Leonard Salisbury Evans was born on August 19, 1929 in Winnipeg, MB and was educated at the University of Winnipeg, the University of Manitoba, Simon Fraser University and the University of Ottawa. He was employed as an economist and a professor of economics before entering political life. Evans first ran for public office in the Canadian federal election of 1953 as a candidate for the Cooperative Commonwealth Federation in the constituency of St Boniface. Evans was elected to the Manitoba legislature as a New Democrat in the provincial election of 1969 in the constituency of Brandon East. He was appointed Minister of Mines and Natural Resources in the Edward Schreyer government. Later he assumed the position of Minister of Industry and Commerce. He occupied this position until the defeat of the Schreyer government in 1977. Evans was re-elected in the provincial elections of 1973 and 1977. Following the return to government of the New Democratic Party in 1981-1988, Evans held various senior cabinet posts. Evans served as opposition finance critic from 1988 to 1999. Evans retired from active politics with the 1999 provincial election.
Custodial History
These records were created during the 1990s and held in the Brandon East constuency office until they were brought to the S.J. McKee Archives by Drew Caldwell in November 2003. Drew Caldwell succeeded Len Evans as the MLA for Brandon East in the 1999 provincial election.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of correspondence between Evans and various constituents on a wide range of topics - personal and otherwise - and subject files on social, economic and political matters relevant to Brandon East.
Notes
Description by Tom Mitchell.
Access Restriction
Constituency correspondence closed for thirty years from the date of its creation.
Henry Hlady was born in Brandon, Manitoba on October 30, 1916, the son of Philip and Katherine Hlady, both natives of Austria. He was educated in public schools in Brandon. During the Great Depression, Hlady spent time - October 1933 to May 1934 - in work camps for the single unemployed in Riding Mountain cutting down tress and clearing bush. He sought to join the Canadian Army in 1942 but was rejected for medical reasons.
Hlady apprenticed as a carpenter with Sprattling and spent many years with Magnacca Construction before becoming a private builder. He retired in 1984 from the Manitoba Housing and Renewal Corporation where he was employed as a building inspector.
Hlady was a life-long Liberal in politics and an active trapshooter. In 200 he was honoured by the Brandon Gun Club and made a Life Member of the American Trapshooters' Association for his dedication to the sport. Hlady was also active with the West End Community Centre and a member of the Westoba Credit Union Board of Directors.
Hlady married Mary Plowman in 1943 or 1944. Together they had three children: Ronald, Judith and Lynda. Henry Hlady died on April 8, 2010 in Brandon, MB.
Custodial History
Records were in Henry Hlady's possession until his death when they passed to his wife Mary Hlady who donated them to the McKee Archives. Two photographs were in the possession of Hlady's daughter Judith Grievson prior to their donation to the Archives.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of various personal documents concerning Henry Hlady including a birth certificate (copy) and certificate of baptism (copy), communion certificate, public school records, certificate of medical rejection for service in the Canadian Army, newspaper clippings, obituary, and funeral program. Collection also includes documents and photographs concerning Hlady's time spent - October 1933 to May 1934 - in federal government work camps for single unemployed men in Riding Mountain, including a handwritten letter to E.S. Stozek (dated February 2008) about Hlady's memories of his time at Camp Seven and the other relief camps in the area.
Cedric Vendyback was born August 28, 1923 in Leeds, Yorkshire, England and was educated at Harehills Council School till the age of fourteen - then becoming a labourer. At the outbreak of World War II, he educated himself for aircrew duties and in 1942 came to Canada where he was trained as a fighter pilot and was commissioned as an officer in the Royal Air Force until demonbilisation in 1946. He flew as a Reservist pilot from 1948 to 1968.
After Training College, Vendyback became a teacher in 1948 and in 1953 began empirical training with Alex Baron as an actor and director until becoming appointed as Associate of the Drama Board, later a Licentiate of The Royal Academy of Music and Dramatic Arts. In 1963, he was elected a Member of the Guild of Drama Adjudicators.
In 1971, he was selected for and offered a position as a professor at Brandon University where he opened a new drama department in January 1972.
Vendyback retired in 1992 and currently (June 2012) lives in Kelowna, B.C., where he works as a free-lance director and lecturer.
