The Scholarships, Bursaries, Medals and Awards Committee of Senate consists of one member and one alternate elected by and from each Faculty/School, one member and one alternate elected by and from the Seante, and the BGS Coordinator or designate. Only in the absence of the elected members shall the alternates have full powers to participate as the regular member. The University Registrar is the Secretary.
The responsibilities of this committee are to: make decisions on the awarding of the various scholarships, bursaries, medals and awards of Brandon University and forward decisions to Senate for information; make recommendations concerning the addition of new schoarships, bursaries, medals and awards; make recommendations concerning the terms of reference under which scholarships, bursaries, medals and awards are to be offered and to ensure that these terms are adhered to in accordance with the donor's wishes; and to make recommendations concerning the monitoring of trust accounts related to scholarships, bursaries and awards.
Custodial History
Records transfered to the McKee Archives from the Senate Office, Brandon University on March 1, 1998.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of minutes of the Scholarships, Bursaries, Medals and Awards Committee, including reports to Senate and decisions to award scholarships; files detailing the details of scholarships previoulsy awarded by the University but currently not awarded; records concerning the awarding of Board of Governors Entrance scholarships; and records concerning various "awards nights" and "awards programs."
Box 1: Scholarship Committee minutes 1963-1967, March 1969 - May 1972
Box 2: Scholarship Committee minutes May 1972 - October 1974
Box 3: Scholarship Committee minutes November 19, 1974 - September 22, 1976
Box 4: Scholarship Committee minutes October 20, 1976 - April 30, 1979
Box 5: Scholarship Committee minutes June 6, 1979 - May 1, 1981
Box 6: Scholarship Committee minutes June 4, 1981 - May 4, 1983
Box 7: Scholarship Committee minutes June 21, 1983 - October 18, 1984
Box 8: Scholarship Committee minutes November 22, 1984 - December 11, 1985
Box 9: Scholarship Committee minutes January 28, 1986 - Nobember 25, 1986
Box 10: Scholarship Committee minutes January 15, 1987 - July 28, 1987
Box 11: Scholarship Committee minutes September 8, 1987 - Nobember 27, 1987
Box 12: General scholarship files 1959-1971, correspondence concerning Entrance Scholarships 1958-1967, 1971-1974
Box 13: Recipients - Brandon College and Brandon University Entrance Scholarships 1966-1967, 1974-1982
Box 14: Scholarship Committee files pertaining to scholarships and awards previoulsy offered but no longer active.
Box 15: Scholarshipe Committee files pertaining to scholarships and awards perviously offered but no longer active.
Notes
Information in the History/Bio field was taken from the Brandon University Senate Bylaws - Section VIII Committees of Senate.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 6: Brandon University Senate
6.2 Committees of Senate
Arrangement
Files within each box are arranged chronologically.
The Canada Seed Company was formed in 1913 by Mr. R. C. (Clark) Steele at Hagersville, Ontario with the intent to process and export farm seeds. However, in later years, the company branched out into the Garden Seed business. Early in the 1930's, R. C. Steele merged his company with the Steele Briggs Seed Co., which was owned by his brother Walter D. Steele. Following the deaths of W. D. Steele and E. F. Crossland, R. C. Steele was elected President of Steele Briggs.
A few years later, Vancouver interests took over the seed companies under Steele Briggs, including the Canada Seed Company. At this time, R. C. Steele retired from the company to form Steele Robertson Co., headquartered in Edmonton. W. D. Dack was appointed President of Steele Briggs. In June 1951, W. D. Dack took control of company operations from the Vancouver interests and, in 1961, the Steele Briggs Seed Co. purchased the Rennie Seed Co.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series contains the resignation of A.J. Maruca as an officer and director of
Canada Seeds Ltd. and a report on operating results for the nine-month period ending
February 28,1967. The remainder of the records in this sub-series are financial
statements prepared by Meyers Norris Penny & Co.
The sub sub series is divided into two sub sub sub series, including: (1) Financial; and (2) Miscellaneous.
Historical information regarding Canada Seeds Ltd. is located in Series 2 (Office of the President/GM), sub-series 2 (J. Lasby Lowes), Historical Topics file 10 (Tape 23) and file 11 (Tape 24) of the A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. fonds.