Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley) Pentland, son of T.J. and Annie Isabel (McVety) Pentland, was born on October 21, 1889 in Justice, MB. He died on September 25, 1981 in Brandon, MB. Wesley married Harriet Mary Brownell on April 14, 1942 in Winnipeg, MB. They had no children.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
2.1 Income tax forms 1939
2.1a Wes Pentland correspondence 1911-1917
2.2 Moore/Thomas deed of land 1886-1906
2.3 Postcards ca.1900 - ca.1910
2.4 Correspondence 1911-1946
2.5 Oil leases (Rio Bravo, Canadian Superior, Imperior) 1949-1950
2.6 Livestock records 1947-1951
2.7 Orange Lodge speech and visitations [1939]; dividend certificates 1939
2.8 Automobile club membership 1937-1944
2.9 Life insurance documents 1919-1945
2.10 Mortgage documents 1914-1922
2.11 School records [1911-1913]
2.12 Mrs. Wes Pentland (Harriet) fur insurance policy 1948
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Thomas James (T.J.) Pentland, son of John Pentland and Jane Finnegan, was born January 4, 1858. He died January 8, 1919 in Justice, MB. T.J. married Annie Isabel McVety on July 22, 1885 in High Bluff, MB. Together they had six children: John Alfred (Fred); Henry Herbert McVety (Harry); Annie Ethel; Eliza Evelyn; Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley); and Mary Agnes Grace Isabel (Gracie).
Annie Isabel McVety was born at Seaforth, ON in 1859 and came to High Bluff, MB with her family in 1882. She died in October of 1938 in Justice, MB.
John Alfred (Fred) Pentland was born on July 5, 1886 in Douglas, MB. He was mortally wounded during the Passchedale campaign - 3rd battle of Ypres. He died on September 13, 1917 at Camiers Hospital, France.
Henry Herbert McVety (Harry) Pentland was born on November 10, 1887 in Douglas, MB. He died on June 26, 1948 in Brandon, MB. Harry married Mary Emma Irene (Irene) Fleming, daughter of John Jr. and Martha McLaughlin Fleming on November 22, 1913 in Brandon. Together they had three children: Harry Clare (Clare); Olive Eunice Irene (Eunice); and Shirley Margaret Marie.
Eliza Evelyn (Evelyn) Pentland was bon February 7, 1892 in Justice, MB. She died on May 28, 1986 in Brandon, MB. Evelyn married Norman Wallace Thompson on July 22, 1914 in Justice, MB. Together they had six children: Norman Cecil; Muriel Isabel; Norma Evelyn Jean; James Alfred; Marguerite Beryl; and Helen Elaine.
No biographical information available for Robert and Harry McVety.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
[no file number] Mortgage papers 1890-1907
10.1 Fred Pentland insurance documents 1912-1916 (includes 1914 mortgage agreement)
10.2 Fred Pentland correspondence 1910-1916 (2 files)
10.3 Fred Pentland postcards 1916
10.4 Harry Pentland correspondence 1916-1918
10.5 Harry McVety correspondence from Wes Pentland 1912
10.6 Evelyn Pentland correspondence 1910
10.7 Robert McVity correspondence 1920 (includes 1921 will)
10.8 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1930-1936
10.9 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland insurance documents 1917
10.10 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland income tax papers 1917
10.11 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland undated correspondence
10.12 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland corresondence 1882-1911
10.13 Annie I. Pentland insurance documents 1917-1937
10.14 Annie I. Pentland undated correspondence
10.15 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate correspondence 1917-1945
10.16 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate documents 1922-1931
10.17 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1928-1938 (3 files)
10.18 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1918-1927
10.19 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1917 (2 files)
10.20 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1908-1916 (2 files)
10.21 Annie I. Pentland income tax forms 1918-1921
10.22 Annie I. Pentland mathematics exam to enter Normal School August 1883
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series is comprised of various documents, agreements and contracts generated by A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. Among the documents are by-laws, letters of patents, land deeds, leases, transfers of property, grants of probate, trademark documents, certificates of title, incorporation documents, bills of sale, assets and liabilities, licenses to do business, loan documents, tax statements/certificates, insurance documents, memorandums, declarations, estate documents, releases, settlements, mortgages, and bill 87.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of one folder containing thank you letters to Prof. George F. MacDowell, Professor of Economics at Brandon University, and a long-time member of the McKenzie Seeds Board for his service to the company.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), MG 3 (Brandon University Teaching and Administration), MG 3 1.12 (George MacDowell fonds).
