Box contains minutes geenrated by local MPE associations, collected and microfilmed by the central office. Rolls in this box include the following:
Roll 13: Oakbank 1940-51; Oakburn 1940-51; Oak Lake 1928-51; Oakland 1928-51; Oakville 1928-51; Osbourne 1927-51; Rapid City 1926-51; Pierson 1928-51; Pilot Mound 1928-51; Pipestone 1929-51; Poplar Point 1947-51; Portage 1927-51; Purves 1928-51
Roll 14: Rapid City 1926-27; Rathwell 1928-51; Regent 1927-51; Reston 1927-51; Rhodes 1928-48; Riverton 1948-51; Sandy Lake 1943-51; Selkirk 1947-51; Roblin 1926-51; Rossburn 1929-51; Roundthwaite 1928-51; Russell 1940-51; Ste Agathe 1946-51; St Jean 1949-51; Sanford 1927-51; Scrick 1944-51
Roll 15: missing
Roll 16: Starbuck 1927-40; Stonewall 1939-51; Strathclair 1947-51; Swan Lake 1928-51; Teulon 1940-51; Thorn Hill 1926-51; Tilston 1928-51; Treherne 1928-51; Vista 1940-51; Warren 1947-51; Waskada 1925-51; Wawanesa 1927-51; Wood Bay 1937-51; Wood Bay 1926-37; Wood North 1928-51
Roll 17: Side 1 Alexander to Birdtail Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Birnie to Cartwright Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 18: Side 1 Chillon to Ebor Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Eden to Fork River Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 19: Side 1 Forrest to Hamiota Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Harding to Kronsgart Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 20: Side 1 Landseer to Maples Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Margaret to Napinka Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 21: Side 1 Neelin to Purvis Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Rapid City to Silverton Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 22: Side 1 Sinclair to Warren Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Waskada to Woodnorth Oct 1951 – June 1957
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1935-36 A-Ed; 1935-36 El-Ma; 1935-36 McA-Wo; 1936-37 A-Ed; 1936-37 El-Ma; 1936-37 McA-Wo; 1937-38 A-Elm; 1937-38 Elp-McC; 1937-38 McT-Woo
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils and district advisory committees. The records include the following:
29. Sub-district #604 Nov 23 1993 – March 8 1999
30a. Sub-district #605 Oct 26 1995 – April 14 1999
30b. Sub-district #605 Oct 28 1993 – June 22 1995
31. Sub-district #701 Feb 10 1994 – Oct 15 1998
32a. Sub-district #702 Feb 10 1996 – June 29 1999
32b. Sub-district #702 August 23 1993 – Oct 10 1995
33a. Sub-district #703 Nov 4 1996 – August 3 1999
33b. Sub-district #703 June 14 1993 – Oct 21 1996
34. Sub-district #703 June 7 1993 – April 28 1999
35. Sub-district #704 Oct 29 1993 – April 6 1999
36. Sub-district # 705 August 10 1993 – Oct 16 1998
37a. Sub-district #801 Jan 13 1997 – March 15 1999
37b. Sub-district #801 Nov 3 1993 – Nov 27 1996
38. Sub-district #802 Nov 23 1992 – March 16 1999
39a. Sub-district #803 June 12 1996 – July 20 1999
39b. Sub-district #803 Sept 15 1993 – Nov 12 1995
40. Sub-district #804 August 6 1993 – July 19 1999
41a. Sub-district #805 Nov 28 1995 – July 22 1999
41b. Sub-district #805 August 23 1993 – Oct 2 1995
42. District Advisory Committee 1105 1999-2001
43. District Advisory Committee 1106 2000-2001
44. District Advisory Committee 1107 April-Nov 2000
45. District Advisory Committee 1108 Jan-Nov 2000
46. District Advisory Committee 1201 2000-2001
47. District Advisory Committee 1202 1999-2001
48. District Advisory Committee 1203 1999-2001
49. District Advisory Committee 1204 1999-2001
50. District Advisory Committee 1205 1999-2000
51. District Advisory Committee 1206 1999-2001
52. District Advisory Committee 1207 1999-2001
53. District Advisory Committee 1208 1999-2000
54. District Advisory Committee 1101 2000-2001
Photograph of the Neelin High School float travelling east on Rosser Avenue during Brandon University's Homecoming parade. The float won "best entry from the Westman community." Individuals on the float include: Rick Piche, Lynn Nicol, Susan Anderson, Karen Ashby, Jill Stewart, Jill Habing, Susan Medd, Felicity Adams and Wendy Muirhead.
Notes
Names and float information provided by Susan Medd.
