Berncie Caroline East (nee McDonald) was born on August 30, 1914 at Brookdale, MB in the RM of North Cypress. She attended Brookdale school, Brandon Collegiate Institute (BCI) and the Winnipeg Normal School. Her BA was achieved by corresondence and night classes from the University of Manitoba in 1963. As a teacher, Bernice taught at Tremaine, Brookdale, Minnedosa and Elton. Bernice married Laurence Overton East (1911-2003) on July 4, 1942. They did not have any children. The couple farmed in the Hunterville district until Laurie retired in 1976. They moved to Brandon in 1992. Bernice loved the oudoors and gardening, as well as square dancing and music. For a number of years, Bernice and Laurie kept a Bluebird line. The couple also enjoyed travel. Bernice was also active and supportive in community affairs, spending time as a Director on the Manitoba Agricultural Hall of Fame Board. Bernice East died on April 13, 2006 in Brandon, MB. She is buried at Rapid City Cemetery.
Custodial History
As part of the Westman Oral History Collection, this collection was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. The original tapes from the Westman Oral History project were deposited in the Brandon Public Library. Copies of these originals were made by Margaret Pollex of the Brandon University Language Lab at the request of Eileen McFadden, University Archivist in the early 1990s. These copies compose the collection held in the McKee Archives.
Scope and Content
Item is an audiocassette tape containing an interview with Bernice East about aspects of education in Odanah Municipality, 1880-1981. Interviewer is Mae Johnson.
Notes
History/bio information from the records and East's obituary. Description by Christy Henry.
Language Note
English
Related Material
OH044 Lawrie O. East
Audio Tracks
Media missing or recording not available.
An unexpected error occurred.
Update Required
To play the media you will need to update your
browser to a recent version, or update your Flash plugin.
Charles Lemington Norman "Lem" Shuttleworth was born on September 28, 1910 on the family homestead in the RM of Odanah near Minnedosa, MB. He attended school at Rookhurst, Moore Park and the Manitoba College of Agriculture. A farmer, Lem started his career in politics as Reeve of the RM of Odanah. In 1949, he was elected to the provincial legislature serving as a cabinet minister until 1959 for Agriculture and Public Utilities in the government of Premier Douglas Campbell. In 1965, he was appointed as a member of the Canadian Board of Grain Commissioners; during this perioed he chaird a committee conducting a complete revision of the Canadian Grains Act. Lem was appointed the first chairman of the Board of the Canadian International Grains Institute in 1972.
Lem married Charlotte May Sedgwick (1912-1981) on September 25, 1935 and together they raised two children: Elaine and David. The family lived on the home farm and although they moved to Winnipeg in 1953, they continued to operate the farm. In 1977, Lem retired and he and Charlotte returned to the home farm near Minnedosa. In 1982, Lem received a Certificate of Merit from the University of Manitoba for his contribution in the field of agriculture, and in 1996, he was inducted as a member of the Manitoba Agricultural Hall of Fame. In retirement, Lem volunteered at the Minnedosa Heritage Museum, was an active member of th Prince of Wales Masonnic Lodge, the Rotary Club of Minnedosa and the Minnedosa United Church. In 1995, Lem married his third wife, Mae Johnson. In 2001, Lem donated the family farm near Minnedosa to the University of Manitoba for research purposes. The land was subsequently known as the Shuttleworth Research Farm. Lem Shuttleworth died on April 13, 2006 in Minnedosa, MB. He is buried at Minnedosa Cemetery.
Custodial History
As part of the Westman Oral History Collection, this collection was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. The original tapes from the Westman Oral History project were deposited in the Brandon Public Library. Copies of these originals were made by Margaret Pollex of the Brandon University Language Lab at the request of Eileen McFadden, University Archivist in the early 1990s. These copies compose the collection held in the McKee Archives.
Scope and Content
Item is an audiocassette tape containing an interview with Lem Shuttleworth about his experiences in politics in Manitoba. Interviewer is Mae Johnson.
Notes
History/bio information from the records, the Minnedosa local history "Minnedosa Valley views" and Shuttleworth's obituary. Description by Christy Henry.
Language Note
English
Audio Tracks
Media missing or recording not available.
An unexpected error occurred.
Update Required
To play the media you will need to update your
browser to a recent version, or update your Flash plugin.
Charles Lemington Norman "Lem" Shuttleworth was born on September 28, 1910 on the family homestead in the RM of Odanah near Minnedosa, MB. He attended school at Rookhurst, Moore Park and the Manitoba College of Agriculture. A farmer, Lem started his career in politics as Reeve of the RM of Odanah. In 1949, he was elected to the provincial legislature serving as a cabinet minister until 1959 for Agriculture and Public Utilities in the government of Premier Douglas Campbell. In 1965, he was appointed as a member of the Canadian Board of Grain Commissioners; during this perioed he chaird a committee conducting a complete revision of the Canadian Grains Act. Lem was appointed the first chairman of the Board of the Canadian International Grains Institute in 1972.