The Brandon Board of Trade was founded in 1883 to promote business activity and economic expansion in Brandon. Aside from these records, no other records of the Board of Trade are known to exist.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Sub-series includes the intervention of the Board in the 1910 municipal election in Brandon and a listing of the standing committee for 1911. The sub-series also includes a letter to Mr. Blanchard from A.E. McKenzie and a financial statement for the Brandon Commercial Bureau.
The A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. has had a Board of Directors since its incorporation in 1906. The first Board consisted of A. E. McKenzie, S. A. Bedford, the director of the Experimental Farm, H. L. Patmore and W. A. McCracken. Following A.E. McKenzie’s death, the government of Manitoba appointed the members of the Board under the arrangements made with the establishment of the A.E. Mckenzie Foundation.
According to the general by-laws (c. 1960) of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd., the Board of Directors annually, or more often if required, elected from among themselves a President, a Vice-President and a General Manager. They were also responsible for appointing an Assistant General Manager, and a Secretary and a Treasurer. If needed, they would also appoint an Assistant Secretary and an Assistant Treasurer. A majority vote of the Board was required for the election or appointment of the above officers. Those individuals elected or appointed to their offices by the Board could be removed at the pleasure of the Board. The Board also had the power to fix the salaries of all of the officers of the Company. By resolution, it could pass this responsibility to the General Manager.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This series consists of Board minutes/meetings, management consultant reports, financial records, documents and miscellaneous records.
It has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) Documents; (2) Minutes/Meetings; (3) Management Consultant Reports; (4) Miscellaneous; and (5) Financial Records.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes minutes of the Board of Directors of McKenzie Seeds, extracts from minutes of the Board of Directors, information on shareholders of the company, notices of Board meetings, suggested meeting agendas, the President's annual report for 1967, and memos regarding Board meetings/business.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Additional minutes for the meetings of the Board of Directors of McKenzie
Seeds, dating from the mid 1930's, are held in the Provincial Archives of Manitoba.
Minute excerpts for the Board of Directors are located in the Document sub-series in the file titled By-Laws for 1940-1985.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes financial statements of various kinds for McKenzie Seeds and combined financial statements for McKenzie Seeds and its subsidiaries, particularly McFayden Seeds. Chartered Accountants used for this purpose include: Marwick, Mitchell & Co., Webb, Read, Hegan, Callingham & Co./Webb, Read & Co., George A. Touche & Co., Oscar Hudson & Co., Morden, Sprague & Co./Laird, Sprague & Co., Edwards, Morgan, Halliday & Co., Welch, Hinton and Welch, McDonald, Currie & Co./Cooper Brothers & Co., Meyers Dickens Norris Penny & Co./Meyers, Norris, Penny & Co. and the Comptroller-General for the Province of Manitoba.
This sub-series also includes a number of purchase offers made to A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd as well as proposed plans to sell the company. Offers were received from United Grain Growers, Maple Leaf Mills, McKenzie Seeds Staff, Manitoba, Saskatchewan and Alberta Wheat Pools, and the Ferry Morse Seed Co.
Twelve ledgers, including branch order, mail order and cash registers, general ledgers, current ledgers, payroll sheets and branch daily cash reports, are also part of the sub-series. Other miscellaneous financial records and statements include information on McKenzie Seeds' proposal to the Manitoba Government for re-financing in the early to mid 1980's.
Notes
Additional dates for the records in the financial sub-series are as follows:
1. Prepared Financial Statements: 1907-1918, 1920-1923, 1926-1938, and 1942-1979.
2. Purchase Offers: U.G.G. (1959, 1966), Wheat Pools (1961), McKenzie Staff (1963),
Maple Leaf Mills (c. 1965), Ferry Morse Seed Co. (c. 1969-1970).
The extent of the ledgers in sub-series McS 1 1.5 (Financial Records) separate from the other
financial records in the sub-series is 95.9 cm. The financial records without the ledgers measure 60 cm.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Financial statements and records for the individual companies acquired by
McKenzie Seeds are located in Series III.
Information regarding the sale of McKenzie Seeds is located in Series II (Office of the President/GM), sub-series I (A.E. McKenzie), in the file entitled A.E. correspondence with W.A. Johnson. Some of these records are connected to the purchase offers received by McKenzie Seeds.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes reports from three management consultants: Harbridge House, Urwick, Currie & Partners Ltd., and Thorne Stevenson & Kellogg. As well, the sub-series contains correspondence between the President and Comptroller of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. and Harbridge House regarding the implementation of a management training program and plans to combat the weak field seed market. The Urwick, Currie reports deal with improvement in company operations and improvements in packet seed processing. The Thorne Stevenson & Kellogg report is entitled 'Implementing a Strategic Planning Process.' Each of the reports completed for the company deal with improving the business operations of McKenzie Seeds.
Harbridge House – this record is a management-training program designed to address a weak field seed market.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors