The Senate Planning Committee conists of: the President or designate, who is Chair; the Vice-President (Academic & Research); the Dean of each Faculty/School; one representative elected by and from each Faculty/School; the University Librarian; and two students appointed by the BUSU Council.
The responsibilities of this Committee are to make recommendations to Senate relating to: academic program priorities; support programs for the academic functions; and the establishement of additional departments faculties, schools and institutes.
In 1985 the Senate Planning Committee was replaced by the Senate Planning and Priorities Committee. The composition and terms of reference for this committee are included in the Senate by-laws from 1985. In 2000 the Senate Planning and priorities committee was disbanded. Its functions were assumed by the Senate Executive Committee until the senate Planning Committee was re-established in 2003.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of agendas and minutes of the Brandon University Senate Planning Committee 1967-1985 and various files from the Senate Planning and Priorities Committee relating to external reviews of programs and areas within the University in the years 1985-1995, as well as a number of miscellaneous file some dating from the era before 1985. .
Notes
Information in the History/Bio field was take from the Brandon University Senate By-laws - Section VIII Committees of Senate.
Finding Aid
A file level inventory for the records of the Planning and Priorities Committee prepared by Alison McNeill Hordern is available with the records.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 6: Brandon University Senate
6.2 Committees of Senate
Related Material
Senate Planning Committee minutes for 1970-1973 are located in RG 6 Brandon University fonds, series 6 Brandon University Senate, sub-series 6.1 Senate minutes.
For biographical information onf Angus McPherson and Mrs. (Ella) Johnston McPherson see the description for Box 6 of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection. For biographical information on Thomas and Annie Pentland see the descrption for Box 10 of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
14.1 Account books [1906-1916]
14.2 Farmers pocket ledger [1935]
14.3 Mrs. Johnston McPherson - field book [1921-1944]
14.4 Account day book 1913-1915
14.5 Annie I. Pentland - miscellaneous records and accounts 1916-1934
14.6 Thomas Pentland account book 1917-1932
14.7 Thomas Pentland blacksmith account book 1882-1883
14.8 Angus McPherson account book 1916-1941
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
For biographical information on Hugh and Margaret McPherson see the description for Box 5 of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
For biographical information on Johnston and Angus McPherson see the descrption for Box 6 of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
For biographical information on Murray McPherson see the fonds level description for the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Howard Johnston McPherson, the oldest son of Angus and Ethel (Pentland) McPherson, was born on July 6, 1920. He graduated from Brandon Collegiate in 1938 and joined his father on the farm. In 1941, he joined the R.C.A.F. and trained as an air engine mechanic. Returning from Europe in 1945, Howard continued to live with his parents until his marriage to Jessie Walsh (b. March 21, 1922) of Sceptre, SK on June 18, 1955. Together they had three children: Muriel Ruth (m. Cody Johnson); Nancy Carol (m. Dennis Mauthe); and Donald Howard (m. Ann). The family farmed in the Brandon Hills district. Howard died on May 2, 2005.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
16.1 Hugh and Margaret McPherson account book 1879
16.2 McPherson Farm cash book (Hugh, Johnston, Angus) 1906-1912
16.3 McPherson Farm account book 1890's
16.4 Cash book 1953
16.5 Cash book [1943-1949]
16.6 Angus McPherson - Canadian Wheat Board emergency cheque correspondence 1949
16.7 Angus McPherson - insurance documents 1948-1950
16.8 Murray McPherson - agreement between SC Area #1 and District Association 1951
16.9 Angus McPherson - Canadian Wheat Board permits (8) 1944-1954
16.10 Angus McPherson - cattle inventories 1951-1952
16.11 Howard and Angus McPherson miscellaneous farm correspondence 1950-1953
16.12 Documents re: Angus McPherson estate 1951-1954
16.13 Income tax forms and documents 1945-1953
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Winnipeg, Man. : Warren Co-operative Elevator Association
Physical Description
1 folder ; 38 cm
Notes
By- law no. 5-- Schedule "A"-- Auditors' report-- Warren Co-operative Elevator Association operating account : for the year ended July 31st, 1950-- Board of directors' resolution-- Meeting of the provisional board of directors-- Warren : March 27th, 1948-- Warren Co-operative Elevator Association to the honourable the provincial secretary of the province of Manitoba
The series was created by the committee involved with the financial aspects of the winter and summer fairs, as well as the committee formed in the mid1960s to look into the feasibility of creating a complex that could house both fairs
Custodial History
The records were housed at the Inter-Provincial Exhibition, the PEM, and the MEA until c1986 when they were transferred to the S.J. McKee Archives at Brandon University.
Scope and Content
The series includes financial records, proposals for an arena complex, financial statements, economic evaluations, annual reports, and a ledger with names and wages in it.
Notes
Part of RG2SF4. Inventory of documents in the series is available in the printed finding aid.
