Sub-series consists of records generated and received by Brandon University Film Services including correspondence, memos, reports, announcements, and catalogues.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 8: Library Services
Sub sub series consists of publications created by or written by staff members of Student Services. It includes: a recruitment pamphlet and the Brandon University Admissions Handbook.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 12: Student Services
DEANS OF STUDENT SERVICES:
R. BRUCE MCFARLANE (1968 - 1976)
No biographical information yet.
CAM CONNORS (1978 - 1982)
Campbell Connors was born in England and raised in South Africa. He came to Canada in 1963, and attended the United College in Winnipeg (now the University of Winnipeg). Connors had planned to return to Zimbabwai, but after the Declaration of Independence in 1966, he was unable to. Subsequently, he became a United Church minister in Russell, Manitoba for four years. In 1971, he was invited to head a special Mature Students project at Brandon University, and in 1976, he became that institution's Dean of Student Services.
TOM MITCHELL (1985 - 1989)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 5 Office of the Registrar, 5.1Registrar's files for biographical information on Tom Mitchell.
BETH WESTFALL (1989 - 1992)
Additional biographical information for Beth Westfall is located at RG 6, series 9 (Office of Extension).
On September 1, 1989, Westfall became the first female dean at Brandon University when she accepted the position of Dean of Student Services. Westfall left Brandon University in 1992 to accept a position as President of Keewatin Community College, in The Pas, Manitoba. At present (January 2007), Beth Westfall Davies is the Senior Education Administrator of Northwest Community College in British Columbia.
DARCY BOWER (1994 - 2005)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 5 Office of the Registrar, 5.1Registrar's files for biographical information on Darcy Bower.
JANET S. WRIGHT (2005 - July 31, 2008)
See RG 6 Brandon University fonds, Series 7 Faculties and Schools, 7.2.1 Dean of Science for biographical information on Janet Wright.
DAVID ROWLAND (August 1, 2008 - July 31, 2013)
David Rowland is a native of Toronto, ON. He obtained his B.Sc. in Physical Education from Coastal Carolina University in Conway, South Carolina in 1997. He completed his Master of Education degree in Special Education at the University of Charleston in 1999.
From 2000-2005, Rowland was the Assistant Dean of Students at the College of Charleston before taking the position of Dean of Students at Mount Allison University in 2006. His term as Dean of Student Services at Brandon University began in 2008.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of correspondence and minutes.
Notes
History/Bio information on Cam Connor was taken from Connexion December 1971 and an article in "The Quill" (September 27, 1979). Biographical information for Beth Westfall was taken from articles in "The Quill" (August 30, 1989) and from the government of British Columbia's Board Member biography page on Beth Westfall Davies located at: http://www.fin.gov.bc.ca/oop/brdo/memView.asp?Member=142002 (January 2007). History/Bio information for David Rowland taken from the September 1, 2008 issue of the Quill.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 12: Student Services
The Student Services H-Hut was located between the Brandon College Building and the Citzens' Science Building. It was placed there c. 1950 and it was removed sometime in the 1990s. Originally the H-Hut in this photograph was the Geology Depatment, housing offices, classrooms and the lab.
Scope and Content
Photograph is looking west and shows the entrance to the Student Services H-Hut.
Notes
History/Bio information from Tom Mitchell and Harvey Young.
Donkersloot began working at Brandon University in 1970/1971 as the Clerk of Works. From 1973 until his retirement, he was the Director of Physical Plant.
The Site Services building was built in 1971.
Custodial History
Photograph was taken by Tom Donkersloot during construction and stored in albums in the Physical Plant H-Hut until they were transfered to the McKee Archives by Doug Duncalf in May 2008.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows construction of Brandon University's Site Services Building located on Louise Avenue at the corner of 20th Street. Also visible are McMaster Hall, Flora Cowan Women's Residence and the John R. Brodie Science Centre. Photograph is looking east/northeast from approximately 21st Street.
Notes
Donkersloot recorded the date and time each photograph was taken on the back of the photos.
Donkersloot began working at Brandon University in 1970/1971 as the Clerk of Works. From 1973 until his retirement, he was the Director of Physical Plant.
