21 pages of textual records; approximately 4500 slides
Physical Condition
Excellent
History / Biographical
John Welsted was born in Norwich, England on December 6, 1935. In 1958, he received his B.Sc. from the University of Bristol. He obtained his M.Sc. from McGill University in 1960, and his post-graduate certificate in Eduction from the University of Bristol in 1961. He completed his Ph.D. at the University of Bristol in 1971.
In the early 1960s, Welsted taught at high schools in Midenhead, England and in Oromocto, New Brunswick. In 1964-1965, he was an Instructor in the Geography Department at the University of Bristol, and in the summers of 1965-1967, he completed fieldwork in New Brunswick and Nova Scotia. Welsted joined the faculty of Brandon College/University in 1965, as a member of the Geography Department. There he taught courses and served as Acting Head in 1968. John Welsted retired from Brandon University in 1997.
With his wife June, Welsted had two children: Alison and Ian. He later married Kathleen Georgison and became stepfather to Kjirsten, Paul, Peter and Hayley. John Welsted died in Victoria, BC on September 21, 2009.
Custodial History
The document was donated to the Archives on November 5, 2001 by Dr. John Welsted of the Geography Department. The slides were donated by Welsted in August 2006.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a paper, 21 pages in length, titled "Geography at Brandon University: 1962-2001."
It also contains human and physical geography slides of Manitoba and areas other than Manitoba. The slides were created by John Welsted as visual aids for use in his teaching and for use in publications by himself and the Geography Department. They constitute a unique record of the geography of southwestern Manitoba in the later half of the twentieth century.
Notes
All commercially produced slides were culled. An inventory by subject and by box is available.
A copy of Warkentin's convocation address can be found in the "Campus News 1987" file in RG 6, series 10 (Office of Development), sub-series 10.2 (Public Communications).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 6: Senate Office
6.5 Convocation Services, Baccalaureates Services, Banquets
Dr. John Everett Robbins was born 9 October 1903 in Hampton, Ontario the son of John and Gertrude (Brown) Robbins. He married Catherine St. Denis on 11 June 1934 in Ogdens, New York. John Robbins was raised in Darlingford, Manitoba. He attended the University of Manitoba graduating with a B.A. Hon 1928 and M.A.in 1929. Dr. Robbins completed a Ph.D at the University of Ottawa in 1935. From 1936-1951 he was Director of the Education Division, Dominion Bureau of Statistics.
Dr. Robbins helped to found the Canadian Association for Adult Education, the Social Science Research Council of Canada, the Humanities Research Council of Canada, the United Nations Association in Canada, and the Canadian Citizenship Council. In 1942 he became a member of the Board of Directors of Carlton University. Dr. Robbins was active in UNESCO work: he was a member of Canadian Government delegations to foreign conferences, and, in 1951-52, he spent a year as Director of an educational project for Palestinian Refugees in the Middle East.
In 1960, while editor-in-chief of the newly compiled “Encyclopedia Canadiana,” Dr. Robbins was asked to become President of Brandon College. From 1960 to 1967, he oversaw construction of the Arts and Library Building and Lecture Theatre, a Men's Residence, a Dining Hall, a Heating Plant, a Ladies’ Residence, a Music Building, a Physical Education Building and an Education Building. After the university charter was granted in 1967, Dr. Robbins was installed as the first President of Brandon University.
After his retirement from Brandon University Dr. Robbins was appointed Canadian Ambassador to the Vatican 1970-73. In the years after his departure from Brandon, he held many positions including President of World Federalists of Canada 1977-79 and President of the Canadian Writers Foundation
1976-78. Dr. Robbins served as Executive Chairman and Treasurer of Amnesty International in Canada 1973-75.
He was the recipient of an honorary LLD from the University of Manitoba (1967), Carleton University ( 1969) and Brandon University (1974). In 1994, the title President Emeritus of Brandon University was conferred on John Robbins by the Board of Governors of the University. Dr. Robbins died in 1995, at the age of 91.
Scope and Content
Dr. Robbins' administrative records are located in the Brandon University fonds.
Notes
Dr. John E. Robbins archival papers are held at the Library and Archives Canada.