Lem married Charlotte May Sedgwick (1912-1981) on September 25, 1935 and together they raised two children: Elaine and David. The family lived on the home farm and although they moved to Winnipeg in 1953, they continued to operate the farm. In 1977, Lem retired and he and Charlotte returned to the home farm near Minnedosa. In 1982, Lem received a Certificate of Merit from the University of Manitoba for his contribution in the field of agriculture, and in 1996, he was inducted as a member of the Manitoba Agricultural Hall of Fame. In retirement, Lem volunteered at the Minnedosa Heritage Museum, was an active member of th Prince of Wales Masonnic Lodge, the Rotary Club of Minnedosa and the Minnedosa United Church. In 1995, Lem married his third wife, Mae Johnson. In 2001, Lem donated the family farm near Minnedosa to the University of Manitoba for research purposes. The land was subsequently known as the Shuttleworth Research Farm. Lem Shuttleworth died on April 13, 2006 in Minnedosa, MB. He is buried at Minnedosa Cemetery.
Custodial History
As part of the Westman Oral History Collection, this collection was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. The original tapes from the Westman Oral History project were deposited in the Brandon Public Library. Copies of these originals were made by Margaret Pollex of the Brandon University Language Lab at the request of Eileen McFadden, University Archivist in the early 1990s. These copies compose the collection held in the McKee Archives.
Scope and Content
Item is an audiocassette tape containing an interview with Lem Shuttleworth about early days in the Odanah Municipality. Interviewer is Mae Johnson.
Notes
History/bio information from the records, the Minnedosa local history "Minnedosa Valley views" and Shuttleworth's obituary. Description by Christy Henry.
Language Note
English
Audio Tracks
Media missing or recording not available.
An unexpected error occurred.
Update Required
To play the media you will need to update your
browser to a recent version, or update your Flash plugin.
File consists of correspondence re: Bill C-33, fair indexing forpensions for federal civil servants, mostly from constituents who would be affected, form letters from federal government employees.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.14.1 W. Leland Clark - political career
Box 1
C. J. Barnes was born in Brandon, Manitoba in February 1884. His parents were native Nova Scotians who arrived in Brandon in the early 1880s. In 1884, the family settled on a homestead near the present town of Lauder. This homestead was sold in 1899, and the family moved to farm in the district of Medora. C. J. Barnes took over the operation of this farm in the early 1900s. He farmed until 1924. Barnes was educated in schools in the Truro School District and the village of Lauder. He was active in the original Territorial Grain Growers' Association.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned by the McKee archives in 1997. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Fonds contains a pamphlet written and published by C.J. Barnes titled Seventy Years in Southwestern Manitoba. The pamphlet contains an account of life in rural southwestern Manitoba from the 1880s through to the 1940s. The pamphlet is based on a variety of sources including diaries written by Mr. Barnes' father. Fonds also includes some hand-drawn maps not included in the published version of the pamphlet, as well as four letters c.1962, between C.J. Barnes and Rev. Robert Harvey in his capacity as a columnist for the Brandon Sun.
Box contains unbound Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Folders in this box include: unbound minutes of MPE Annual and Special Meetings 1976-98; Prospectus Nov 28 1997; MPE Annual Meeting Minutes 1990 and 1991; MPE Delegates Meetings 1989-1998; MPE Board of Directors Meetings July 16 1997 – May 19 1998; MPE Board of Directors Meetings August 20 1996 - June 18 1997; Agricore / AWP / MPE Board of Directors Meetings June 12 1998 – Oct 30 1998.