Custodial History
Records were in the possession of Cedric Vendyback from their creation until he donated them to the McKee Archvies in 2011 and 2012.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records related to the activities of the Brandon University Drama Society (BUDS) and the Brandon University Drama Department collected by Cedric Vendyback during his years as head of the department. The Society performed plays in the then Drama Building, the J.R.C. Evans Lecture Theatre and the Westman Centennial Auditorium.
Accession 16-2011 (1972-1978) consists of a photograph album of photographs, playbills and related newspaper clippings for Brandon University Drama Society productions staged between 1972 and 1978.
Accession 10-2012 (1972-1985) consists of: production reviews from various newspapers and playbills for BUDS productions; a historical fact sheet provided by the donor regarding the Drama Department's service to the community; student evaluation extracts; and the course description for Play Production.
Notes
History/Bio provided by Cedric Vendyback. Description by Christy Henry.
Herbert (Bert) Goodland was born in Birkenhead, England in 1877 and moved to Canada with his parents James and Hannah in the late 1800's. James Goodland died in 1920 and is buried in Brandon, MB.
In 1900, Bert Goodland became Farm Manager at the Brandon Indian Residential School. He also taught Agriculture; a position he held until 1922. Goodland married Marjory Broughton in 1903, and they had one daughter, Dorothy, in 1908.
In 1922, the family moved to Alberta, where Goodland took on a similar job at an Indian Residential School near Edmonton. After his retirement in the 1940's, he and Marjory moved to Chilliwack, BC, where Marjory died in 1955. Herbert Goodland's last years were spent in Ontario and he died there in 1970.
Custodial History
Photographs were created/collected by Herbert Goodland during the period he taught at the Brandon Indian Residential School. The photographs passed from Goodland's wife Marjory to their daughter Dorothy and then to Dorothy's daughter Doreen Oke. Oke donated them to the McKee Archives in November 2011.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of 32 b/w photographs (some loose, some as part of album pages) of the Brandon Indian Residential School. Subjects include school grounds, buildings and students. There are also a few photographs of Brandon and one reproduced image of the Goodland family.
Notes
History/Bio provided by Doreen Oke. Description by Christy Henry.
Margaret Menzies was born on July 30th, 1920, at a family farm located in Oakburn, Manitoba. She grew up on the family farm and attended school in both Oakburn and Shoal Lake. She married Donald Menzies on June 4th, 1941. Together they had four children. In 1959, the family moved to Brandon, Manitoba, where they lived for the rest of their lives.
Margaret Menzies was a longtime and active member of the International Toastmistress Club (ITC), and was also involved in the Consumers Association of Canada, Seniors for Seniors, as well as being a member of the Liberal Party of Canada and the Central United Church. Menzies did not graduate from high school in her early years, but managed to continue her education and receive a bachelor of arts degree from Brandon University at the age of 70.
Margaret Menzies passed away on June 9th, 2012.
Custodial History
Records in the collection were brought to the S.J McKee Archives on July 13, 2012, by Gerald Brown, on behalf of the family of Margaret Menzies.
Scope and Content
Collection contains of two scrapbooks created by Margaret Menzies. The scrapbooks contain various cards, itinerary's, and other documents associated with Menzies' membership in the International Toastmistress Club. The items in the scrapbooks date from the mid 1980's to the late 1990's.
Also included in the collection are four local history books. The first is a 100 year history of the town of Oakburn, Manitoba, from 1870 to 1970, published during celebrations of Manitoba's centenniary in 1970. Next is a book about the history of the town of Shoal Lake, Manitoba, which was published in 1959 on the 50th anniversary of the founding of the town of Shoal Lake in 1909. The last two books are the first and second volumes of Ripples on the Lake, which cover the history of the Shoal Lake municipality from 1884. The first volume covers the first 100 years of the history of the Shoal Lake region, being published in 1984. The second volume was published in 2007, covering the history of Shoal Lake since 1984, as well as including new information that was not published in the 1984 version of the book.
Finally, the collection contains one photograph of Margaret Menzies receiving her bachelor of arts degree from Peter Hordern, dean of arts of Brandon University.
Notes
Biographical information provided by obituary entry in the Brandon Sun, June 16, 2012. Description by Tyler Warren (October 2012).
Cover of Young School minute book is moderately damaged, but pages are in good condition with only minor water damage and a few ripped pages.
