Gilbert Plains Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Organizational papers: 1936 - 1955 Agreement between Gilbert Plains CEAL and MPEL, 15 October 1936 By-law no. 16, 30 October 1939 By-law no. 16 (signed later), 1 November 1939 By-law to authorize cancellation of capital, 28 October 1940 Agreement for sale between MPEL and Gilbert Plains CEAL Memo re to authorize cancellation of capital, 24 March 1941 General By-laws and By-laws 18, 19, and 20, 4 July 1941 Memo of repeal By-law no. 19, no date Letter re Agreement for sale, 14 March 1944 Letter Agreement, 19 June 1944 Draft resolutions for special meetings (By-law no. 21), 13 November 1947 By-law no. 22, 14 November 1949 Letter re By-law no. 22, 7 March 1950 Agreement between Gilbert CEA and MPE, 1 August 1951 Agreement between Gilbert Plains CEA and MPE, 1 August 1953 Agreement between Gilbert Plains CEA and MPE, 1 August 1955 Directors' Resolution, 18 October 1961 Minutes of Executive Board meetings, volume 1, 21 August 1926 - volume 5, 3 October 1968 Minutes of Shareholders Annual meetings, 1947 - 1963 (3 reports) Financial records and statistics Statement of surplus, 1938 - 1955 (7 reports) Final statements, 1931 - 1947 (12 reports) Auditors' reports, 1941 - 1957 (10 reports) Analysis of Operating Results, 1953 - 1962 (3 reports) Surplus Repayment, 1933 - 1936 (1 report) Financial Statements, 1952 Correspondence, 1946 - 1957 Membership list, 1946 - 1961 Miscellaneous Building costs - Montgomery House, 1964 Bills from Gilbert Plains Consumers Co-op, 1964 Lumber supply estimates, rough sheets Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Gilbert Plains
Speeches and addresses given by executives of the Manitoba Wheat Pool and MPE as well as argricultural experts and supporters of the co-operative movement helped to spread and solidify support for the Pools. They also served to educate rural members on a variety of topics. See fonds level description of RG 4 for complete history/bio of MPE.
Scope and Content
Sub-series MPE B.8 consists of speeches made by various important members and executives of Manitoba Pool Elevators. Records include the following:
1a. Addresses 1930 -1946
1b. Addresses 1946 -1954
2. Addresses 1954 -1960
3. Addresses 1969 -1975
4a. Addresses 1972 -1979
4b. Addresses 1972 -1979
5a. F.W. Hamilton Speeches 1967 -1973
5b. F.W. Hamilton Speeches 1962 -1966
5c. F.W. Hamilton Speeches 1960 -1962
5d. F.W. Hamilton Speeches 1949 -1960
6a. W.J. Parker Speeches 1945
6b. W.J. Parker Speeches 1940 -1944
7a. W.J. Parker Speeches 1948 -1950
7b. W.J. Parker Speeches 1946 -1948
8a. W.J. Parker Speeches 1954 -1958
8b. W.J. Parker Speeches 1951 -1954
9a. W.J. Parker Speeches 1968 -1970
9b. W.J. Parker Speeches 1960 -1967
10. F.W. Ransom Addresses 1942 - 1948
11. Miscellaneous Addresses 1948 - 1955; no dates
12. Miscellaneous Addresses 1960; no dates
13. E.S. Russenholt Addresses
14. V. Martens " The Implications of Including Protein in Segregrating Canadian Wheat"
Pool Insurance Limited was created in 1939 and re-incorporated at Pool Insurance Company in 1940. It was designed to internalize some of the insurance risk of MPE, which had previously been carried by an extenal company.
Co-operative Life Insurance Company was formed in 1945 to offer pool members affordable life insurance tailored to their lives as producers.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of documents and minutes.
