Stuart Duncan Schultz was born on December 24, 1892 in Belmont, MB to Frank Albert Schultz and Margaret Maria MacPhail. He graduated from the Manitoba Medical College and then continued his studies with four years at the London Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons. Schultz served with the 226th Overseas Battalion of the Canadian Expeditionary Force (CEF) during World War I.
Schultz returned from England in 1925, at which point he joined the medical staff of the Brandon Hospital for Mental Diseases (later the BMHC). In 1942, he became Superintendent, and in 1959, he retired. During his time in Brandon, Schultz served fourteen years on city council and was Mayor from 1956-1957. He was also the director of the Brandon Schubert Choir for twenty-five years. Following his retirement Schultz moved to Winnipeg where he was the consulting psychiatrist for Stony Mountain Penitentiary.
Schultz married Jemima Meiklejohn Gibson on August 30, 1920, in Winnipeg, MB. They had one daughter: Sheilea Schultz Taylor.
Stuart Shultz died in Winnipeg, MB on August 10, 1974.
Scope and Content
Item is a portrait of Dr. Stuart Schultz, mayor of the City of Brandon from 1956-1957.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the Manitoba Historical Society website (http://www.mhs.mb.ca/docs/people/schultz_sd.shtml)
The City of Brandon (by decree of the Province) went to a ward system of government with the civic elections of October of 1971. Ten aldermen, who had to reside in their wards, were elected by the people of their wards. The Mayor was elected by the city at large. The previous committee system was abolished and individual aldermen henceforth had no specific responsibilities.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
George F. MacDowell was born in 1913, in Prince Edward Island. He studied at Dalhousie University from 1930 to 1933, but did not complete a degree. During WWII, MacDowell served in Canada and Europe as a member of the Royal Canadian Signals Corps. After the war, he returned to Dalhousie University, graduating with a B.A. in 1947. Subsequently, he graduated with a Masters Degree in Economics from Clark University in Worcester, Massachusetts. George McDowell taught at both Mount Allison University and the University of Alberta before coming to Brandon in 1957 to teach at Brandon College. He remained as a professor in the Economic Department until his retirement in 1979.
MacDowell's work was published in the Canadian Journal of Economics and Political Science. In 1971, McClelland & Stewart published his account of the Brandon Packers strike of 1960 titled "The Brandon Packer's Strike: A Tragedy of Errors." In Brandon, MacDowell maintained a relationship with the local Association of Fire Fighters, aiding them with collective bargaining procedures. He also served as Chairman for the MacKenzie Seeds Board, and was a member of the Manitoba Development Corporation Board.
MacDowell never married and had no known children. He passed away on February 26th, 1986.
Custodial History
This collection was in the possesion of George MacDowell until his death. It was then held by the Brandon University Department of Economics until 1997, at which time it was transferred to the McKee Archives at Brandon University.
Scope and Content
The bulk of this fonds falls into five main categories:
1. Records dealing with the Brandon Packers Strike of 1960 and the subsequent legal actions against the owners, including all 2215 pages of the Brandon Packers Strike Commission;
2. Records dealing with the Commission of Inquiry into The Pas Forestry and Industrial Complex, including the complete transcript of the inquiry measuring approximately 5m. This Commission dealt with the conduct of Churchill Forest Industries, a company owned by a Swiss financial firm, which, in the 1960's, was given approximately 93 million dollars by the Roblin Provincial Government to develop The Pas Forestry and Industrial Complex. Churchill Forest Industries and its parent company subsequently came under suspicion of fraud and accused of fradulently transfering The Pas Forestry funds into other foreign business interests;
3. Records dealing with business loans awarded by the Manitoba Development Corporation during the 1970's and 1980's to businesses primarily within Manitoba;
4. Records dealing with McKenzie Seeds, and McKenzie Steele-Briggs Seeds during the early 1980's when George MacDowell was a board member of McKenzie Seeds;
5. Records dealing with Professor MacDowell's career as a Professor at Brandon University, including records relating to his courses and to administrative activities.
To a lesser extent, this collection includes records dealing with the University of Saskatchewan College of Commerce, the publication the "Manitoba New Democrat," issues associated with politics, labor and union in the prairie provinces from the 1960's to the 1980's, articles from various economic periodicals including "Economica" and "Public Finance," a variety of government reports from 1941 to 1981, and records dealing with George MacDowells' relationship with the Brandon Firefighters Association.
Notes
File level inventory available. Description written by Mike White (2002).
Photograph of the Brandon College Literary Society Executive 1911-1912.
Back Row (L to R): F. Freer ’15 (Editor of Critic); H.E. Green, Theo. (Pres.Deb.Soc.); W.Wilkin ’13 (Reading Room Com.); J. Robinson ’13 (2nd Vice Pres.); and H. Wilson (Treas.).
Front Row (L to R): M. Reid ’14 (Pres.C.H. Lit.); K. Johnson ’14 (1st Vice Pres.); J. Evans ’13 (Pres.); and W. Speers ’13 (Sec.).
