Box 1 and 2: Reston Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Minutes of Shareholders Annual meetings, 1928 - 1945, 1950 - 1951, 1953 1961 - 1963 Financial records and statistics Statement of surplus, 1938 - 1942 Final statements, 1935 - 1937, 1940 - 1942 (5 reports) Auditors' reports, 1929 - 1932, 1935 - 1942, 1947, 1954, 1962, 1963 (16 reports) Operating account, 1932 Balance sheet, 1951, 1960 - 1963 Analysis of Operating Result, 1961 - 1962 General expenses, 1961 - 1962 Surplus payment for year, 1938 - 1958 Final oats equalization payment, 1946 - 1947 Flax adjustment payment, 1947 - 1948 Barley adjustment payment, 1947 Grower's deliveries, 1958 - 1959, 1960 Deliveries and surplus, 1949 - 1959 Grower's ledgers, 1934 - 1947 Correspondence, 1944 - 1951 Membership list, 1945 - 1957, new Memberships Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Pipestone
Box 3: Reston/Cromer Association Minutes Nov 5 1959 - Nov 1998; Correspondance July 19 1960 - May 25 1999; Documents 1960 - 1969; Membership and Board Members 1959 - 1999; Cromer Membership Roster 1968 - 1979; Attendance 1958 - 1969; Funding Requests; Financial 1957 - 1996; Miscellaneous
Box 4: Cromer Seed Co-operative August 1 1972 - June 5 1986; Reston Minute Book May 20 1983 - May 24 1994
Notes
File numbering is not congruous between sub-series arranged prior to 2009 and sub-series arranged or added to after 2009. This will be corrected in the future
Sub sub series consists of documents relating to various Board projects including the Evans Lecture Theatre, the Library Building, a sanitary trunk sewer, electrical and telephone distribution service and the steam plant extension. There are also files on the Brandon University Chancellor and long range planning consultants. The sub sub series includes correspondence, minutes, blue prints, reports, financial information, statistics, recommendations and other records.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.6 Board Projects
Four certificates (Congratulations on Brandon University's centennial from the University of Manitoba and McMaster University; congratulations on the 25th Anniversary of Brandon University's charter from the University of Winnipeg; and the centennial organization certificate from the Manitoba Historical Society) were transfered to the McKee Archvies from the President's Office on July 31, 2007.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of invitations, reply cards, some correspondence, and a salary schedule. It also includes agreements, briefs, orders-in-council, bills, memorandums and by-laws dealing with the legislative basis, legal structure and operations of Brandon College Incorporated, Brandon University and BUSU. Sub-series also includes a number of certificates.
Notes
Some of the files in the sub-series pre-date Brandon University. They have been retained in this sub-series to maintain original order.
The Executive Committee is a standing committee of the Brandon University Board of Governors that meets regularly two weeks prior to the regular Board meeting. Its membership consists of: Chair of the Board of Governors; Vice-Chair of the Board of Governors; President of the University; Secretary of the Board of Governors; Treasurer of the Board of Governors; Student Representative from the Board of Governors; and Senate Representative from the Board of Governors. The Vice-President (Academic and Research) and the Vice-President (Administration and Finace) act as resource persons. Elections for the Executive Committee take place at the Board of Governors' August meeting each year.
Specific responsibilities of the Executive Committee include: setting the agenda for each regular and special meeting of the Board of Governors; reviewing relevant matters coming before the Board of Governors; acting as a consultative body to the President of the University; dealing with matters delegated by the Board of Governors; referring items to appropriate standing committees of the Board of Governors; acting with the full authority of the Board in situations requiring immediate action prior to the next regular meeting of the Board. The Executive Committee also reviews and recommends policies governing university finance and long-range planning. The Executive of the Board reports to the Board of Governors.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of records created by the Executive of the Brandon University Board of Governors. It has been divided into three sub sub series: (1) Board Executive Minutes; (2) Board Executive Correspondence; and (3) Board Executive Agendas.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from Board of Governors By-law No. 11 - Committees of the Board of Governors, Section III - Executive Committee (revised November 23, 2006).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.2 Board Executive
Sub-series consists of records for various committees of the Board of Governors, which were established to expedite matters in certain areas of the Board's jurisdiction. Some committees have a more or less permanent status while others were created to deal with specific questions or mandates. The sub-series has been divided into six sub sub series, including: (1) Nominating Committee; (2) Finance Committee; (3) Presidential Selection Committee; (4) Membership Committee; (5) Fundraising-Liaison Committee; and (6) Athletic Directorate.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees
Arrangement
At present (July 2007) all Board Committee files are in one box. As more records are received, the individual committees will be placed into their own boxes.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series is comprised of various documents, agreements and contracts generated by A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. Among the documents are by-laws, letters of patents, land deeds, leases, transfers of property, grants of probate, trademark documents, certificates of title, incorporation documents, bills of sale, assets and liabilities, licenses to do business, loan documents, tax statements/certificates, insurance documents, memorandums, declarations, estate documents, releases, settlements, mortgages, and bill 87.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of one folder containing thank you letters to Prof. George F. MacDowell, Professor of Economics at Brandon University, and a long-time member of the McKenzie Seeds Board for his service to the company.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), MG 3 (Brandon University Teaching and Administration), MG 3 1.12 (George MacDowell fonds).