History / Biographical
Dorothy Cox (nee Frost) moved from Elm Creek to Justice in 1946 to work as a schoolteacher. In 1948, she married Laval Cox and together they had four children: Larry, Herd, Rosalie and Heather.
In 1949, Dorothy and Laval purchased Gibb Gillespie's PSV business and began hauling grain, cattle and agricultural equipment. Dorothy went back to teaching in 1959, first at Justice and then Elton Collegiate. After retiring from teaching in 1978, Dorothy started a greenhouse, which operated for 21 years.
All six members of the Cox family were active in community events and organizations. Dorothy was involved in establishing the baby band in 1951; her sons Larry and Herb were members. Along with Laval, Dorothy was a leader of the Cubs in 1955-1956 and again in 1958-1959. Laval was the leader of the local hockey club in 1958, and of a bible study group in 1960. Larry, Herb and Rosalie were avid skaters in 1960-64. Heather and Rosalie were enrolled in senior grades of Sunday school in 1970.
Custodial History
Records were collected by Dorothy Cox, a resident of Justice, over a number of years. She donated them to the McKee Archives on April 4, 2012.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records related to the history of the Justice district. It includes a history of the Justice Church (1910-1970); minute and expense books for the Justice Hockey Club (1949-1966); a minute and expense book for Young Protestant School (1884-1898); a copy of the Justice 100th Anniversary community history (2009); and four color photographs of Justice Church.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the content of the collection. Description by James Heaman (2012).
Leonard Andrew Muirhead (1918–2008) was the only child of Andrew and Isabella Muirhead. He grew up on the farm homestead in the Summerville District near Carberry, Manitoba. He graduated from Carberry Collegiate when he was sixteen. He helped out on the farm for two yeas after graduation then attended United College, Winnipeg, and then Brandon College. Muirhead then worked in the Financial Department at Canada Packers in Saint Boniface until 1942. In 1942 he returned home and helped his father with the farm operation. Leonard married Verle Sinclair, a local schoolteacher, on October 12, 1951. They had three daughters: Iris, Gwen, and Arla. In 1965, health reasons made him give up active farming and he began an income tax preparation business as well as selling investments for Trust Companies.
Leonard Muirhead attended Brandon College for the 1937-1938 school year. This was the last year that Brandon College was associated with McMaster University as it then became affiliated with the University of Manitoba.
Custodial History
The papers remained with Leonard Muirhead’s papers until his daughter, Iris Muirhead, donated the papers to the S.J. McKee Archives in 2011.
Scope and Content
Collection consists primarily of 1938 examination papers from Brandon College, when it was affiliated with McMaster University. It also contains an exam schedule and a course outline. It contains examination papers from spring 1938 for the courses of 2nd and 3rd Years Physics 2y, 3w, Bible 2k, Psychology 2a, Mathematics 2x, Mathematics 1e, a syllabus for second term English 1g2a, and an examination timetable for spring 1938 for Brandon College.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from conversation with Leonard Muirhead's daughter, Iris Muirhead in October 2012 and from obituary http://passages.winnipegfreepress.com/passage-details/id-136216/(accessed October 24, 2012). Description by Jennifer Sylvester (October 2012).
The Leonard Muirhead collection is available at the Carberry Plains Archives. Leonard Muirhead also donated records related to Montrose School and Carberry 4-H Combines to the Carberry Plains Archives.
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, 7.4.1 Dean of Music for biographical information.
Custodial History
The records were collected during the course of Jones' career as a member of the School of Music and as Dean of the School of Music. They remained in his possession until their donation to the McKee Archives on June 29, 2011.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records created and collected during the course of Lawrence Jones' teaching career in the School of Music and during his tenure as Dean of the School of Music at Brandon University.
Records include: dean's log books; recital programs and related materials; personal documents; academic papers; planning documents; contracts; administration documents; workshop documents; teaching documents; proposals; reviews; evaluations; violin concerto by S.C. Eckhardt-Gramatte, piano score, edited by Lawrence Jones. Topics include: planning for the School of Music; Master's degree program; award winners; the music building expansion; adjudicating; the New Brandon University Trio; and the National Music Festival.