The Brandon University Student's Union (BUSU), Local 37 of the Canadian Federation of Students, was incorporated in 1969 as the students' organization of Brandon University. Its predecessor was the Brandon College Students' Association, which was established in 1899. BUSU is a not-for-profit society that serves to represent the students of Brandon University; all regular full and part-time students at Brandon University are members of the Students’ Union.
BUSU has several broad functions: they are a service provider that offers programs and support services to students throughout the year; they act as lobbyists on behalf of the student body at the local, provincial and federal levels, working with the other member locals of the Canadian Federation of Students, Canada’s national and provincial student movement; they represent the student body within the important, decision-making bodies at BU, such as the Board of Governors and Senate; and they provide funding for student clubs and organizations. BUSU is bound legally to the Brandon University Sudents' Union Constitution and Bylaws and the Universities Act of Manitoba.
BUSU draws on collected student fees to operate. Its administrative structure consists of a board of directors consisting of 11 voting members. Students elect representatives to relay their issues and concerns to the University community, the community at large, and all levels of government. A democratically elected council, made up of members from various constituencies on campus, oversees the work of the Students’ Union. The council includes four executive officers (the President and three Vice Presidents – Academic, Finance, and Student Activities), numerous commissioners, and one liaison. The work of the Students’ Union is also powered by the efforts and dedication of countless campus and community volunteers and staff. BUSU also has a voting student representative on the Board of Governors and Senate.
BUSU holds annual and semi-annual general meetings, full council meetings, and council committee meetings throughout the year. All meetings are broadly advertised to the membership and are open to students. As BUSU members, students have full speaking rights at any meeting of the Union, as well as voting rights at general meetings.
Custodial History
The records in accession 25-2003 were stored by the Brandon University Students' Union until they were donated to the McKee Archives.
Scope and Content
Series consists of records of Executive meetings, correspondence and financial records of the Brandon University Students' Union, as well as club records and copies of "The Sickle," "The Quill," and Student Handbooks. It has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) BUSU Executive and Council; (3) Correspondence; (4) Clubs; and (5) Publications.
Notes
BUSU is a separately incorporated organization from Brandon University's Board of Governors, but for administrative purposes it has been incorporated int RG 6 Brandon University fonds. Administrative information in the History/Bio field was taken from the BUSU website at http://www.busu.ca/aboutus.asp (December 2005).
Grace Rosina Magnacca (nee Jones) was born on November 22, 1922 in Cardiff, Wales. Her family came to Winnipeg in 1911. Grace graduated from Dominion Business College and worked at Stovel Advocate and NorWest Famer until she married Stephen Magnacca in 1927. Stephen Adolph Magnacca was born on October 12, 1902 in Winnipeg, MB and he received his education in the city. Steve's miltary career began in 1914 when he joined the Winnipeg Highland Cadets and for more than 50 years he served in both the active and reserve army. He was made Hon. Colonel of the 26th Field Regiment in 1967.
Following their marraige, the Magnacca's lived in Winnipeg with their children Patricia and Allan, until Steve's military career took them to Brandon. Upon arriving in Brandon in 1940, Steve opened the A4 Training Camp. Following the Second World War he was transferred from active service to the militia where he served as hospital manager with the Department of Veteran Affairs. After a year he left the position to go into business; his business interests included real estate, insurance and general contracting. Steve also served as Mayor of Brandon from 1962-1970. During his tenure as mayor, the new city hall, the Keystone Centre and the Western Manitoba Centennial Auditorim were constructed. He also worked on the development of Brandon's industrial park and the housing subdivisions of Kircaldy Heights and Riverheights. With her business background, Grace assisted her husband in his various roles.
Both Magnaccas were active in the community and St. Matthew's Cathedral. Steve was past president of the Manitoba Real Estate Association, later receiving lifetime membership. He was past president of the Brandon Lions Club, the Royal Canadian Legion Brandon Branch No. 3, and the Assiniboine Historical Society, as well as president of the Brandon Museum, a former director of the Canadian National Institute for the Blind in Brandon and a former treasurer of the Brandon Progressive Conservative Association. In 1973, Steve was named to the Order of Canada.
Stephen Magnacca died on August 4, 1980 in Brandon, MB. In 1983, Grace moved back to Winnipeg to be closer to family. Grace Magnacca died on December 20, 2004 in Winnipeg, MB. They are both buried at Brandon Municipal Cemetery.
Custodial History
As part of the Westman Oral History Collection, this collection was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. The original tapes from the Westman Oral History project were deposited in the Brandon Public Library. Copies of these originals were made by Margaret Pollex of the Brandon University Language Lab at the request of Eileen McFadden, University Archivist in the early 1990s. These copies compose the collection held in the McKee Archives.
Scope and Content
Item is an audiocassette tape containing an interview with Grace Magnacca about the history of the Magnacca family. Interviewer is Effie McPhail.
Notes
History/bio information from the records and obituaries for both Magnaccas. Description by Christy Henry.
Language Note
English
Audio Tracks
Media missing or recording not available.
An unexpected error occurred.
Update Required
To play the media you will need to update your
browser to a recent version, or update your Flash plugin.