The Brandon Board of Trade was founded in 1883 to promote business activity and economic expansion in Brandon. Aside from these records, no other records of the Board of Trade are known to exist.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Sub-series includes the intervention of the Board in the 1910 municipal election in Brandon and a listing of the standing committee for 1911. The sub-series also includes a letter to Mr. Blanchard from A.E. McKenzie and a financial statement for the Brandon Commercial Bureau.
For administrative history see RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), series 2 (Board of Governors).
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of correspondence and various other documents, including: financial information, legal documents, agendas, reference materials, minutes, blueprints, drawings, reports, briefs, recommendations, proposals and newsclippings.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.4 Correspondence and subject files
Photograph was taken by Christy Henry on August 10, 2002 following the grand opening of the Labyrinth of Peace. The Labyrinth is situated in the Assiniboine River Corridor near the Discovery Centre in Brandon, Manitoba.
Custodial History
See series level of the Christy Henry fonds for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the information board for the Labyrinth of Peace.
Storage Location
RG 5 photograph storage drawer
32-2007
Related Material
Additional information on the history of the Labyrinth of Peace project can be found in RG 6 (Brandon University fonds) 7.1.6 (Department of Religion) File 1.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes minutes of the Board of Directors of McKenzie Seeds, extracts from minutes of the Board of Directors, information on shareholders of the company, notices of Board meetings, suggested meeting agendas, the President's annual report for 1967, and memos regarding Board meetings/business.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Additional minutes for the meetings of the Board of Directors of McKenzie
Seeds, dating from the mid 1930's, are held in the Provincial Archives of Manitoba.
Minute excerpts for the Board of Directors are located in the Document sub-series in the file titled By-Laws for 1940-1985.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes financial statements of various kinds for McKenzie Seeds and combined financial statements for McKenzie Seeds and its subsidiaries, particularly McFayden Seeds. Chartered Accountants used for this purpose include: Marwick, Mitchell & Co., Webb, Read, Hegan, Callingham & Co./Webb, Read & Co., George A. Touche & Co., Oscar Hudson & Co., Morden, Sprague & Co./Laird, Sprague & Co., Edwards, Morgan, Halliday & Co., Welch, Hinton and Welch, McDonald, Currie & Co./Cooper Brothers & Co., Meyers Dickens Norris Penny & Co./Meyers, Norris, Penny & Co. and the Comptroller-General for the Province of Manitoba.
This sub-series also includes a number of purchase offers made to A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd as well as proposed plans to sell the company. Offers were received from United Grain Growers, Maple Leaf Mills, McKenzie Seeds Staff, Manitoba, Saskatchewan and Alberta Wheat Pools, and the Ferry Morse Seed Co.
Twelve ledgers, including branch order, mail order and cash registers, general ledgers, current ledgers, payroll sheets and branch daily cash reports, are also part of the sub-series. Other miscellaneous financial records and statements include information on McKenzie Seeds' proposal to the Manitoba Government for re-financing in the early to mid 1980's.
Notes
Additional dates for the records in the financial sub-series are as follows:
1. Prepared Financial Statements: 1907-1918, 1920-1923, 1926-1938, and 1942-1979.
2. Purchase Offers: U.G.G. (1959, 1966), Wheat Pools (1961), McKenzie Staff (1963),
Maple Leaf Mills (c. 1965), Ferry Morse Seed Co. (c. 1969-1970).
The extent of the ledgers in sub-series McS 1 1.5 (Financial Records) separate from the other
financial records in the sub-series is 95.9 cm. The financial records without the ledgers measure 60 cm.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Financial statements and records for the individual companies acquired by
McKenzie Seeds are located in Series III.