This is an artificially created body of records dealing with four firms acquired by A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. An administrative history for each company can be found below.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Included within the sub-series are financial records, correspondence, merger documents, miscellaneous documents and records. Not all of the companies contain the same categories of information. This series is sub divided into each of the major companies acquired by McKenzie Seeds throughout its years of operation. The sub-series include: (1) Brett-Young/Sabetha Seed Companies; (2) Steele Briggs Seed Company; (3) Pike and Co.; and (4) McFayden Seends.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 3 Acquisitions
The Lovstrom locale first came to the attention of Dr. Nicholson through conversations with landowners Mr. and Mrs. Herb Lovstrom in 1985. Lovstrom is a multi-component archaeological locale located 25km south of Brandon overlooking the Souris River channel. The landowner’s surface collection and the presence of bone and artifacts in a cultivated field indicated the presence of one or more sites.
Limited testing was conducted in 1985 and 1986, followed by major excavations in 1987, 1988 and 1991. Eight sites of block excavations with a total of 132 1m2 excavation units were completed. The locale area extends approximately 500m north from the edge of the Souris Valley escarpment and over 200m east from the Jock’s Creek escarpment.
Physical and biological environment As has been noted above, the locale is bounded on the south by the Souris channel and on the west by the incised channel of Jock’s Creek and a till plain extends to the north and the east. This plain is characterized by buff colored glacial till with numerous rocks embedded in the surface. Surrounding these rocky knolls are dark-soil hollows where the various cultural occupations are found. The depth of the topsoil layer suggests a long term grassland cover with the present oak forest likely developing in historic times due to the elimination of bison grazing and the controlling of prairie fires in late historic times. A small cleared patch of farmland is found within the boundaries of the locale area. This area has provided a substantial surface collection of artifacts.
Present vegetation in the area is a mosaic of aspen/oak forest groves and mesic grass prairie that includes introduced species such as brome grass. In poorly drained areas, willow and red osier dogwood are present. The Lovstrom locale is found in a forested area dominated by oak with an under story of saskatoon, chokecherry, pin cherry, and hazelnut brush. Poison ivy is abundant as well as sarsaparilla.
The major faunal resources in Precontact times would have been bison, with elk and mule deer playing a minor role. Antelope may have been present also. Small animals included snowshoe hare, cottontails, porcupines and beaver. Canids, including wolf, coyote, fox and domesticated dog were present, as well as mustelids such as badger, mink, and weasel. Fragments from a fisher were also recovered in the excavations.
Summation.
The Lovstrom locale has eight sites. The sites were designated and excavated as Blocks A, B, C, D, E, F, G and H. Many of the sites are multi-occupations.
The Vickers materials are primarily confined to Blocks D, E, F, G and H. Vickers Focus materials overlie Blackduck/Duck Bay materials. Blackduck and Duck Bay materials are found in the lower levels of all excavation blocks and in most test units. The Vickers occupations at the Lovstrom locale, based upon ceramic wares and an overlapping of C14 dates, appear to have been contemporary with the Lowton type site to the east, near Belmont. A small protohistoric occupation was identified overlying part of Block D. Faunal remains are abundant with bison clearly dominating the assemblages. Lesser amounts of canid are present as well as small mammals including beaver, hare and mustelids. Small amounts of avian species are also present.
Publications
Nicholson, B.A.
2011 The Role of Pocket Gophers (Thomomys talpoides) in Restructuring Stratigraphic Relationships at the Lovstrom Site. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 35:323-331.
Nicholson, Bev, Scott Hamilton, Matthew Boyd and Sylvia Nicholson
2008 A Late Plains Woodland Adaptive Strategy in the Northern Parklands: the Vickers Focus Forager-Horticulturists. Invited Paper for Papers in Northeastern Plains Prehistory, eds. Michael G. Michlovic and Dennis L. Toom, North Dakota Journal of Archaeology Vol. 8:19-34.
Nicholson, Bev and Scott Hamilton
2001 Cultural Continuity and Changing Subsistence Strategies During the Late Precontact Period in Southwestern Manitoba. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 25:53-73.
Nicholson, Bev
1996 Plains Woodland Influx and the Blackduck Exodus in South-Western Manitoba During the Late Precontact Period. Manitoba Archaeological Journal 6(1):69-85.
Nicholson, Bev and Mary Malainey
1991 Report on the 1991 Field School Excavations at the Lovstrom Site (DjLx-1), Southwestern Manitoba. Manitoba Archaeological Journal 1(2): 51-93.
Nicholson, Bev and Jane Gibson
1990-91 Lovstrom Site Field Report, 1987 Excavations. Saskatchewan Archaeology 11&12:46-68.
Nicholson, Bev and Ian Kuiijt
1990 Field Report and Interpretations of the 1988 Archaeological Excavations at the Lovstrom Site (DjLx-1) in Southwestern Manitoba. North Dakota Journal of Archaeology 4:166-205.
Nicholson, Bev
1990 Ceramic Affiliations and the Case for Incipient Horticulture in Southwestern Manitoba. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 14:33-60.
