This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1958-59 A-Fan; 1958-59 Fis-Men; 1958-59 Mia-Woo; 1959-60 A-Fre; 1959-60 Gil-Mor; 1959-60 Nap-Woo; 1960-61 A-Fre; 1960-61 Gil-Mor; 1960-61 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1961-62 A-Fre; 1961-62 Gil-Mor; 1961-62 Nap-Woo; 1962-63 A-Fre; 1962-63 Gil-Mor; 1962-63 Nap-Woo; 1963-64 A-Fre; 1963-64 Gil-Mor; 1963-64 Nap-Woo
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1964-65 A-Fre; 1964-65 Gil-Mor; 1964-65 Nap-Woo; 1965-66 A-K; 1965-66 L-W; 1966-67 A-K; 1966-67 L-W; 1967-68 A-K; 1967-68 L-W
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
1a. Sub-district #101 Oct 22 1997 – June 15 1999
1b. Sub-district #101 August 5 1993 – August 12 1997
2. Sub-district #102 August 3 1993 – Dec 9 1997
3a. Sub-district #103 Jan 27 1997 – April 14 1999
3b. Sub-district #103 August 4 1993 – Nov 25 1996
4. Sub-district #104 August 4 1993 – April 20 1999
5a. Sub-district #105 Oct 30 1996 – June 29 1999
5b. Sub-district #105 Oct 28 1993 – July 2 1996
6a. Sub-district #201 Nov 4 1996 – July 30 1999
6b. Sub-district #201 Sept 29 1993 – Oct 2 1996
7a. Sub-district #202 Oct 21 1996 – July 8 1999
7b. Sub-district #202 Nov 3 1993 – August 1 1996
8a. Sub-district #203 July 25 1996 – June 28 1999
8b. Sub-district #203 May 31 1993 – April 3 1996
9a. Sub-district #204 Nov 20 1996 – June 24 1999
9b. Sub-district #204 Oct 14 1993 – Oct 31 1996
10a. Sub-district #205 April 1 1996 – July 30 1999
10b. Sub-district #205 August 4 1993 – Nov 27 1995
11a. Sub-district #301 July 5 1996 – August 9 1999
11b. Sub-district #301 July 26 1993 – March 11 1996
12a. Sub-district #302 Jan 9 1996 – June 28 1999
12b. Sub-district #302 Oct 12 1993 – Oct 25 1995
13a. Sub-district #303 Jan 3 1996 – June 29 1998
13b. Sub-district #303 Oct 13 1993 – Oct 24 1995
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
14a. Sub-district #304 Oct 8 1996 – June 23 1993
14b. Sub-district #304 August 3 1993 – August 6 1996
15a. Sub-district #305 Oct 2 1996 – April 7 1999
15b. Sub-district #305 August 4 1993 – August 7 1996
16a. Sub-district #401 April 11 1996 – August 10 1999
16b. Sub-district #401 August 10 1993 – Feb 7 1996
17a. Sub-district #402 March 21 1997 – August 16 1999
17b. Sub-district #402 August 4 1993 – Jan 27 1997
18. Sub-district #403 August 3 1993 – August 17 1999
19. Sub-district #404 Nov 2 1993 – April 16 1999
20a. Sub-district #405 Feb 9 1996 – July 12 1999
20b. Sub-district #405 August 5 1993 – Dec 7 1995
21. Sub-district #501 Nov 4 1993 – April 8 1999
22a. Sub-district #502 Nov 16 1995 – Oct 27 1998
22b. Sub-district #502 August 3 1993 – Oct 3 1995
23a. Sub-district #503 April 8 1996 – June 28 1999
23b. Sub-district #503 Nov 24 1992 – Feb 12 1996
24a. Sub-district #504 March 13 1996 – August 18 1999
24b. Sub-district #504 August 11 1993 – Jan 4 1996
25a. Sub-district #505 July 31 1996 – June 29 1999
25b. Sub-district #505 Oct 27 1993 – April 11 1996
26a. Sub-district #601 Oct 28 1996 – July 7 1999
26b. Sub-district #601 August 10 1993 – July 18 1996
27a. Sub-district #602 Oct 24 1996 – Feb 15 1999
27b. Sub-district #602 August 31 1993 – April 3 1996
28. Sub-district #603 August 10 1993 – April 15 1999
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils and district advisory committees. The records include the following:
29. Sub-district #604 Nov 23 1993 – March 8 1999
30a. Sub-district #605 Oct 26 1995 – April 14 1999
30b. Sub-district #605 Oct 28 1993 – June 22 1995
31. Sub-district #701 Feb 10 1994 – Oct 15 1998
32a. Sub-district #702 Feb 10 1996 – June 29 1999
32b. Sub-district #702 August 23 1993 – Oct 10 1995
33a. Sub-district #703 Nov 4 1996 – August 3 1999
33b. Sub-district #703 June 14 1993 – Oct 21 1996
34. Sub-district #703 June 7 1993 – April 28 1999
35. Sub-district #704 Oct 29 1993 – April 6 1999
36. Sub-district # 705 August 10 1993 – Oct 16 1998
37a. Sub-district #801 Jan 13 1997 – March 15 1999
37b. Sub-district #801 Nov 3 1993 – Nov 27 1996
38. Sub-district #802 Nov 23 1992 – March 16 1999
39a. Sub-district #803 June 12 1996 – July 20 1999
39b. Sub-district #803 Sept 15 1993 – Nov 12 1995
40. Sub-district #804 August 6 1993 – July 19 1999
41a. Sub-district #805 Nov 28 1995 – July 22 1999
41b. Sub-district #805 August 23 1993 – Oct 2 1995
42. District Advisory Committee 1105 1999-2001
43. District Advisory Committee 1106 2000-2001
44. District Advisory Committee 1107 April-Nov 2000
45. District Advisory Committee 1108 Jan-Nov 2000