Information regarding the sale of McKenzie Seeds is located in Series II (Office of the President/GM), sub-series I (A.E. McKenzie), in the file entitled A.E. correspondence with W.A. Johnson. Some of these records are connected to the purchase offers received by McKenzie Seeds.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes reports from three management consultants: Harbridge House, Urwick, Currie & Partners Ltd., and Thorne Stevenson & Kellogg. As well, the sub-series contains correspondence between the President and Comptroller of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. and Harbridge House regarding the implementation of a management training program and plans to combat the weak field seed market. The Urwick, Currie reports deal with improvement in company operations and improvements in packet seed processing. The Thorne Stevenson & Kellogg report is entitled 'Implementing a Strategic Planning Process.' Each of the reports completed for the company deal with improving the business operations of McKenzie Seeds.
Harbridge House – this record is a management-training program designed to address a weak field seed market.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
For administrative history see RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), series 2 (Board of Governors).
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of records related to Brandon University Board of Governors' general meetings. The sub-series has been divided into five sub sub series, including: (1) Agendas; (2) Minutes; (3) Packages; (4) Motion sheets; and (5) Index of motions.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.3 Board agendas, minutes and packages
Thomas Russell Wilkins was born in Toronto in 1891. He received his B.A. from McMaster University in 1912, and became the Science Master at Woodstock College the following year. In 1916, he and his wife Olive moved to Chicago, where Wilkins was an instructor of Physics at the University of Chicago. The next year he served as a master signal electrician in the U.S. Signal Corps. During World War I, Wilkins completed pioneer research for the United States Navy, which led to the development of pulse sonar devices in the 1920s. He had also been researching the possibilities of a wireless telephone.
Wilkins and his wife moved to Brandon in 1918, where he took up the position of Professor of Physics. During his time at Brandon College, Wilkins introduced the latest technology to classrooms, designed the original Science Building, and along with the Brandon Citizen's Committee, seucured building funds for the Citizen's Science Building.
Receiving his Ph.D. from the University of Chicago in 1921, Wilkins resigned from Brandon College in 1925 to pursue postgraduate study at Cambridge University. In 1926, he began research at the University of Rochester, where he also took up the position of Professor of Physics. From 1930 to 1938, he acted as the Director of the Institute of Optics.
Widely known for his work in the fields of cosmic rays and atomic disintegration, in April 1939, Wilkins announced the perfection of a camera that was able to record the "footprints" of invisible atoms after they collide. In October 1939, he received a medal from the Royal Photographic Society of Great Britain recognizing his work regarding the use of photographic emulsions in the study of radium. The following year, Wilkins perfected a camera that could determine the energy levels inside the nuclei of stable chemical elements. He received a grant from Sigma Xi, the National Society for the Promotion of Scientific Research, in November of 1940.
Wilkins married twice. The first marriage, to Olive Anges Cross took place on June 17, 1913. Olive Wilkins died suddenly on May 13, 1937, at the age of 45. Wilkins married Susan Gwendolyn Whidden, the daughter of former Brandon College president Dr. H.P. Whidden, in 1938.
Thomas Russell Wilkins died suddenly of a heart attack on December 10, 1940, on his way back to his laboratory after a faculty meeting. He was 49 years old.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
T. Russell Wilkins’ reocrds contain correspondence between himself and Mrs. Wilkins and Dr. Whidden concerning their employment with Brandon College. There are letters between the two men regarding the building of the Science Building in 1920. There is also a copy of the Canadian Baptist. Besides programmes and a picture, there is also correspondence between various people. Dr. Wilkins kept the papers he had written for various classes at McMaster University in the years 1911 and 1912. There is a "toast to the ladies" that he delivered at a banquet of some sort, that gives an interesting view on how Wilkins, and possibly other men of his time, viewed women. There are numerous newspapers clippings, and several pages taken from journals such as Popular Mechanics, Popular Electricity and others. Dr. Wilkins was at the top of his field of study. He was an extremely bright man who managed to create some very useful tools of science. His papers are interesting and informative to read.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from Campus News May 1990
Carole Paintin-Dence was raised in Souris, Manitoba and attended Brandon College in the early 1960s. While at Brandon College she was active in the Glee Club, I.R.C. and French Clubs. She was also Quill reporter for the Music Department.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of a small collection of Brandon College memorabilia and slides. The memorabilia includes programs from various Brandon College Student Association events, Alumni News, and a copy of "The New Brandon College School of Music" by Peggy Sharpe. The slide images include: the opening of the Music Building 1963 (3) - Sir Ernest MacMillan, Lady MacMillan and Lorne Watson; raising the class flag 1964 (2); the JRC Evans Lecture Theatre 1964 (1); Brandon College Original Building 1964 (1); Freshie Parade 1962 (1) - glee club float and 1963 (3) - "wedding of Jack & Jill"; French Immersion class Summer 1964 (4) - Mme Ragot, Neil Forsyth, Henri Francq; party for John 1963 (2) - Ken May, Morlene Sparrow, John Sushelnitsky, Norma Walmsley, Poppy Cumming, Chris Cassels, Pat Brake, Eleanor Riesberry; W.U.S. parties (4) - Joan Garnett, Norma Walmsley, Claude Paintin, Brian Foster, Rae Westcott, Clark Brownlee, Nina Kosakawiecz, Berth Paintin
Collection also includes school texts and pedagogical guides - forty-seven in total - dealing with reading, spelling, social studies and particularly music.
