See fonds level description (MG 3 1.14 W. Leland Clark) for history/bio information on W. Leland Clark.
Custodial History
See fonds level description (MG 3 1.14. W. Leland Clark) for custodial history.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of correspondence, information, records, press releases, newspaper clippings, booklets, brochures, maps and grants as well as other records associated with government between 1983 and 1993. A large part of the records consists of correspondence, especially between Clark, his constituents, and other members of the government. This correspondence covers all aspects of Canadian society and government departments, including but not limited to: Agriculture; Communications; Environment; External Affairs; Finance; Indian and Northern Affairs; National Defense; Prime Minister; Justice; Transport; Veteran's Affairs; Youth; Status of Women; Housing; Immigration; Industry, Science & Technology; Health & Welfare; Forestry; Fitness, Youth & Amateur Sport; Employment; Federal Provincial Relations; Consumer & Corporate Affairs; Secretary of State; and various other departments, as well as topics dealing with the municipalities that Clark served. Of these, the departments of Agriculture and the Environment are the most widely represented in these records, due to Clark's positions as Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Agriculture from 1987-1989 and Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of the Environment from 1989-1993.
The records highlight the political climate of Canada, and especially Western Canada, from 1983 to 1993. Many of the records relate to the affairs of constituents in the Brandon-Souris riding and cover a wide variety of topics. The collection spans the entire political career of W. Leland Clark, from the letters congratulating him on his byelection victory in 1983 to his final days in office in 1993.
Sub-series has one sub sub series (MG 3 1.14.1.1: Parliamentary scrapbooks.
Notes
There are no files in this body of records identified by the following numbers: 31, 34, 110, 452, 453.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.14 W. Leland Clark
See fonds level description (MG 3 1.14 W. Leland Clark) for history/bio information on W. Leland Clark.
Custodial History
See fonds level description (MG 3 1.14. W. Leland Clark) for custodial history.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of thirteen parliamentary scrapbooks created by Barb Clark and Enid Clark at the request of Lee Clark. Scrapbooks include newspaper clippings from various newspapers, photographs, campaign and election materials (including Lee Clark, Barb Clark for School Trustee and other politicians), correspondence, cards, invitations, parliamentary reports, news releases, documents from Brandon University events, copies of Lee Clark's Ottawa Update, itineraries and other ephemera (programs, tickts, buttons, etc.).
Scrapbooks:
November 24, 1982 - June 11, 1984 (3 loose articles from February 1986)
January 31, 1983 - February 18, 1987
June 8, 1983 - January 7, 1985
June 21, 1984 - March 25, 1986 (additional loose materials in the back)
December 1984 - June 27, 1985 (all photocopies of newspaper articles)
April 3, 1986 - October 6, 1987 (additional loose materials in the back)
January 30, 1987 - January 3, 1989
June 4, 1988 - April 29, 1989 (additonal loose materials in the back)
April 8, 1989 - December 15, 1991
April 28, 1989 - August 11, 1990
August 3, 1990 - June 7, 1991
September 18, 1991 - February 29, 1992
January 2, 1992 - July 12, 1999
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.14 W. Leland Clark
Series has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) Dean of Science; (2) Science Faculty Council; (3) Faculty of Science publications; (4) Department of Psychology; and (5) Department of Biology.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
DEANS OF SCIENCE:
D.R. MOIR (1967-1974)
D. Ross Moir obtained his M.Sc. from the University of Manitoba and his Ph.D. from the University of Minnesota. He joined the faculty of Brandon College in the Botany Department in 1966. In 1967, he was appointed as the first Dean of Science of Brandon University. Moir resigned from the Deanship and his position in the Botany Faculty in 1973/74.
J.L. TYMAN (1975)
See MG 3 1.3 (John Tyman fonds) for biographical information on J.L. Tyman.
A.P. MIILLER - acting (1976)
A.P. Miiller was born in 1940 in Lampman, SK. He obtained his B.Sc. (engineering physics) and his M.Sc. (nuclear physics) from the University of Saskatchewan in 1962 and 1964 respectively. He received his Ph.D. (solid state physics) from McMaster University in 1969. Miiller taught in the Physics Department at Brandon Unviersity.