The Site Services Building was built in 1971.
Custodial History
Photograph was taken by Tom Donkersloot during construction and stored in albums in the Physical Plant H-Hut until they were transfered to the McKee Archives by Doug Duncalf in May 2008.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows construction of Brandon University's Site Services Building located on Louise Avenue at the corner of 20th Street. Also visible are McMaster Hall and part of Darrach Hall. Photograph is looking northeast.
Notes
Donkersloot recorded the date and time each photograph was taken on the back of the photos.
Donkersloot began working at Brandon University in 1970/1971 as the Clerk of Works. From 1973 until his retirement, he was the Director of Physical Plant.
The Site Services Building was built in 1971.
Custodial History
Photograph was taken by Tom Donkersloot during construction and stored in albums in the Physical Plant H-Hut until they were transfered to the McKee Archives by Doug Duncalf in May 2008.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows construction of Brandon University's Site Services Building located on Louise Avenue at the corner of 20th Street. Photograph is looking northwest.
Notes
Donkersloot recorded the date and time each photograph was taken on the back of the photos.
These records were created by the Director of Library Services from the year 1957 until 1963. It is mainly business correspondence and memorandums. The files include correspondence between the Director of Library Services and various people regarding the library. There are also memorandums to the faculty.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 14: Brandon College Library
Related Material
RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), sub-series 8.1 (Director of Library Services).
Photograph shows the hallway outside Mail Services, which were located on the main floor of the Brandon College Building, prior to renovation. The new entrance on the west side of the building now occupies the space.
These are the minutes from the meetings of the Arts Banquet committees from 1938 until 1964. They include detailed descriptions of what each banquet would entail.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 8: Brandon College Students Association
Kathleen M. Nichol (nee Smith) graduated from Brandon University in 1973. At present (May 2008) she is an Instructional Associate in Physics and Astronomy at BU.
Harry Spafford (b. 22 Oct 1888, d. 10 May 1978) was born in Holmfield, Manitoba. He married Isabella Hawking of Ninga in 1914 and the couple moved to Brandon in 1915 where they continued to reside until 1973. Harry worked as a locomotive fireman and then as an engineer with the Canadian Northern Railway (CN). While with CN, he was an active member of the Brotherhood of Local Engineers and Firemen No. 788 of Brandon. He served as an alderman in Brandon from 1928 to 1945. In 1932, Harry ran in the Manitoba by-election for Brandon as an Independent Labour candidate and lost to the Conservative member George Dinsdale. In 1952, Harry ran as a Co-Operative Commonwealth Federation (CCF) member in the provincial election and lost to Conservative party representative Reg Lissaman. Harry Spafford passed away in Burnaby, BC, and is interred in the Ocean View Cemetery. (Source: see obituary in McG 4.1 File 66)
Alva/Alvery/"Alvie" Reddell/Riddell/Ridall Spafford (b. 15 Mar 1891, d. 23 Aug 1985) was born in Enterprise, Manitoba, in the R.M. of Turtle Mountain. In 1911, he married Francis Ethel Harrison (d. 1979) in Killarney and had three children. Alvie farmed in Bannerman from 1902 to 1936, after which he moved to Boissevain to work as a Rawleigh salesman. In 1942, the family moved to Brandon where Alvie worked as a conductor with the CNR until his retirement. Alva Spafford passed away at the age of 94 at the Brandon General Hospital. His funeral was held in Killarney, Manitoba. (Source: Obituary, Brandon Sun, 23 Aug 1985)
Scope and Content
Photograph shows [left to right] Carl Spafford, Alva Spafford, and Harry Spafford posing together in a banquet room.
Notes
Writing on the back of the photograph reads: Harry Spafford on right, Alva Spafford center, Carl nephew of Harry on left. Harry retired in 1962 as an Engineer. Alva retired in 1965 as a Conductor. Carl retired in 1977 as a Conductor. [Note: conflicting dates are provided on photographs for Alva's retirement, i.e., 1956 vs. 1965]
Photograph shows a banquet room in the Prince Edward Hotel. Rectangular tables are organized in an U-shape layout. The tables are covered in white linen table cloths and have place settings.