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
79a. Cromer 1978-1980
79b. Cromer 1977-1978
80a. Dauphin 1977-1978
80b. Dunrea 1977-1980
81a. Gladstone March 1 1979 – Nov 24 1980
81b. Gladstone Feb 2 1977 – Jan 17 1979
82. Edwin Jan 10 1977 – March 3 1981
83a. Isabella Feb 4 1977 – August 28 1980
83b. Lauder April 20 1979 – Nov 13 1980
84. Lyleton Dec 13 1977 – Nov 24 1978
85a. Jordan April 2 1979 – Dec 11 1980
85b. Jordan Jan 31 1977 – Feb 26 1979
86. Moore Park Jan 4 1977 – April 11 1979
87a. Napinka Jan 17 1977 – Nov 14 1980
87b. Nesbitt Feb 8 1979 – Nov 27 1980
87c. Nesbitt Jan 6 1977 – Dec 18 1978
87d. Ninga Feb 16 1977 – July 28 1980
88a. Pierson Dec 20 1978 – Nov 26 1980
88b. Pierson Jan 20 1977 – Dec 20 1978
89a. Souris Jan 10 1975 – Nov 30 1976
89b. Sperling May 8 1978 – Dec 10 1980
89c. Sperling March 21 1977 – Jan 31 1979
90. Tilston June 9 1977 – Nov 16 1978
91. Waskada Jan 10 1977 – Dec 12 1980
92. Bradwardine Feb 11 1981 – Nov 16 1981
93. Cromer Jan 13 1981 – Nov 27 1981
94a. Dunrea Sept 23 1985 – Nov 27 1989
94b. Dunrea March 24 1981 – Feb 14 1985
95a. Beresford July 31 1986 – Nov 14 1986
95b. Beresford Jan 13 1981 – April 3 1986
96a. Gladstone Nov 19 1986 – Nov 28 1989
96b. Gladstone Nov 3 1983 – Oct 11 1986
96c. Gladstone Jan 23 1981 – Jan 4 1984
Border Fertilizers Ltd was a parnership agreement between the Pool and M.G. Smerchanski to provide better fertilizer services to Pool members. MPE entered the agreement in 1963 but sold their shares in 1969 due to heavy losses.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of legal documents, financial statements, proposals and reports.
Co-enerco was a co-operative energy company that resulted from the Co-operative Resources Project.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of records pertaining to the formation of Co-enerco.
Manitoba Pool Elevators was a part of and associated with many other producer co-operatives in Manitoba.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
.This sub-series consists of records from the following co-operative organizations: Canadian Poultry Pool Ltd, Canadian Poutry Sales, Manitoba Co-operative Poultry Marketing Association, Manitoba Dairy and Poultry Co-operative Ltd, The Co-operative Promotion Board, Manitoba Fish Products, Pool Co-operative Seed Association, XCAN Grain Pool
Records for the above organizations may include but do not necessarily include the following: financial records, minutes, correpondence, reports, addresses, and memoranda.
Notes
Description by Jillian Sutherland (2010)
Original order in this sub-series was rearranged by Eileen McFadden. The order established by her has been left intact.
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1949-50 For-Men; 1949-50 Men-Woo; 1950-51 A-Fan; 1950-51 For-Men; 1950-51 Men-Woo
CSP Foods Ltd resulted from an amalgamtion of Co-op Vegetable Oils Ltd with MPE in 1975. The company operated crushing plants in Altona, Manitoba and in Saskatchewan, and was overseen by members of MPE and the Sask Wheat Pool.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of minutes, correspondence, reports, and promotional materials.
Notes
Description by Jillian Sutherland (2010)
History taken from F.W. Hamilton's "Service at Cost"
As the Manitoba Pool Elevators grew as a co-operative organizations and later a corporation, it aquired subsidiary companies and became involved with other co-operative organizations. These various companies were usually acquired or formed to either reach out to other types of producers in Manitoba or to assist Pool members. MPE was also involved with larger umbrella or subsidiary co-operative organizations.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This series has been divided into nine sub-series, including: (1) Border Fertilizer Ltd., (2) Co-enerco, (3) CSP Foods, (4) Co-op Farm Implements, (5) Co-operative Life Insurance Co. & Pool Insurance Ltd., (6) Livestock Co-operative Division, (7) Poultry and Dairy Pools, (8) The Wasagaming Foundation, (9) North Cypress-Langford Weed Control Districts
Co-op Farm Implements was a subsidiary company designed to serve Pool members in Manitoba and Saskatchewan.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of general documents and photographs.
The Pool livestock advisory boards and livestock markets were organized under the MPE when MPE merger with the Manitoba Co-operative Livestock Producers Ltd in 1948. The livestock pools operated in much the same way the grain pools did. The MPE Livestock Division was overseen by the Canadian Livestock Co-operative (Western) Limited (known as the C.L.C.). Local shipping associations shipped livestock to a central selling agency in St. Boniface, although this changed with the development of the rural highway system in Manitoba and the founding of Pool Packers.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of Livestock Division records, Virden Auction Market records, Brandon Livestock Advisory Committee records, Elkhorn Co-operative Livestock records, and Swan River Livestock Association Ltd.
