Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley) Pentland, son of T.J. and Annie Isabel (McVety) Pentland, was born on October 21, 1889 in Justice, MB. He died on September 25, 1981 in Brandon, MB. Wesley married Harriet Mary Brownell on April 14, 1942 in Winnipeg, MB. They had no children.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
2.1 Income tax forms 1939
2.1a Wes Pentland correspondence 1911-1917
2.2 Moore/Thomas deed of land 1886-1906
2.3 Postcards ca.1900 - ca.1910
2.4 Correspondence 1911-1946
2.5 Oil leases (Rio Bravo, Canadian Superior, Imperior) 1949-1950
2.6 Livestock records 1947-1951
2.7 Orange Lodge speech and visitations [1939]; dividend certificates 1939
2.8 Automobile club membership 1937-1944
2.9 Life insurance documents 1919-1945
2.10 Mortgage documents 1914-1922
2.11 School records [1911-1913]
2.12 Mrs. Wes Pentland (Harriet) fur insurance policy 1948
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Thomas James (T.J.) Pentland, son of John Pentland and Jane Finnegan, was born January 4, 1858. He died January 8, 1919 in Justice, MB. T.J. married Annie Isabel McVety on July 22, 1885 in High Bluff, MB. Together they had six children: John Alfred (Fred); Henry Herbert McVety (Harry); Annie Ethel; Eliza Evelyn; Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley); and Mary Agnes Grace Isabel (Gracie).
Annie Isabel McVety was born at Seaforth, ON in 1859 and came to High Bluff, MB with her family in 1882. She died in October of 1938 in Justice, MB.
John Alfred (Fred) Pentland was born on July 5, 1886 in Douglas, MB. He was mortally wounded during the Passchedale campaign - 3rd battle of Ypres. He died on September 13, 1917 at Camiers Hospital, France.
Henry Herbert McVety (Harry) Pentland was born on November 10, 1887 in Douglas, MB. He died on June 26, 1948 in Brandon, MB. Harry married Mary Emma Irene (Irene) Fleming, daughter of John Jr. and Martha McLaughlin Fleming on November 22, 1913 in Brandon. Together they had three children: Harry Clare (Clare); Olive Eunice Irene (Eunice); and Shirley Margaret Marie.
Eliza Evelyn (Evelyn) Pentland was bon February 7, 1892 in Justice, MB. She died on May 28, 1986 in Brandon, MB. Evelyn married Norman Wallace Thompson on July 22, 1914 in Justice, MB. Together they had six children: Norman Cecil; Muriel Isabel; Norma Evelyn Jean; James Alfred; Marguerite Beryl; and Helen Elaine.
No biographical information available for Robert and Harry McVety.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
[no file number] Mortgage papers 1890-1907
10.1 Fred Pentland insurance documents 1912-1916 (includes 1914 mortgage agreement)
10.2 Fred Pentland correspondence 1910-1916 (2 files)
10.3 Fred Pentland postcards 1916
10.4 Harry Pentland correspondence 1916-1918
10.5 Harry McVety correspondence from Wes Pentland 1912
10.6 Evelyn Pentland correspondence 1910
10.7 Robert McVity correspondence 1920 (includes 1921 will)
10.8 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1930-1936
10.9 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland insurance documents 1917
10.10 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland income tax papers 1917
10.11 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland undated correspondence
10.12 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland corresondence 1882-1911
10.13 Annie I. Pentland insurance documents 1917-1937
10.14 Annie I. Pentland undated correspondence
10.15 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate correspondence 1917-1945
10.16 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate documents 1922-1931
10.17 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1928-1938 (3 files)
10.18 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1918-1927
10.19 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1917 (2 files)
10.20 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1908-1916 (2 files)
10.21 Annie I. Pentland income tax forms 1918-1921
10.22 Annie I. Pentland mathematics exam to enter Normal School August 1883
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Sub sub series consists of documents relating to various Board projects including the Evans Lecture Theatre, the Library Building, a sanitary trunk sewer, electrical and telephone distribution service and the steam plant extension. There are also files on the Brandon University Chancellor and long range planning consultants. The sub sub series includes correspondence, minutes, blue prints, reports, financial information, statistics, recommendations and other records.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.6 Board Projects
Four certificates (Congratulations on Brandon University's centennial from the University of Manitoba and McMaster University; congratulations on the 25th Anniversary of Brandon University's charter from the University of Winnipeg; and the centennial organization certificate from the Manitoba Historical Society) were transfered to the McKee Archvies from the President's Office on July 31, 2007.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of invitations, reply cards, some correspondence, and a salary schedule. It also includes agreements, briefs, orders-in-council, bills, memorandums and by-laws dealing with the legislative basis, legal structure and operations of Brandon College Incorporated, Brandon University and BUSU. Sub-series also includes a number of certificates.