Thomas Russell Wilkins was born in Toronto in 1891. He received his B.A. from McMaster University in 1912, and became the Science Master at Woodstock College the following year. In 1916, he and his wife Olive moved to Chicago, where Wilkins was an instructor of Physics at the University of Chicago. The next year he served as a master signal electrician in the U.S. Signal Corps. During World War I, Wilkins completed pioneer research for the United States Navy, which led to the development of pulse sonar devices in the 1920s. He had also been researching the possibilities of a wireless telephone.
Wilkins and his wife moved to Brandon in 1918, where he took up the position of Professor of Physics. During his time at Brandon College, Wilkins introduced the latest technology to classrooms, designed the original Science Building, and along with the Brandon Citizen's Committee, seucured building funds for the Citizen's Science Building.
Receiving his Ph.D. from the University of Chicago in 1921, Wilkins resigned from Brandon College in 1925 to pursue postgraduate study at Cambridge University. In 1926, he began research at the University of Rochester, where he also took up the position of Professor of Physics. From 1930 to 1938, he acted as the Director of the Institute of Optics.
Widely known for his work in the fields of cosmic rays and atomic disintegration, in April 1939, Wilkins announced the perfection of a camera that was able to record the "footprints" of invisible atoms after they collide. In October 1939, he received a medal from the Royal Photographic Society of Great Britain recognizing his work regarding the use of photographic emulsions in the study of radium. The following year, Wilkins perfected a camera that could determine the energy levels inside the nuclei of stable chemical elements. He received a grant from Sigma Xi, the National Society for the Promotion of Scientific Research, in November of 1940.
Wilkins married twice. The first marriage, to Olive Anges Cross took place on June 17, 1913. Olive Wilkins died suddenly on May 13, 1937, at the age of 45. Wilkins married Susan Gwendolyn Whidden, the daughter of former Brandon College president Dr. H.P. Whidden, in 1938.
Thomas Russell Wilkins died suddenly of a heart attack on December 10, 1940, on his way back to his laboratory after a faculty meeting. He was 49 years old.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
T. Russell Wilkins’ reocrds contain correspondence between himself and Mrs. Wilkins and Dr. Whidden concerning their employment with Brandon College. There are letters between the two men regarding the building of the Science Building in 1920. There is also a copy of the Canadian Baptist. Besides programmes and a picture, there is also correspondence between various people. Dr. Wilkins kept the papers he had written for various classes at McMaster University in the years 1911 and 1912. There is a "toast to the ladies" that he delivered at a banquet of some sort, that gives an interesting view on how Wilkins, and possibly other men of his time, viewed women. There are numerous newspapers clippings, and several pages taken from journals such as Popular Mechanics, Popular Electricity and others. Dr. Wilkins was at the top of his field of study. He was an extremely bright man who managed to create some very useful tools of science. His papers are interesting and informative to read.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from Campus News May 1990
A biography of Olive Agnes Cross Wilkins can be found under the RG 1 Brandon College fonds, BC 9 Clark Hall women’s residence.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records collected by Olive Wilkins during her tenure at Brandon College. The ephemra in the collection includes: play programmes; recital programmes; two photo postcards; invitations; dance cards; place cards; and a necklace. Collection also contains the Treasurer’s Book for the Patriotic Committee (Clark Hall Literary Society 1917-1918) and departmental reports for Clark Hall, the Resident Master, the Music, Business, Academic, and Commercial departments.
30 photographs -- 25 at 3.5" x 8" (color and b/w); 5 at 8" x 10" (b/w); 3 magnets; 1 plaque (8 x 3 cm)
History / Biographical
See RG 6, series 1 (Office of the Chancellor) for biographical information on Stanley Knowles.
Custodial History
This collection was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1997. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Collection contains photographs and memorabilia from Stanley Knowles' political career, and his time at Brandon University. Included are pictures of Knowles with Pierre Trudeau, Queen Elizebeth, Ed Broadbent, and other national political figures. However, the majority of the pictures have to do with the time Knowles spent at Brandon University later in his life, serving as Chancellor. These pictures depict Knowles addressing crowds and attending conferences. Of the three magnets included, two are pictures of Knowles late in life, while the third is a cartoonish representation of him. The plaque is a recreation of a campaign slogan from very early in Knowles' political career.
Notes
Description written by Mike White or Robyn Mitchell (2002).