Photograph was given to Fred McGuinness by Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard) of Lac du Bonnet, MB.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows a group of young students holding violins standing on the steps in front of Earl Haig School.
Notes
Writing on the back of the photograph reads: Edith (Harden) Lepard, Russell Scott, Phyllis Howick, Miss Brown (conductor), Orville Studen, Pete Teresko, Beth McLean, and Andy Teva. "Earl Haig Orchestra" 1930.
Photograph was given to Fred McGuinness by Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard) of Lac du Bonnet, MB.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows a group of young students holding violins standing on the lawn in front of Earl Haig School. One musician holds a trophy or plaque.
Notes
Students in this photograph are consistent with another in this collection (1-2015.71), Edith (Harden) Lepard, Russell Scott, Phyllis Howick, Orville Studen, Pete Teresko, Beth McLean, and Andy Teva.
See fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of historical topics created by MPE:
1. P.F. Bredt Invovement with MPE and death 1935-1940
2. MPE history 1941-1973
3a. Manitoba Wheat Pool and MPE history 1930-1939
3b. Manitoba Wheat Pool and MPE history 1925-1929
4. Manitoba Wheat Pool history 1924-1971
5a. On to Ottawa and Manitoba Delegation Committee 1958-1960
5b. MPE Miscellaneous history 1934-1959
6. Manitoba Wheat Pool history 1925-1929
7. Manitoba Wheat Pool 1925-1931
8. Pool Grain Marketing after 1929 Overpayment 1928-1936
9. Historical Review of Grain Trade and MPE
10. MPE Library 1948-1952
11. Coarse Grain Handling 1948-1953
12. Canadian Wheat Board 1935-1960
13. Saskatchewan Wheat Pool 1949
14. 1929 Overpayment and Williams/Stamp Commission Newspaper Clippings 1929-1931
15. Leonard Harman 1972
16. Historical Publications 1995-1996; no dates
17. Miscellaneous Historical
18. Western Agricultural Conference and Farm Bureau 1963-1965
19. Canadian Co-operatives 1961-1969
20. Miscellaneous Historical Topics 1930
21. Miscellaneous Historical Topics 1934-1936
22. International Wheat Agreement 1941-1948
23. World War Two 1939, 1944
24. Canadian National Railway System
25. Overpayment Aftermath 1932-1938
26. Miscellaneous Pool History 1925-1931
27. Miscellaneous History
28a. MPE History (Acquisitions, Philosophy) up to 1979 1931-1979
28b. MPE History (Acquisitions, Philosophy) up to 1979 1931-1979
Manitoba Pool Elevators was quick to realize the usefulness of the radio medium as a educational and promotional tool. It was also often used to defend the Pool and the co-operative movement in general on programs such as Farm Radio Forum. See fonds level description of RG 4 for complete history/bio of MPE.
Scope and Content
Sub-series MPE B.10 consists of textual radio broadcast transcriptions. The records include transcriptions from 1930 until 1971. Radio broadcasts are on a wide variety of topics, including argicultural science, the grain market and general economy of Canada and the world, government acts and legislation that affected the producer, co-operatives and the co-operative movement, rural life, young people, WWII, Manitoba, and the Manitoba Pool Elevators.
Postcard has graphite smudge on the top right corner of image
History / Biographical
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally on the top floor of the Commercial Building at 143-10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s. In 1911, the Henderson's Brandon City Directory lists the following teachers on staff: Mamie J. Macdougall, John B. Sample, John H. Snyder, Nettie M. Werry, and F.A. Wood (principal).
Custodial History
Donated to Fred McGuinness by Allena Strath (nee Coombs).