46. District Advisory Committee 1201 2000-2001
47. District Advisory Committee 1202 1999-2001
48. District Advisory Committee 1203 1999-2001
49. District Advisory Committee 1204 1999-2001
50. District Advisory Committee 1205 1999-2000
51. District Advisory Committee 1206 1999-2001
52. District Advisory Committee 1207 1999-2001
53. District Advisory Committee 1208 1999-2000
54. District Advisory Committee 1101 2000-2001
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE district advisory committees. The records include the following:
55. District Advisory Committee 1102 2000-2001
56. District Advisory Committee 1103 2000-2001
57. District Advisory Committee 1104 2000-2001
58. District Advisory Committee 1005 1999-2001
59. District Advisory Committee 1006 2000-2001
60. District Advisory Committee 1007 1999-2001
61. District Advisory Committee 1008 1999-2001
62. District Advisory Committee 1001 1999-2001
63. District Advisory Committee 1002 2000-2001
64. District Advisory Committee 1003 Apr., July 2000
65. District Advisory Committee 1004 1999-2000
66. District Advisory Committee 906 2000-2001
67. District Advisory Committee 907 2000-2001
68. District Advisory Committee 908 2000-2001
69. District Advisory Committee 901 2000-2001
70. District Advisory Committee 902 2000-2001
71. District Advisory Committee 903 April 12 2000
72. District Advisory Committee 904 2000-2001
73. District Advisory Committee 805 1999-2000
74. District Advisory Committee 806 July 7 2000
75. District Advisory Committee 807 July 7 2000
76. District Advisory Committee 801 2000-2001
77. District Advisory Committee 802 2000-2001
78. District Advisory Committee 803 Nov 14 1999
79. District Advisory Committee 804 2000-2001
80. District Advisory Committee 705 March 15 2000
81. District Advisory Committee 708 March 14 2000
82. District Advisory Committee 707 March 15 2000
83. District Advisory Committee 606 (Miscellaneous)
Commissions dealing with transportation by rail and by sea were important to Manitoba Pool Elevators, as the cost and effiecincy of transport affected the cost of service to its members.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
.This sub-series contains the following:
Box 1:
1. St. Lawrence Seaway 1961-1971
2. Royal Commission on Transportation - excerpt from the evidence of Sir Henry Thornton 1931-1932
3. Royal Commission on Transportation 1949-1950
4. Report of the Royal Commission on Transportation February 9, 1951
5. The Royal Commission on Transportation 1960
6. The Royal Commission on Transportation 1960-1967
7. The Canadian Transport Commission 1985
Box 2:
8. The Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1975-1976
9a. Submissions to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1975-1977
9b. Submissions to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1975-1977
10. Submissions to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
11. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
12. Submissions to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
13. Submissions to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
14. Appendix to Final Submission of CN Railways to GH&TC 1976
15. Submission by the Province of Manitoba to the GH&TC 1976
16. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1975-1976
17. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1974-1976
18a. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976-1977
18b. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
19. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission Public Hearings 1976
20. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
21. Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1976
22. MPE Submission to the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission 1975
Fall Convocation. Lewis Whitehead receives his honorary degree. President Mallea in the background, Larry Dawson standing behind Mallea, and Dr. Hordern facing away from the camera
Reg Forbes was born September 16, 1924. He and his wife Clara have two children, Bob and Faye. Forbes served in the Royal Canadian Air Force as a Navigator during World War II. From 1945-1949, he attended the University of Manitoba where he received his B.Sc.A. While working as Village Councillor and as Secretary-Treasurer for the Pilot Mound Hospital, Forbes initiated the "Save the Soil Campaign," a soil conservation programme that became province-wide, between 1952-1962.
