-30 I-W; 1930-31 A-H; 1930-31 I-W; 1931-32 A-Ed; 1931-32 El-Md
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1931-32 McA-Wo; 1932-33 A-Ed; 1932-33 El-Md; 1932-33 McA-Wo; 1933-34 A-Ed; 1933-34 El-Md; 1933-34 McA-Wo; 1934-35 A-Ed; 1934-35 El-Ma; 1934-35 McA-Wo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1935-36 A-Ed; 1935-36 El-Ma; 1935-36 McA-Wo; 1936-37 A-Ed; 1936-37 El-Ma; 1936-37 McA-Wo; 1937-38 A-Elm; 1937-38 Elp-McC; 1937-38 McT-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1938-39 A-Elm; 1938-39 Elp-McC; 1938-39 McT-Wo; 1939-40 A-Elm; 1939-40 Elp-McC; 1939-40 McT-Woo; 1940-41 A-Ewa; 1940-41 Fai-McC; 1940-41 McT-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1941-42 A-Ewa; 1941-42 Fai-McC; 1941-42 McT-Woo; 1942-43 A-Ewa; 1942-43 Fai-McC; 1942-43 McT-Woo; 1943-44 A-Ewa; 1943-44 Fai-McC; 1943-44 McT-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1944-45 A-Ewa; 1944-45 Fai-McC; 1944-45 McT-Woo; 1945-46 A-Fan; 1945-46 For-Men; 1945-46 Men-Woo; 1946-47 A-Fan; 1946-47 For-Men; 1946-47 Men-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1947-48 A-Fan; 1947-48 For-Men; 1947-48 Men-Woo; 1948-49 A-Fan; 1948-49 For-Men; 1948-49 Men-Woo; 1949-50 A-Fan
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1949-50 For-Men; 1949-50 Men-Woo; 1950-51 A-Fan; 1950-51 For-Men; 1950-51 Men-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1952-53 A-Fan; 1952-53 Fis-Men; 1952-53 Mia-Woo; 1953-54 A-Fan; 1953-54 Fis-Men; 1953-54 Mia-Woo; 1954-55 A-Fan; 1954-55 Fis-Men; 1954-55 Mia-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1955-56 A-Dro; 1955-56 Duf-Kat; 1955-56 Kel-Oak; 1955-56 Oak-Woo; 1956-57 A-Fan; 1956-57 Fis-Men; 1956-57 Mia-Woo; 1957-58 A-Fan; 1957-58 Fis-Men; 1957-58 Mia-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1958-59 A-Fan; 1958-59 Fis-Men; 1958-59 Mia-Woo; 1959-60 A-Fre; 1959-60 Gil-Mor; 1959-60 Nap-Woo; 1960-61 A-Fre; 1960-61 Gil-Mor; 1960-61 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1961-62 A-Fre; 1961-62 Gil-Mor; 1961-62 Nap-Woo; 1962-63 A-Fre; 1962-63 Gil-Mor; 1962-63 Nap-Woo; 1963-64 A-Fre; 1963-64 Gil-Mor; 1963-64 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1964-65 A-Fre; 1964-65 Gil-Mor; 1964-65 Nap-Woo; 1965-66 A-K; 1965-66 L-W; 1966-67 A-K; 1966-67 L-W; 1967-68 A-K; 1967-68 L-W
Edwin Association Minutes 1928-1981; Sub-district #101 Minutes Oct 6 1969-July 18 1978; Agent's Letters Dec 24 1928-July 15 1947; Cirrculars Spet 19 1969-August 15 1978; Correspondence Nov 7 1960-Sept 8 1978; Memo of Association and By-laws 1928-1953; Member Certificates 1947-1953; Newsletters Jan 1976-August 1978; Attendance records 1946-1962; Financial 1929-1983; Miscellaneous (correspondance, Grain Handling Commission, Crop Development and Seed Clubs, publications) 1951-1978; Membership Lists 1955-1978
Notes
Description by Jill Sutherland (2010)
The records for Edwin Association are unique in that more that just minute books were sent to the McKee archives
Forrest Association Minutes 1927-1991; Circulars April 21 1965-Oct 19 1981; Correspondance May 22 1927-May 25 1981; Documents Feb 11 1927-July 31 1969; Financial 1928-1968; Membership 1948-1969; Miscellaneous 1952-1980
Notes
Description by Jill Sutherland (2010)
The records for Forrest Association are unique in that more that just minute books were sent to the McKee archives
Reg Forbes was born September 16, 1924. He and his wife Clara have two children, Bob and Faye. Forbes served in the Royal Canadian Air Force as a Navigator during World War II. From 1945-1949, he attended the University of Manitoba where he received his B.Sc.A. While working as Village Councillor and as Secretary-Treasurer for the Pilot Mound Hospital, Forbes initiated the "Save the Soil Campaign," a soil conservation programme that became province-wide, between 1952-1962.