Scope and Content
Postcard depicts the 1911 class of the Wheat City Business College. Students include: O. Mutrie, E. Mailey, J.W. Belcher, S. Downey, H.R. Dustan, G. Greaves, D. Burden, C.J. Howey, M. Madder, A. Mills, E. Ballantyne, E. Lang, A. Binnie, L. Trent, M. Clark, E. Robertson, T. Ortenburg, A. Barnes, W.B. Grainger, V. Sanderson, H. Smith, E. Horror, M. Deacon, J. Smith, S. Gardiner, C.D. McMillan, N. Barss, E.J. Scott, M. McEwen, A. Scott, W. Naser, J. Cope, M. Trotman, J. Jackson, M. Gurr, P. McChesney, A.H. Andrews, M. Agnew, R.N. Truman, L. Cameron, T.C. Taylor, G. McClement, A. Armour, M. Drake, D. Chambers, M. Bourke, W.M. McGregor, Miss. McIlmoyle, J. Tendeck, G. McChesney, J.B. Stephens, O. Thornborough, A. Connor, H. Teale, E. Karr, P. Borland, J. Middleton, M. McIlmoyle, F.A. Wood, Principal D. Chambers, M.I. McGregor, B. McDougall, M. Maxwell, W. Crane, M. Vandeau, A. Lee, A. Hargreaves, H. Gimby, J. English, A. Coombes, H.J. McAnerin, M.C. Green, A.M. McGuinness, A.E. Shingfield, R. Blanshard, C. Goldstone, R. Heyden, Q. Oliver, N. Sterling, E. Cohen, V.E. Potter, H. Bellamy, Miss Pattison, Miss N. Werry, Miss. McQuarrie, J.H. Snyder, Miss M. MacDougall, Mr. J.S. Sample, Miss Lowry, A. Standal, G. Kennedy, C. Stojanosski, J. Elliott, M. Stnartk, R. Rewand, J. Mcneill, A. Kirchner, E. Green, E. Barnett, C.H. Howey, W. Main, M. Trew, M. Livingstone, B. Donaldson, A. Miller, J. Irwin, P. Brooks, R. Frank, S.A. Brown, B. Isman, M. Spearin, S. Thorsteinson, Miss Watson, J.A. McDonald, E. Zachary,S. Baglole, C. O'Brien, M. Thompson, F. Bockus, J. Hudama, E. Thompson, F. Shanks, M. Morrison, E. Cookman, ?.S. Wedderburn, E. Robinovitch, M. Maskew, C.A. Sharpe, M. Dack, M. Cossar, L. Grassie, I. Porteous, L. Markell, G. Burden, O. Paget, L. Cunningham, H.P. Hilton, F. Neilly, M.C. Feedman, E.F. Dixon
Notes
Back of postcard reads: A HAPPY XMAS./ and A very propersous / NEW YEAR / F.A. Wood [Principal of the Wheat City Business College]. Postcard is addressed to Miss Allena Coombs, Box 628, City, and has a cancelled one cent green King George stamp postmarked December 23, 1911, Brandon, Man.
The Medicine Hat Exhibition and Stampede Parade Day was held on Thursday, July 19, 1962, at 9:30 a.m. The local newspaper reported that approximately 24,000 people were in attendance to see parade marshall Rod Ashburner leading 175 entries consisting of 90 floats, 75 horses, and 10 bands. There were 19 parade categories eligible for $12,000 in prize money and included: junior and senior cowboys and cowgirls; fancy and Shetland ponies; sulky class open; comic, commercial, industrial and organizational floats; decorated cars; special ranch class; 4-H Clubs; and a non-competitive class.
The parade route started at Second St. and Allowance Ave., from Second St. to Ash Ave., north on Ash to First St. SE., from First St. S.E. to Fourth Ave., south to Second St. to South Railway St., south on South Railway St. to Third St., with a finish at McLeod Trail. A route map was published in the Medicine Hat News the day before the parade.
Aerial photographs of the parade were taken by Medicine Hat News photographer Howard Heid (1930-2005) from the private helicopter of John Bourn. Bourn was a pilot from Woodville, Wisconsin, who chartered his four-seater helicopter for sight-seers at exhibitions and stampedes across the county.
(Sources: Pat Currie, "Let 'Er Go!," Medicine Hat News, 19 July 1962,1; Harald Gunderson, "'Eye in the Sky' Best Parade View," Medicine Hat News, 19 July 1962,1; "Parade Starts at 9:30 Sharp," 18 July 1962)
Scope and Content
Photograph shows an aerial view of the Medicine Hat Exhibition and Stampede Parade route, with a focus on Second Street SE. Visible store signs include: Gardener's Used Cars, Provincial Treasury Branch, Furvey's Furniture and Appliances, J.J. Moore & Son Furniture, Alberta Credit Jewellers, James Richardson & Sons, Medicine Hat Gas Power Water City Owned Utilities.
Notes
This photograph shows the neighbourhood before rezoning and commercial development.