Notes
Some of the files in the sub-series pre-date Brandon University. They have been retained in this sub-series to maintain original order.
The Executive Committee is a standing committee of the Brandon University Board of Governors that meets regularly two weeks prior to the regular Board meeting. Its membership consists of: Chair of the Board of Governors; Vice-Chair of the Board of Governors; President of the University; Secretary of the Board of Governors; Treasurer of the Board of Governors; Student Representative from the Board of Governors; and Senate Representative from the Board of Governors. The Vice-President (Academic and Research) and the Vice-President (Administration and Finace) act as resource persons. Elections for the Executive Committee take place at the Board of Governors' August meeting each year.
Specific responsibilities of the Executive Committee include: setting the agenda for each regular and special meeting of the Board of Governors; reviewing relevant matters coming before the Board of Governors; acting as a consultative body to the President of the University; dealing with matters delegated by the Board of Governors; referring items to appropriate standing committees of the Board of Governors; acting with the full authority of the Board in situations requiring immediate action prior to the next regular meeting of the Board. The Executive Committee also reviews and recommends policies governing university finance and long-range planning. The Executive of the Board reports to the Board of Governors.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of records created by the Executive of the Brandon University Board of Governors. It has been divided into three sub sub series: (1) Board Executive Minutes; (2) Board Executive Correspondence; and (3) Board Executive Agendas.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from Board of Governors By-law No. 11 - Committees of the Board of Governors, Section III - Executive Committee (revised November 23, 2006).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.2 Board Executive
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series is comprised of various documents, agreements and contracts generated by A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. Among the documents are by-laws, letters of patents, land deeds, leases, transfers of property, grants of probate, trademark documents, certificates of title, incorporation documents, bills of sale, assets and liabilities, licenses to do business, loan documents, tax statements/certificates, insurance documents, memorandums, declarations, estate documents, releases, settlements, mortgages, and bill 87.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of one folder containing thank you letters to Prof. George F. MacDowell, Professor of Economics at Brandon University, and a long-time member of the McKenzie Seeds Board for his service to the company.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), MG 3 (Brandon University Teaching and Administration), MG 3 1.12 (George MacDowell fonds).
The Brandon Board of Trade was founded in 1883 to promote business activity and economic expansion in Brandon. Aside from these records, no other records of the Board of Trade are known to exist.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
Sub-series includes the intervention of the Board in the 1910 municipal election in Brandon and a listing of the standing committee for 1911. The sub-series also includes a letter to Mr. Blanchard from A.E. McKenzie and a financial statement for the Brandon Commercial Bureau.
Sub-series consists of records for various committees of the Board of Governors, which were established to expedite matters in certain areas of the Board's jurisdiction. Some committees have a more or less permanent status while others were created to deal with specific questions or mandates. The sub-series has been divided into six sub sub series, including: (1) Nominating Committee; (2) Finance Committee; (3) Presidential Selection Committee; (4) Membership Committee; (5) Fundraising-Liaison Committee; and (6) Athletic Directorate.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees
Arrangement
At present (July 2007) all Board Committee files are in one box. As more records are received, the individual committees will be placed into their own boxes.
For administrative history see RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), series 2 (Board of Governors).
