Original office furnishings of College Librarian's Office. L. to R. Barbara Ritchie (library staff), Ray Hegion (Library Staff), Professor Norma E. Walmsley (poli. sci., Chairman, Faculty Library Committee), Eileen McFadden (College Librarian), Lee Finch (Library Staff)
Student activity: Sticks of office used by Senior Stick and Lady Stick. c. 1919 – 1966 and later, housed in a display case in the Robbins Library Reading Room
John Dickson (b. 17 Mar 1854, Scotland; d.15 April 1926, Brandon) was considered one of Brandon’s pioneer dentists. Dickson immigrated to Canada in 1857, where he lived in Hamilton, Ontario, for a number of years. Dickson then came to Manitoba and operated a grocery in Chater before he studied dentistry, graduating from the University of Minnesota in 1886. Dickson settled in Brandon where he married Anna Louise Harrison on 28 December 1891.
The couple had four children: Mrs. Irving Cross [Mary Louise, b.20 Dec 1892, Brandon; d. 22 Oct 1981, Saratoga, NY]; Dr. John Harrison Dickson [b. 26 Aug 1894, Brandon; d. 17 June 1956, Killarney]; Dr. Stanley Rodgers Dickson [b. 18 Feb 1896, Brandon; d. 25 July 1963, Brandon]; and Mrs. Emile Baldeschweiler [Isobel Marion Coates, b. 13 Nov 1900, Brandon; d.?] of New York.
Sources: “Pioneer Dentist of Brandon in Dr. John Dickson,” Brandon Daily Sun 16 Apr 1926 and Manitoba Vital Statistics database.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the interior of a dentist's office with dentist's chair and sink, as well as shelves and a table lined with medicines. This office is possibly that of Dr. John Dickson who had his practice at 804 Rosser Avenue.
Notes
Writing on the front of the photograph matting reads: December 1906.
Very poor. Item has been broken in half on a diagonal from top to botton. Upper right corner is missing. Various tape stains and some tape residue on the bottom left.
History / Biographical
Lottie Louisa Currie was born on September 9, 1876 in St. Mary's, Perth, ON, to William and Eleanor Currie. She came to the Brandon area with her family in the 1880s. Currie worked as a bookkeeper and stenographer for Smith & Burton, from at least 1906 until the business ceased operations in 1917.
Currie continued working in bookkeeping and accounts, first for Brandon Gas & Power Co., then for the Manitoba Power Commission. She appears to have retired around 1942. She is not listed as living in Brandon between 1943-1945, but was once again a resident by 1947. Currie was a member of the First Presbyterian Church, a charter member of the Brandon Business and Professional Women's Club and in 1916, she passed her examinations for the St. John's Ambulance Association.
Lottie Louisa Currie died on November 25, 1972 in Brandon, MB.
Smith & Burton, a grocery store that also had mail order and china departments, was founded by E.B. Smith and John Burton in the 1886. It was housed at a few locations in downtown Brandon; their location at 829 Rosser Avenue is the one that mostly likely appears in the photograph.
Scope and Content
Item is a portrait of office employees at Smith & Burton, grocers. Lottie Currie, daughter of William Currie, is shown standing on the left.
Photograph shows the interior of Fred McGuinness' office at the Medicine Hat News. Fred is seen scribbling on a notepad at his desk. The newspaper was located at Second Street and Sixth Avenue in downtown Medicine Hat until it moved in 1981.
The offices of the President and General Manager were established in 1896 with the creation of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. These positions were held jointly by the one officer of company until 1975, when the Board of Directors of the Company divided the two positions, thereby relieving the President from management of plant operations.
Under the General By-Laws of the Company, the President, when present, presided over all Board of Directors meetings. He also signed all documents that may have required his signature and performed any other duties assigned to him by the board. The President exercised general supervision and control over the business of the Company and performed such duties as are usually associated with the office of President of Chief Executive officer of a company.
The General Manager had full power and authority to manage and direct the business and affairs of the Company. He was also responsible for employing and discharging agents and employees of the Company. After A.E. McKenzie gifted the majority of his company shares to the Government of Manitoba in 1945, the General Manager remained responsible for all operations of the Company. However, the General Manager found himself accountable to a Board of Directors comprised mainly of government appointees.
A. E. McKenzie held the offices of President/General Manager from 1896 until his death in 1964, at which time J. Lasby Lowes succeeded him. Following Lowes' retirement in 1968, A.R. Swanson was appointed by the government to fill the positions. Anthony J. Maruca became President of A.E. McKenzie Co. Ltd. in 1972. In 1975, the Board of Directors appointed William Moore the first individual to hold the position of General Manager without also occupying the President's office. At the same time, Mr. Pat Kelleher was named the new interim President. Following Kelleher's resignation, Moore was appointed President of the company. Keith Guelpa became President around 1984 following Moore's departure from the company to face criminal charges arising from his activities as an officer of the company. Raymond West assumed the position after Guelpa’s departure.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Series consists almost entirely of records and documents generated by the first two President/General Managers of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. In addition to the records created by A.E. McKenzie and J. Lasby Lowes in their capacity as President/General Manager, records pertaining to the various properties owned by the Company are also included. The series also contains marketing documents, including catalogues and sales literature, as well as a reference library comprised of twenty titles dealing with business and the seed industry and some records dealing with the President/General Managers following Lowes' retirement.
The series has been divided into seven sub-series, including: (1) A.E. McKenzie; (2) J. Lasby Lowes; (3) Comptroller; (4) Properites; (5) Marketing; (6) Reference Library; and (7) Miscellaneous Publications/Correspondence.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 2 Office of the President/General Manager
The matting has a large tear and some stains. The photograph itself has a couple of small stains.
Scope and Content
Photograph is looking southwest from the north end of the driveway and 18th Street and shows the Brandon College campus, including the front lawn, Clark Hall, the Brandon College Building and the Citizens' Science Building. Caption on the photograph reads: Brandon College: The Baptist College in Western Canada.
Portrait of Brandon College Caps hockey players and Manager Doc Hannah on the ice. L to R: Harry George, Don Sumner, Doc Hannah, Fin Campbell, Jack Scott.
Brandon College Orchestra. Back Row-L to R: Professor Fox, Hawkins, Professor Vining, Farrer, Fraser (Leader). Front Row-L to R: Dickson, ?, ?, E.S. Hopper, A.L.P Hunter, (possibly Mrs. McDiarmid, pianist)
The left side of the photograph is moderately damaged; all of the individuals in the photograph are untouched.
Scope and Content
Photograph of the Faculty of Brandon College taken on the steps of the College in October 1923, shortly after the Appointment of Dr. Franklin W. Sweet as President.
Back Row (L to R): Dr. T. R. Wilkins, Professor W. L. Wright.
Second Row (L to R): Professor J.W. Hill, Dr. T.M. Dadson, Dr. J.R.C. Evans, Dr. H. L. MacNeill, Mr. Crocker, Mr. Dennison, Mr.E. Scott Eaton.
Third Row (L to R): Mrs. Annie E. Wright, Dr. J.W.A. Stewart, Dr. F.W. Sweet, Professor C.H. Lager, Professor B.W.Hurd.
Fourth Row (L to R): Miss Jane M. Turnbull, Mrs. M. McManus, Professor R. Jones, Miss E. Magdalene Moore.
Bottom Row (L to R): Miss Grace Leeman, Mrs. D.A.C. Wilkins, L.S. Moffat (Ass't Principal), Miss M.K. Moffat