Gerus came to Brandon University from the University of Manitoba and taught in the History Department 1968-1969 as a replacement for Charles Lightbody. Following his year at BU, Gerus returned to the University of Manitoba.
Scope and Content
Portrait of Oleh W. Gerus (History Department - Russian and Slavic).
Notes
History/Bio information from History Department website and Tom Mitchell.
Photograph shows W. C. Smalley, editor of the Brandon College paper, “The Critic,” sitting at a desk in the Office of the Critic.
Notes
Photograph appears to be a reproduction. There is a stamp in the bottom right corner and the following words in the bottom left corner of the image: The halls are wrapt in slumber deep/The wee small hours have come/But his weary eylids cannot sleep/"The Critic" must be done!
Vining taught Mathematics, Natural Science, History, and Physics at Brandon College from 1900-1918. Vining wrote the lyrics to "Hail Our College;" his wife Abigail wrote the music.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows Arthur Vining standing in front of the steps of either the Brandon College Building or Clark Hall.
Dr. Sweet was born in Dayton, Ohio. He graduated from Denison University, Granville, Ohio in 1889. In 1892 he graduated from the Rochester Theological Seminary in Rochester, NY. His first pastorate was in Adrian, Michigan, where he was ordained. Dr. Sweet served ten years at the Calvary Church in Minneapolis. In 1920, Dr. Sweet was appointed to a committee by the Northern Convention to inquire into the loyalty of schools to the historic faith of the Baptists. Sweet received his Doctor of Divinity from Denison University in 1921. He worked for the Y.M.C.A. during World War I in the United States and Overseas. After Dr. Whidden retired in 1923, Dr. Sweet was offered the position of President of Brandon College. He accepted the offer and arrived in Brandon with his wife and six children on September 10, 1923. Mrs. Sweet was a graduate of Mt. Holyoke College, and she had been a faculty member at Denison University. Dr. Sweet felt that Brandon was a call of God. He was inaugurated on October 11, 1923, and was readily accepted by students and faculty members alike.
His enthusiasm for fund raising was apparent, and he often took long trips in search of yet another subscription. He won the approval of the faculty, the students, the community and the Baptists. It was thought that Brandon College would prosper under the capable leadership of Dr. Sweet. Unfortunately, he died very suddenly at his home in Brandon on December 30, 1924. He was 55 years old. A funeral was held on January 3, 1925, and a memorial on January 7, 1925.
Scope and Content
Because of his short term of office, there are few papers left from Dr. Sweet. The collection includes invoices from Brandon College accounts, correspondence to and from the Bursar and Registrar, and Board of Director Meeting minutes. There is considerable correspondence from Dr. Sweet to various people regarding sermon topics, foreign missionary work, and his own faith. As well, Dr. Sweet was very conscious of the need for funds to run the College. He was very involved in the fundraising efforts of the College and the Baptists on behalf of Brandon College. There is also correspondence dealing with the MacNeill controversy in the early 1920’s.
Fleming served as mayor in 1905, 1906-1911, 1912 and 1913
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Item is a portrait of Brandon mayor John Fleming.
Notes
[Mr. Stuckey incorrectly noted the dates of Mayor Fleming's terms. John W. Fleming served as mayor of Brandon 1905-1906 and 1911-1913 (Barker, G.F. Brandon: a City 1881-1961. Altona: D.W. Friesen & Sons Ltd., 1977.).]
Report and resolutions of the Special Committee appointed to consider Socialist representation in parliament ; Committee on amendments to the constitution ; Fabian Society business meeting, March 8th, 1907 ; [Motion presented to] Fabian members' meeting January 8th [1909]
approximately 21 m of textual records;
3 file folders of photographs
Physical Condition
good
History / Biographical
Walter Leland Rutherford (Lee) Clark was born December 16, 1936 in Davidson, Saskatchewan. He obtained his B.Ed and B.A. from the University of Saskatchewan in 1959 and 1960/1961 respectively. In 1963, he received his M.A. from the University of Oregon and in 1976, his Ph.D. from the University of Alberta. He joined Brandon College in 1964 as a member of the History Department. Clark was a Lecturer and Dean of the Men's Residence from 1964-1967. He was promoted to the rank of Assistant Professor in 1967. Clark served as the Acting Registrar of Brandon University in 1967-1968. In 1976, Clark was promoted to the rank of Associate Professor.
Clark entered federal politics and was elected as a Progressive-Conservative Member of Parliament for Brandon-Souris in a by-election held May 24, 1983 and was re-elected in the General Election held on September 14, 1984. (From his election in 1983 to June, 1989 Clark was on political leave from Brandon University). Clark was re-elected in the 1988 election and left politics on October 1993 following the General Election of that year, in which he was not a candidate. During his time in politics, Clark served as Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Agriculture (1987-1989) and Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of the Environment (1989-1993).
Clark returned to Brandon University in 1994, as Executive Assistant to the President. He remained in that position until his retirement in 1998. Following his retirement, Clark and his wife moved to Lake Metigoshe.
Walter Leland Rutherford (Lee) Clark died on August 10, 2008.
Custodial History
Clark deposited his political papers to the S.J McKee Archives in the early 1990s. They were officially donated in 2007.In a second accession in 2009 parliamentary scrapbooks and teaching and research papers that had been retained by Dr. Clark were added to the fonds.
Scope and Content
Records include correspondence, information, records, press releases, newspaper clippings, booklets, brochures, maps and grants as well as other records associated with government between 1983 and 1993. A large part of the records consists of correspondence, especially between Clark, his constituents, and other members of the government. This correspondence covers all aspects of Canadian society and government departments, including but not limited to: Agriculture; Communications; Environment; External Affairs; Finance; Indian and Northern Affairs; National Defense; Prime Minister; Justice; Transport; Veteran's Affairs; Youth; Status of Women; Housing; Immigration; Industry, Science & Technology; Health & Welfare; Forestry; Fitness, Youth & Amateur Sport; Employment; Federal Provincial Relations; Consumer & Corporate Affairs; Secretary of State; and various other departments, as well as topics dealing with the municipalities that Clark served. Of these, the departments of Agriculture and the Environment are the most widely represented in these records, due to Clark's positions as Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Agriculture from 1987-1989 and Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of the Environment from 1989-1993.
The records highlight the political climate of Canada, and especially Western Canada, from 1983 to 1993. Many of the records relate to the affairs of constituents in the Brandon-Souris riding and cover a wide variety of topics. The collection spans the entire political career of W. Leland Clark, from the letters congratulating him on his byelection victory in 1983 to his final days in office in 1993 and parliamentary Scrapbooks covering his career as a member of parliament..
Records also include research and teaching files from Dr. Clark's career as a history professor at Brandon University prior to his election to parliament in 1982.
Notes
History/Bio information for W. Leland Clark was taken from Faculty of Arts personnel records and the Parliament of Canada website at: http://www.parl.gc.ca/information/about/people/key/bio.asp?Language=E&query=728&s=M (February 2007). Additional biographical information available in the biographical file for Lee Clark in the Archives Reading Room.
Approximately 10 m of records were culled. These generally consisted of books and records that were previously published and could be located in government libraries or various department records. Preliminary sorting, physical processing, description, and file level inventory of the fonds was done by Karyn Taylor from 2005-2007.
Access Restriction
As per Canadian parliamentary practice, Clark's constituency correspondence may not be accessed for 30 years from the accession date without the permission of the Archivist. Records will be unrestricted January 1, 2037.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.14 W. Leland Clark
Arrangement
The fonds are arranged alphabetically by subject, alphabetically by surname, numerically by day or year, or with no discernable arrangement pattern. In some cases, files have been divided because of overcrowding. A note has been placed at the file level description where this division has taken place. Some file folders were replaced, but the original titles were retained. Untitled files were given titles based on general content.