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1941-42 A-Ewa; 1941-42 Fai-McC; 1941-42 McT-Woo; 1942-43 A-Ewa; 1942-43 Fai-McC; 1942-43 McT-Woo; 1943-44 A-Ewa; 1943-44 Fai-McC; 1943-44 McT-Woo
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
1a. Sub-district #101 Oct 22 1997 – June 15 1999
1b. Sub-district #101 August 5 1993 – August 12 1997
2. Sub-district #102 August 3 1993 – Dec 9 1997
3a. Sub-district #103 Jan 27 1997 – April 14 1999
3b. Sub-district #103 August 4 1993 – Nov 25 1996
4. Sub-district #104 August 4 1993 – April 20 1999
5a. Sub-district #105 Oct 30 1996 – June 29 1999
5b. Sub-district #105 Oct 28 1993 – July 2 1996
6a. Sub-district #201 Nov 4 1996 – July 30 1999
6b. Sub-district #201 Sept 29 1993 – Oct 2 1996
7a. Sub-district #202 Oct 21 1996 – July 8 1999
7b. Sub-district #202 Nov 3 1993 – August 1 1996
8a. Sub-district #203 July 25 1996 – June 28 1999
8b. Sub-district #203 May 31 1993 – April 3 1996
9a. Sub-district #204 Nov 20 1996 – June 24 1999
9b. Sub-district #204 Oct 14 1993 – Oct 31 1996
10a. Sub-district #205 April 1 1996 – July 30 1999
10b. Sub-district #205 August 4 1993 – Nov 27 1995
11a. Sub-district #301 July 5 1996 – August 9 1999
11b. Sub-district #301 July 26 1993 – March 11 1996
12a. Sub-district #302 Jan 9 1996 – June 28 1999
12b. Sub-district #302 Oct 12 1993 – Oct 25 1995
13a. Sub-district #303 Jan 3 1996 – June 29 1998
13b. Sub-district #303 Oct 13 1993 – Oct 24 1995
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
14a. Sub-district #304 Oct 8 1996 – June 23 1993
14b. Sub-district #304 August 3 1993 – August 6 1996
15a. Sub-district #305 Oct 2 1996 – April 7 1999
15b. Sub-district #305 August 4 1993 – August 7 1996
16a. Sub-district #401 April 11 1996 – August 10 1999
16b. Sub-district #401 August 10 1993 – Feb 7 1996
17a. Sub-district #402 March 21 1997 – August 16 1999
17b. Sub-district #402 August 4 1993 – Jan 27 1997
18. Sub-district #403 August 3 1993 – August 17 1999
19. Sub-district #404 Nov 2 1993 – April 16 1999
20a. Sub-district #405 Feb 9 1996 – July 12 1999
20b. Sub-district #405 August 5 1993 – Dec 7 1995
21. Sub-district #501 Nov 4 1993 – April 8 1999
22a. Sub-district #502 Nov 16 1995 – Oct 27 1998
22b. Sub-district #502 August 3 1993 – Oct 3 1995
23a. Sub-district #503 April 8 1996 – June 28 1999
23b. Sub-district #503 Nov 24 1992 – Feb 12 1996
24a. Sub-district #504 March 13 1996 – August 18 1999
24b. Sub-district #504 August 11 1993 – Jan 4 1996
25a. Sub-district #505 July 31 1996 – June 29 1999
25b. Sub-district #505 Oct 27 1993 – April 11 1996
26a. Sub-district #601 Oct 28 1996 – July 7 1999
26b. Sub-district #601 August 10 1993 – July 18 1996
27a. Sub-district #602 Oct 24 1996 – Feb 15 1999
27b. Sub-district #602 August 31 1993 – April 3 1996
28. Sub-district #603 August 10 1993 – April 15 1999
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils and district advisory committees. The records include the following:
29. Sub-district #604 Nov 23 1993 – March 8 1999
30a. Sub-district #605 Oct 26 1995 – April 14 1999
30b. Sub-district #605 Oct 28 1993 – June 22 1995
31. Sub-district #701 Feb 10 1994 – Oct 15 1998
32a. Sub-district #702 Feb 10 1996 – June 29 1999
32b. Sub-district #702 August 23 1993 – Oct 10 1995
33a. Sub-district #703 Nov 4 1996 – August 3 1999
33b. Sub-district #703 June 14 1993 – Oct 21 1996
34. Sub-district #703 June 7 1993 – April 28 1999
35. Sub-district #704 Oct 29 1993 – April 6 1999
36. Sub-district # 705 August 10 1993 – Oct 16 1998
37a. Sub-district #801 Jan 13 1997 – March 15 1999
37b. Sub-district #801 Nov 3 1993 – Nov 27 1996
38. Sub-district #802 Nov 23 1992 – March 16 1999
39a. Sub-district #803 June 12 1996 – July 20 1999
39b. Sub-district #803 Sept 15 1993 – Nov 12 1995
40. Sub-district #804 August 6 1993 – July 19 1999
41a. Sub-district #805 Nov 28 1995 – July 22 1999
41b. Sub-district #805 August 23 1993 – Oct 2 1995
42. District Advisory Committee 1105 1999-2001
43. District Advisory Committee 1106 2000-2001
44. District Advisory Committee 1107 April-Nov 2000
45. District Advisory Committee 1108 Jan-Nov 2000
46. District Advisory Committee 1201 2000-2001
47. District Advisory Committee 1202 1999-2001
48. District Advisory Committee 1203 1999-2001
49. District Advisory Committee 1204 1999-2001
50. District Advisory Committee 1205 1999-2000
51. District Advisory Committee 1206 1999-2001
52. District Advisory Committee 1207 1999-2001
53. District Advisory Committee 1208 1999-2000
54. District Advisory Committee 1101 2000-2001