Storage Location
RG 2 Provincial Exhibition of Manitoba Association fonds
RG2SF4 Miscellaneous
File consists of reference materials regarding university libraries in Alberta gathered for the purpose of planning the use and/or expansion of the John E. Robbins Library at Brandon University.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration &Finance)
Box 1
File consists of reference materials regarding university libraries in Ontario gathered for the purpose of planning the use and/or expansion of the John E. Robbins Library at Brandon University. It includes two photographs of Carelton University Library.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration &Finance)
Box 1
File consists of reference materials regarding university libraries in Manitoba gathered for the purpose of planning the use and/or expansion of the John E. Robbins Library at Brandon University.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration &Finance)
Box 1
DEANS OF STUDENT SERVICES:
R. BRUCE MCFARLANE (1968 - 1976)
No biographical information yet.
CAM CONNORS (1978 - 1982)
Campbell Connors was born in England and raised in South Africa. He came to Canada in 1963, and attended the United College in Winnipeg (now the University of Winnipeg). Connors had planned to return to Zimbabwai, but after the Declaration of Independence in 1966, he was unable to. Subsequently, he became a United Church minister in Russell, Manitoba for four years. In 1971, he was invited to head a special Mature Students project at Brandon University, and in 1976, he became that institution's Dean of Student Services.
TOM MITCHELL (1985 - 1989)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 5 Office of the Registrar, 5.1Registrar's files for biographical information on Tom Mitchell.
BETH WESTFALL (1989 - 1992)
Additional biographical information for Beth Westfall is located at RG 6, series 9 (Office of Extension).
On September 1, 1989, Westfall became the first female dean at Brandon University when she accepted the position of Dean of Student Services. Westfall left Brandon University in 1992 to accept a position as President of Keewatin Community College, in The Pas, Manitoba. At present (January 2007), Beth Westfall Davies is the Senior Education Administrator of Northwest Community College in British Columbia.
DARCY BOWER (1994 - 2005)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 5 Office of the Registrar, 5.1Registrar's files for biographical information on Darcy Bower.
JANET S. WRIGHT (2005 - July 31, 2008)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 7 Faculties and Schools, 7.2.1 Dean of Science for biographical information on Janet Wright.
DAVID ROWLAND (August 1, 2008 - July 31, 2013)
David Rowland is a native of Toronto, ON. He obtained his B.Sc. in Physical Education from Coastal Carolina University in Conway, South Carolina in 1997. He completed his Master of Education degree in Special Education at the University of Charleston in 1999.
From 2000-2005, Rowland was the Assistant Dean of Students at the College of Charleston before taking the position of Dean of Students at Mount Allison University in 2006. His term as Dean of Student Services at Brandon University began in 2008.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of correspondence and minutes.
Notes
History/Bio information on Cam Connor was taken from Connexion December 1971 and an article in "The Quill" (September 27, 1979). Biographical information for Beth Westfall was taken from articles in "The Quill" (August 30, 1989) and from the government of British Columbia's Board Member biography page on Beth Westfall Davies located at: http://www.fin.gov.bc.ca/oop/brdo/memView.asp?Member=142002 (January 2007). History/Bio information for David Rowland taken from the September 1, 2008 issue of the Quill.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 12: Student Services
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes financial statements of various kinds for McKenzie Seeds and combined financial statements for McKenzie Seeds and its subsidiaries, particularly McFayden Seeds. Chartered Accountants used for this purpose include: Marwick, Mitchell & Co., Webb, Read, Hegan, Callingham & Co./Webb, Read & Co., George A. Touche & Co., Oscar Hudson & Co., Morden, Sprague & Co./Laird, Sprague & Co., Edwards, Morgan, Halliday & Co., Welch, Hinton and Welch, McDonald, Currie & Co./Cooper Brothers & Co., Meyers Dickens Norris Penny & Co./Meyers, Norris, Penny & Co. and the Comptroller-General for the Province of Manitoba.
This sub-series also includes a number of purchase offers made to A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd as well as proposed plans to sell the company. Offers were received from United Grain Growers, Maple Leaf Mills, McKenzie Seeds Staff, Manitoba, Saskatchewan and Alberta Wheat Pools, and the Ferry Morse Seed Co.
Twelve ledgers, including branch order, mail order and cash registers, general ledgers, current ledgers, payroll sheets and branch daily cash reports, are also part of the sub-series. Other miscellaneous financial records and statements include information on McKenzie Seeds' proposal to the Manitoba Government for re-financing in the early to mid 1980's.
Notes
Additional dates for the records in the financial sub-series are as follows:
1. Prepared Financial Statements: 1907-1918, 1920-1923, 1926-1938, and 1942-1979.
2. Purchase Offers: U.G.G. (1959, 1966), Wheat Pools (1961), McKenzie Staff (1963),
Maple Leaf Mills (c. 1965), Ferry Morse Seed Co. (c. 1969-1970).
The extent of the ledgers in sub-series McS 1 1.5 (Financial Records) separate from the other
financial records in the sub-series is 95.9 cm. The financial records without the ledgers measure 60 cm.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Financial statements and records for the individual companies acquired by
McKenzie Seeds are located in Series III.
Information regarding the sale of McKenzie Seeds is located in Series II (Office of the President/GM), sub-series I (A.E. McKenzie), in the file entitled A.E. correspondence with W.A. Johnson. Some of these records are connected to the purchase offers received by McKenzie Seeds.