R.A. GILES (1977-1982)
Giles came to Brandon University in 1976, as a Professor of Physics, from Queens University in Belfast, Ireland where he served as Senior Lecturer and Assistant Dean to the Faculty of Science. Giles and his wife had four sons.
P. LETKEMAN (1982-1993/1994)
Peter Letkeman was born on February 12, 1938 in Haskett, Manitoba. He obtained his B.Sc. (Hons) from the University of Manitoba in 1960 and his M.Sc. in 1961 from the same institution. From 1961-1963, Letkeman taught science in Brandon, Manitoba and from 1963-1969, he was a lecturer in the Chemistry Department at Brandon College/University. He received his Ph.D. from the University of Manitoba in 1969, and completed post-doctoral research at the University of California in Riverside (1969). Letkeman was appointed Dean of Science in 1982 (the first year he was Acting Dean), until 1993/94. Following his service as Dean, Letkeman continued to teach in the Chemistry Department until his retirement from Brandon University at the end of February 2003.
He and his wife Mary had two children: Lorne and Myron. At present (January 2006), Peter Letkeman and his wife live in Brandon.
R.F.C. SMITH (1994-1995/1996 and 1998)
Roger F.C. Smith was born in Kapunda, South Australia on March 6, 1940. He attended the University of Adelaide and the University of Alberta, obtaining B.Sc., M.Sc., and Ph.D. degrees in biology. He came to Brandon University in 1973, where he taught in the Zoology Department. Smith was appointed Dean of Science for two short terms. He retired from Brandon University in 2004, and moved to Prince Edward Island.
Smith and his wife Ann had two children, Cameron and Jennifer. Roger F.C. Smith died in Charlottetown, PEI on June 16, 2019.
JANET S. WRIGHT (1999 - September 2005)
Janet Wright was born in Picton, Ontario. She obtained her B.A. Honors (Psychology) from Queen's University in 1977, her M.A. (Learning and Physiological) from the University of Guelph in 1979 and her Ph.D. (Social Psychology) from the University of Manitoba in 1987.
From 1979 to 1985, Wright held a number of teaching positions at the University of Manitoba and the University of Winnipeg. In 1986, she began working at Augustana University College. During her time there, Wright was employed as an Assistant/Associate Professor of Psychology, Chairperson of the Social Sciences Division, Academic Dean and Vice-President for Academic Affairs. Wright came to Brandon University in 1998, where she held the positions of Dean of the Faculty of Science and Associate Professor of Psychology until 2005. From 2005 to 2008, Wright was the Acting Executive Dean, Student & Interantional Affairs/University Registrar at Brandon University. In the fall of 2008, Janet Wright returned to teaching full time in Brandon University's Psychology Department.
AUSTIN GULLIVER (August 1, 2005 to July 31, 2011 - first year as Acting Dean)
Austin F. Gulliver was appointed Dean of Science for a five-year term by the Board of Governors on Febraury 23, 2006. Guilliver has taught at Brandon University since 1985, and was appointed Acting Dean of Science on August 1, 2005. He received his B.Sc. in Mathematics and Physics at the University of Toronto in 1970. His M.Sc. (1971) and Ph.D. (1976) in Astronomy and Astrophysics were also obtained at the University of Toronto. At the time he was named Dean of Science, he was also appointed as Brandon University's Dean of Research.
Scope and Content
There are currently no records in this sub sub series.
Notes
History/Bio information for Robin Giles was taken from the Summer 1981 issue of Alumni News. History/Bio information for Janet Wright was taken from the curriculum vitae she gave to the McKee Archives (May 2008).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
7.2 Faculty of Science
File consists of correspondence, memos, a newsclipping, and a copy of "W.U.S. 'Countdown' - or How I stopped Worrying and Learned to Love the Rochdale Freaks" by Don Adams.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration & Finance)
Box 5
File consists of a list of departments in the Faculty of Science, a notice of award from the National Research Council (P. Letkeman), a list of participants to attend Research Meeting, a copy of "Psychological Dimension of Physical Recreation" by Dr. E.J. Tyler, memos, correspondence, and news releases.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration & Finance)
Box 7
Sub sub series consists of publications created by the Faculty of Science or written by Faculty of Science employees. Includes: pamphlet on the Applied Disaster & Emergency Studies (ADES) program.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools