Published by Western News Agency Ltd., Winnipeg, (46 pp.)
Physical Description
9.25" x 6.75" (b/w)
Material Details
Small pamphlet containing photo essay
History / Biographical
Established as Sewell Camp in 1909, it was renamed after Major-General Sir Sam Hughes, Canada's Minister of Militia and Defence, in 1915. During World War I (1914–1918), more than 38,000 troops of the Canadian Expeditionary Force trained there. Many of the soldiers later distinguished themselves at the battle of Vimy Ridge, in April 1917.
Extensive trench systems, grenade and rifle ranges, and military structures were built in 1915 and 1916. A variety of retail stores on a double-avenued area close to the main camp formed a lively commercial midway. Camp Hughes was dismantled in the 1930s as part of an unemployment relief project.
The Camp Hughes Military Training Site, located at NE 34-10-16 W, 10 kms west of Carberry,
R.M. of North Cypress, was designated Manitoba Provincial Heritage Site No. 82 on April 18, 1994.
Custodial History
Donated by Earl Johnson, publisher of the Baldur Gazette, through the "good offices" of Fred McGuinness.
Scope and Content
Item is a small pamphlet containing 50 black & white photographs in a photo essay entitled: Ready for Active Service, Camp Hughes Manitoba.
Notes
McGuinness wrote about Camp Hughes and how he acquired the pamphlet in a Viewpoint column in the November 1, 2001 edition of the Brandon Sun. A copy of the article is with the pamphlet. History/Bio information taken from the Manitoba Government Exlpore Our Heritage Website at: http://www.gov.mb.ca/chc/hrb/prov/p082.html (December 14, 2009).
According to the Henderson Directories 1967 there was a Robert A. Miller who was the manager of the manager of the FM station at CKX but it is unclear if this is the same Bob Miller that is in the photo
Custodial History
See Fonds level description for custodial history
Scope and Content
Image of a man, Bob Miller. Original image has a label reading "(H&S)" it is unclear what this means.
Donald Ross MacKay was born in Weyburn, Saskatchewan. He came to Brandon College in 1936, and graduated with a Bachelor of Arts degree in 1939. From 1940-1947, MacKay served in the Canadian Army Canada and overseas. In September 1947 he was appointed Registrar-Bursar at Brandon College. During his career he also served as University Comptroller, Public Relations Officer, Director of Development, Secretary to the Board of Governors, Secretary of the Board of Directors, Secretary to Senate and Assistant to the President. He also served on the Brandon College Expansion Committee, the Hales Museum Committee and was the Chairman of the Athletic Directorate. MacKay retired from the University in 1984. After his retirement he served on the Brandon University Foundation Board of Directors. In recognition of his service to the University MaKay was presented with the Alumni Award in 1974 and with the Distinguished Service Award in 1981 for his contributions to society. MacKay's additional community involvement included the Centennial Auditorium Committee, the Brandon Schools Orchestral Band Association, the Planning Committee for First United Church - St. Paul's Church (what became Central United Church), the Manitoba Heart Foundation, the Kiwanis Club, the Wally Byam Caravan Club, Nitecappers and Northview Pools Inc.
MacKay's career at Brandon College and Brandon University was unprecedented in the breadth of administrative responsibility. As a result, records created during his tenure as Comptroller almost certainly also reflect his responsibilites beyond the Comptroller's Office.
Don MacKay died on April 2, 1990. He was predeceased by his first wife Gwen Dobie, with whom he had four children: Joan, Holly, Ross and Jane. He left behind a second wife, Mona.