From 1956-1975, Forbes was the Principal of the Agricultrual Extension Centre in Brandon, where he reorganized the Adult Education Centre into the Agricultural Extension Centre. During this period, Forbes was a founding member of the West-Man Regional Development Corporation and a founder of the Manitoba Committee on Rural Leadership. He was also instrumental in the amalgamation of the Royal Manitoba Winter Fair and the Provincial Exhibition and in the resulting construction of the Keystone Centre.
From 1975-1977 Forbes was a Commissioner for the Grain Handling and Transportation Commission (Hall Commission/GHTC). Following his work with the Commission, Forbes was employed as the General Manager of the Provincial Exhibition of Manitoba (1977-1979), the Director of the Grain Handling & Transportation Section of the Manitoba Department of Agriculture (1979-1983), the Industrial Commissioner for the Brandon Industrial Commission (1983-1986), and as the Westarc Group Inc. Project Director for delivery under contract of Canadian Rural Transition Programme in Manitoba.
Forbes also held a number of voluntary and elected positions, such as Long-term Director and President of the Royal Manitoba Winter Fair and of the Provincial Exhibition of Manitoba. In 1970-1971, he was the President of the Agricultural Institute of Canada, and from 1978-1981, Forbes was the first chairman of the Agricultural Advisory Committee of the Canadian Broadcasting Corportation. He was also a member of the Canada West Foundation Board, the Brandon University Board of Governers (1974-1976), and the Federal-Provincial Transportation and Industrial Development Advisory Committee (TIDAC). Forbes is also a Fellow of the Agricultural Institute of Canada. In 1977, he received the Jubilee Medal and in 1987, he was given the Distinguished Agrologist Award by the Manitoba Institute of Agrologists.
Custodial History
Reg Forbes donated his working collection of briefs, correspondence and other documents relating to his work as a commissioner of the Grain Handling and Transportation Committee (GHTC) to the McKee Archives c. 1985.
Scope and Content
The majority of the collection consists of records created and received by the Royal Commission on Grain Handling and Transportation (GHTC). Included are documents detailing numerious hearings from all four Western provinces. In addition to the GHTC hearings, there are also a number of documents given to the GHTC as reference material. These include information on the Snavely Commision, documents for the province of Alberta, various reports, the Prairie Regional Studies in Economic Geography (No. 1-27) and General Information. The collection also includes two maps given to the GHTC.
Class of 1930’s 50th Anniversary. Back Row-L to R: Lorne McFarland, John Peter Odin, Gordon Brown, Campbell McNeill, Duncan Wilkie, Stanley Knowles, Robert Clement, Carl Wicklund, Wilbert Stevens, Murray Brooks. Front Row-L to R: Thelma Patterson, Sydney Pechet, Ruth Bingham Alexander, Mary Anne (Mickey) Maltman, Tommy Douglas, Mary Duncan Little, Jean Chase, Louise Peebles Harrison, Laura Shanks (?), Adeline Cameron Roberts
Record of site excavation unit 20 at the Crepeele site 2005.
Scope and Content
Site records of excavation units may include: level summaries, floor plans, feature sheets, wall profiles, unit summaries and any other additional information relating to the unit.
Record of site excavation unit 20 during the 1986 Lovstrom survey.
Scope and Content
Site records of excavation units may include: level summaries, floor plans, feature sheets, wall profiles, unit summaries and any other additional information relating to the unit.