From 1956-1975, Forbes was the Principal of the Agricultrual Extension Centre in Brandon, where he reorganized the Adult Education Centre into the Agricultural Extension Centre. During this period, Forbes was a founding member of the West-Man Regional Development Corporation and a founder of the Manitoba Committee on Rural Leadership. He was also instrumental in the amalgamation of the Royal Manitoba Winter Fair and the Provincial Exhibition and in the resulting construction of the Keystone Centre.
From 1975-1977 Forbes was a Commissioner for the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission (Hall Commission/GHTC). Following his work with the Commission, Forbes was employed as the General Manager of the Provincial Exhibition of Manitoba (1977-1979), the Director of the Grain Handling & Transportation Section of the Manitoba Department of Agriculture (1979-1983), the Industrial Commissioner for the Brandon Industrial Commission (1983-1986), and as the Westarc Group Inc. Project Director for delivery under contract of Canadian Rural Transition Programme in Manitoba.
Forbes also held a number of voluntary and elected positions, such as Long-term Director and President of the Royal Manitoba Winter Fair and of the Provincial Exhibition of Manitoba. In 1970-1971, he was the President of the Agricultural Institute of Canada, and from 1978-1981, Forbes was the first chairman of the Agricultural Advisory Committee of the Canadian Broadcasting Corportation. He was also a member of the Canada West Foundation Board, the Brandon University Board of Governers (1974-1976), and the Federal-Provincial Transportation and Industrial Development Advisory Committee (TIDAC). Forbes is also a Fellow of the Agricultural Institute of Canada. In 1977, he received the Jubilee Medal and in 1987, he was given the Distinguished Agrologist Award by the Manitoba Institute of Agrologists.
Custodial History
Reg Forbes donated his working collection of briefs, correspondence and other documents relating to his work as a commissioner of the Grain Handling and Transportation Committee (GHTC) to the McKee Archives c. 1985.
Scope and Content
The majority of the collection consists of records created and received by the Royal Commission on Grain Handling and Transportation (GHTC). Included are documents detailing numerious hearings from all four Western provinces. In addition to the GHTC hearings, there are also a number of documents given to the GHTC as reference material. These include information on the Snavely Commision, documents for the province of Alberta, various reports, the Prairie Regional Studies in Economic Geography (No. 1-27) and General Information. The collection also includes two maps given to the GHTC.