Nicholson, Bev
1986 The Lovstrom Site: Culture Contact in Prehistory. Manitoba Archaeological Quarterly 10(1):35-71.
Scope and Content
The Series has been divided into nine sub-series, including (1) Survey (2) Block A; (3) Block B (4) Block C; (5) Block D; (6) Block E; (7) Block F; (8) Block G; (9) Block H
The Office of the Bursar was created in 1910. As head of financial affairs, a Bursar was more compatible to the administrative framework of other universities in Canada. The initial duties of the Bursar were the collection of all fees, control of funds and disbursements, donations, purchasing, supervision of grounds, and progressive measures in the investment of funds and the enlargement of finances. By 1913, the Bursar was also in charge of the book department, boarding, grounds and gardens, buildings and heating plant.
By 1924, the Bursar had become so involved in the management of College affairs that the Board established a committee to examine the functions of the President and the Bursar “with a view to readjustment for efficiency.” The committee presented its report later that year, clearly defining nine functions of the Bursar. These functions were the keeping of books, banking, general handling of student fees and accounts, general handling of all trade accounts, handling of maintenance and extension movement pledge cards and receipts, general responsibility for the purchase of all supplies, supervision of fireman and janitor, supervision of buildings and grounds and the submission of a monthly report to the Secretary of the Executive. In 1929, the Bursar took on the role of Secretary to the Executive.
At several times during the history of Brandon College the Bursar and the Registrar were combined into one job.
BRANDON COLLEGE BURSARS:
R.J. KENNEDY (1910 - 1911)
No biographical information yet.
S.J. MCKEE (1911-1913, 1914-1915, 1919-1920)
Information about S.J. McKee can be found under the heading MG 1 Brandon College Teaching and Learning.
C.W. JACKSON (1913 - 1914)
No biographical information yet.
JOHN HARRIS MCKEE (1915 - 1918)
J.H. McKee was S.J. McKee’s son. He was born in Ingersoll, Ontario. He moved to Rapid City in 1881 with his family. In 1890 he moved to Brandon where his father opened McKee’s Academy. Harris attended Brandon College, graduating in 1914. When the war broke out he was not medically able to participate. He then took a position as Brandon College Bursar. In 1918, Harris resigned from his job to take up farming. He had several bouts of bad luck: drought, grasshoppers, frost, and other farming catastrophes, and was not too successful, having a list of 50 creditors at one point.
GEORGE H. ROSS (1918 - 1919)
Little is known so far about George Ross. He was a teacher before coming to Brandon College. He taught in Chatham, Ontario for a while, as well as at the Rider Moore College of Business in Trenton, NJ. From 1914-1919 Ross was also the Director of the Business Department at Brandon College.
S. EVERTON (1920 - 1923)
No biographical information yet.
E. SCOTT EATON (1923 - 1931)
E. Scott Eaton was born in Auburn. He graduated from Acadia University in 1903 and the Maritime Business College in 1904. Eaton then taught at the Maritime Business College and the Charlottetown Business College. For a time he was head of the Business Department at Alberta College. Eaton was the owner/manager of the Success Business College in Vancouver before coming to Brandon College. He occupied this position from 1923 until 1931. In 1931 he became purchasing agent and the superintendent of buildings and grounds at Acadia University. He became an accountant at H.T. Warne Ltd. in Digby, NS in 1940. Around 1953, Eaton became the Town Clerk of Digby. Eaton died at the age of 80 around 1962.
M.S. DONOVAN (1931 - 1936, 1939 - 1948)
No biographical information yet.
N. KEITH MCKINNON (1936 - 1939)
Keith McKinnon was born in Weyburn, Saskatchewan. After working in Weyburn he attended Brandon College, specializing in Political Economy. He was very active in all aspects of students affairs and was elected Senior Stick in his final year. He was appointed to the position of Registrar following his graduation from Brandon College.
D.R. MACKAY (1948 - Brandon University)
Information about D.R. MacKay can be found under the Office of the Registrar.
Scope and Content
The Bursar series revolves around the finances of the school. There are invoices from general accounts, letters from businesses, and receipts for payments. There are also numerous student accounts, wage lists and letters regarding teachers’ salaries. The Bursar did a lot of the correspondence regarding mortgages, estates, property, and other legal matters. The series is mainly correspondence to and from the Bursar regarding accounts, overdue accounts, pleas for financial support and numerous other matters. As well, there are financial statements, fundraising lists, and subscription lists. The series is not broken down by Bursar, but instead is grouped together chronologically.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 3: Office of the Bursar
Arrangement
Series has been divided into seven sub-series, including: (1) R.J. Kennedy; (2) S.J. McKee; (3) C.W. Jackson; (4) John Harris McKee; (5) George H. Ross; (6) S. Everton; and (7) E. Scott Eaton.