A.E. McKenzie was born in Wilcox Lake, York County, Ontario in 1870 to F.B. and Maria (Carley) McKenzie. His family came to Manitoba in 1883. He was educated in Brandon, Manitoba and graduated from the Collegiate Institute at age 21. In 1897 he founded the Brandon Seed House. McKenzie was present at the cornerstone-laying ceremony of Brandon College on Juy 13, 1900. From that moment on, he was very involved in the College, first as an interested businessman, and later as a member of its Board of Directors. In 1902, McKenzie married Laura Bell in Port Arthur. They had two daughters, Marjorie Bell and Kathleen. In 1906 the Brandon Seed House was incorporated and from then on was known as the "A.E. McKenzie Co. Ltd.."
McKenzie became a member of the Brandon College Endowment Committee in 1918. The following year he was on the Finance Committee. By 1925, McKenzie was a member of the Board of Directors. In 1928, he was part of a syndicate that advised the Baptist Union that they were developing an endowment plan to provide continuing financial support to the College and talked the Union into providing $10 000 towards the accumulated deficit.
In 1931, McKenzie organized the Brandon Board of Trade to help save Brandon College when the Baptists said they could no longer afford to keep the College. After the By-law failed, he helped to organize the Brandon Citizen’s Campaign to raise enough money so that the College could open the following year.
When the Baptists withdrew support in 1938, McKenzie was one of the central figures on the Brandon Board of Trade that decided to save the College from closure. A representative delegation from Southwestern Manitoba of over 60 men descended upon Premier Bracken’s office to try and convince him to help the College. On June 12, 1938 McKenzie said he would set up a $100 000 endowment to Brandon College. He subsequently raised this amount to $300 000. On August 1, 1938 the Board of Trade launched a campaign to raise $15 000 to match what the government was prepared to offer the College. McKenzie was asked to provide Brandon College with $3000 personally. In September of 1938, McKenzie upped his endowment once more to $500 000. The fund raising worked however, and the chater establishing Brandon College Incorporated was assented to on April 17, 1939. On June 6, 1939 a by-law was again presented to the citizens of Brandon, and fortunately it passed.
In 1941, McKenzie received an honorary L.L.D. from the University of Manitoba. The A.E. McKenzie Foundation was created in 1945 by the provincial government, who had assumed 90% of the A.E. McKenzie Co. Ltd. stock.
On September 25, 1964 McKenzie died at the age of 94. He never retired, but worked full time until two weeks before his death. The funeral was held in the J.R.C. Evans Lecture Theatre. The Arts and Library Building at Brandon College was completed in 1960, and is known as the A.E. McKenzie building, in honour of the man who contributed so much time, effort and financial help to the College during a crucial period in its history.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
A.E. McKenizie’s records in the Brandon College fonds are very useful from an administrative point of view. Because McKenzie was so involved in Brandon College from the very beginning until his death in 1964, it is easy to understand how the College Administration arrived at decisions. There is correspondence between McKenzie and various regarding College and Board of Director business. There are Brandon College financial statements and letters regarding the A.E. McKenzie Foundation. The records contain newspaper clippings, pamphlets and lists of names of members of various Brandon organizations. As well, McKenzie has letters regarding Building Expansion in the 1940’s and minutes of Board of Director meetings. There are also several photographs. One photograph is the 1919 graduation picture of Zoe Hough. Another is tentatively identified as Frances Wolverton, also of the Class of 1919. There are two more photographs of unidentified young women.