Esther Moore was born in Norfolk, Nebraska and moved to Canada at age 3. There is a vague reference to her being related to the composer Dvorak in The Quill of 1913. She registered as a music student at Brandon College in 1909. In 1910, Miss Moore received a medal for sight-reading and accompanying in Edmonton. She took her examinations of the Toronto Conservatory of Music in 1910, and her Senior examinations in 1911. She completed her theory work in 1913, as well as finishing the academic requirements. In 1913, Esther Moore became the first graduate of the Music department at Brandon College. After graduation, Miss Moore taught music in Unity, as well as being the choirleader and organist. She returned to her home in Olds, Alberta for a rest from teaching. However, she was not idle for long. She took up teaching again, and she was the organist and choirleader at church. She also began a Glee Club. Between these responsibilities Miss Moore finished a course in the Household Science Department at the Olds Agricultural College. She returned to Brandon College to take postgraduate work, becoming the first Brandon College student to receive her L.T.C.M. in 1916. In 1922 Miss Moore began to teach piano at Brandon College. She received her Bachelor of Music in 1925, and her Master of Music in 1926.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Esther Moore’s records consist of newspaper clippings, recital programmes, concert programmes, and commencement programmes. As well, there are dance cards, invitations, tickets, and the programme for the annual Graduation Banquet for several years. There are Track and Field programmes and a ribbon. There are also Alumni Luncheon programmes for a few years. There is an issue of The Western Baptist from 1926, and the programmes for the installation of Dr. Robbins as President and the opening of the Arts and Library building and the J.R.C. Evans Lecture Theatre in 1960. There is also a letter from William L. Wright, director of the music department at Brandon College.
According to Henderson's 1935 Brandon City Directory, the First United Church was located on the corner of 8th Street and Lorne Avenue. The minister at the time was Reverend John H. Garden.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the Brandon Male Voice Choir dressed in tuxedos and posing before the First United Church's pipe organ. A minister (possibly Rev. John H. Garden) and three women in formal attire are standing in the front row.
Notes
Writing on the back of the photograph reads: return to Bob Hoffman, Box #1, Brandon, R7A 5Y6
Some pages in the scrapbooks have fallen out and some of the glued pieces are no longer attached to pages
History / Biographical
Dilys Collier (nee Pearce) was born 4 December 1937, in the Rural Municipality of Daly near Rivers, MB. Before studying at Brandon College, Collier was educated in Bradwardine, MB. Collier graduated from Brandon College with a Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Pedagogy in 1958 and 1959 respectively. In 1961, Collier married a Brandon College classmate, Clare Coburn. She spent much of the next two decades working as a homemaker and mother to her three children.
After she and her husband separated in 1979, Collier decided to go back to school. In the next ten years, Collier completed a Bachelor of Education degree (1980), a Bachelor of Social Work from the University of Regina (1982) and a Master of Education degree from the University of Saskatchewan (1987). Across her working career, Collier held many posistions including public school teacher, adult educator, social worker, researcher and personal counselor. Along with her work, Collier volunteered extensively with the Knox United Church and the Brandon Cooperative Nursing School. Through the years, she worked for a variety of organizations, including The Saskatoon Family Service Bureau and the REgina John Howard Society. Collier has lived and worked in Manitoba, Saskatchewan, Alberta, British Columbia and Swansea, Wales.
Currently (January 2017), Collier is retired and lives in Mission, BC with her husband of thirty-four years, Kenneth Collier.
Custodial History
The records were created and collected by Dilys Collier during her years as a student and alumna of Brandon College/University. The records were stored in her home huntil they were donated to the McKee Archives in 2013.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records created and collected by Dilys Collier as a means to document her life as a Brandon College student in the 1950s.
Included are three scrapbooks and two folders containing: newspapers and newspaper clippings from The Brandon Sun and The Quill, dealing primarily with Brandon College students, faculty and events; Brandon College administrative records such as the Clark Hall Rules, Collier's proof of registration records, her Brandon College acceptance letter, class schedules and exam timetables; photographs and programmes that cover events such as Freshie Week, dances and other student functions on campus; records documenting campus student activities, including the words to Hail Our College and various College Yells performed after student dances and other functions; decorations from fall proms and Valentine's Day dances, as well as Convocation (1958); programmes from various College convocation ceremonies; various cards Collier received, including those for her birthday and Valentine's Day; election advertisements, primarily for those students running for Student Administration "Stick" positions.
The collection also contains a green taffeta, net and rhinestone gown purchased by Collier to wear to some of the formal dances held at Brandon's Prince Edward Hotel.
Notes
History/Bio information was provided by the donor in late 2016/early 2017. Information on the green gown can be found on prairiehistory.ca. Description by Brian Erixon (October 2016) and Christy Henry.