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of correspondence and various other documents, including: financial information, legal documents, agendas, reference materials, minutes, blueprints, drawings, reports, briefs, recommendations, proposals and newsclippings.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.4 Correspondence and subject files
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes minutes of the Board of Directors of McKenzie Seeds, extracts from minutes of the Board of Directors, information on shareholders of the company, notices of Board meetings, suggested meeting agendas, the President's annual report for 1967, and memos regarding Board meetings/business.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Additional minutes for the meetings of the Board of Directors of McKenzie
Seeds, dating from the mid 1930's, are held in the Provincial Archives of Manitoba.
Minute excerpts for the Board of Directors are located in the Document sub-series in the file titled By-Laws for 1940-1985.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes financial statements of various kinds for McKenzie Seeds and combined financial statements for McKenzie Seeds and its subsidiaries, particularly McFayden Seeds. Chartered Accountants used for this purpose include: Marwick, Mitchell & Co., Webb, Read, Hegan, Callingham & Co./Webb, Read & Co., George A. Touche & Co., Oscar Hudson & Co., Morden, Sprague & Co./Laird, Sprague & Co., Edwards, Morgan, Halliday & Co., Welch, Hinton and Welch, McDonald, Currie & Co./Cooper Brothers & Co., Meyers Dickens Norris Penny & Co./Meyers, Norris, Penny & Co. and the Comptroller-General for the Province of Manitoba.
This sub-series also includes a number of purchase offers made to A.E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd as well as proposed plans to sell the company. Offers were received from United Grain Growers, Maple Leaf Mills, McKenzie Seeds Staff, Manitoba, Saskatchewan and Alberta Wheat Pools, and the Ferry Morse Seed Co.
Twelve ledgers, including branch order, mail order and cash registers, general ledgers, current ledgers, payroll sheets and branch daily cash reports, are also part of the sub-series. Other miscellaneous financial records and statements include information on McKenzie Seeds' proposal to the Manitoba Government for re-financing in the early to mid 1980's.
Notes
Additional dates for the records in the financial sub-series are as follows:
1. Prepared Financial Statements: 1907-1918, 1920-1923, 1926-1938, and 1942-1979.
2. Purchase Offers: U.G.G. (1959, 1966), Wheat Pools (1961), McKenzie Staff (1963),
Maple Leaf Mills (c. 1965), Ferry Morse Seed Co. (c. 1969-1970).
The extent of the ledgers in sub-series McS 1 1.5 (Financial Records) separate from the other
financial records in the sub-series is 95.9 cm. The financial records without the ledgers measure 60 cm.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Financial statements and records for the individual companies acquired by
McKenzie Seeds are located in Series III.
Information regarding the sale of McKenzie Seeds is located in Series II (Office of the President/GM), sub-series I (A.E. McKenzie), in the file entitled A.E. correspondence with W.A. Johnson. Some of these records are connected to the purchase offers received by McKenzie Seeds.
Photograph was taken by Christy Henry on August 10, 2002 following the grand opening of the Labyrinth of Peace. The Labyrinth is situated in the Assiniboine River Corridor near the Discovery Centre in Brandon, Manitoba.
Custodial History
See series level of the Christy Henry fonds for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the information board for the Labyrinth of Peace.
Storage Location
RG 5 photograph storage drawer
32-2007
Related Material
Additional information on the history of the Labyrinth of Peace project can be found in RG 6 (Brandon University fonds) 7.1.6 (Department of Religion) File 1.
This is an artificially created series consisting of blueprints generated by architects in the course of the construction of the principal structures on the campus of Brandon University.
Custodial History
These records were in the possession of the Vice-president Administration and the Physical Plant Office prior to their transfer to the archives.
Scope and Content
This series consisting of blueprints generated by architects in the course of the construction of the principal structures on the Brandon College campus (1899-1967) and the Brandon University campus since 1967. The blueprints are from three construction eras on the campus the records: 1900-1922; 1960-1972 and 1980 to1996.
Notes
Nine blueprints created by the Kewaunee Manufacturing Company, Wisconsin containing plans for various laboratories and domestic science facilities were culled from the collection of blueprints. There is no specific reference to Brandon College on the blueprints. No evidence exists in the administrative records of Brandon College that laboratory equipment or furniture was acquired from this company.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.1 Documents