Gordon Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Organizational papers: 1960 - 1969 Agreement between MPE and Gordon CEA (7), 6 August 1960 Directors' Resolution, 18 October 1961 Arrangement (1), 23 June 1969 Transfer agreement between MPE and Gordon CEA (2), 23 June 1969 Minutes of Executive Board meetings, volume 1, 12 October 1942 - volume 2, 12 April 1970 Membership list, 1961 - 1966 Note: Gordon Co-operative joined with Bergen elevator in 1987. Rosser Elevator replaced the Bergen-Gordon Elevator, cross reference with Bergen and Rosser. Minutes from meetings for Bergen-Gordon are in the MPE A 200 Rosser file. Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Rosser
Generally good. Some tears. Issues located first and last in the folders Lindsay stored them in are missing sections where the page stuck to the folder.
History / Biographical
James Gordon Lindsay was born June 16, 1925 in Minneapolis, Minnesota where his father, James Lindsay, a Brandon pioneer from Northern Ireland, had been working for the Coca Cola Bottling Company. In November 1925, the Lindsay family moved back to Brandon where they lived at 547 16th Street.
Lindsay attended Park School, Earl Oxford Junior High School and Brandon Collegiate. In September 1943, he entered 2nd Year at Brandon College, joining the Class of 1946. Due to past experience in publishing the BCI yearbook, he was drafted into The Board of Publications and named Co-editor of the Quill along with third year student Genevieve Fuloski. Lindsay and Fuloski held their positions for two years. Because of the war, money and supplies were in short supply and the Quill at one point was reduced to mimeographed pages. While Editor Lindsay wrote The eggshell-Slightly Cracked column.
Lindsay was named Senior Stick in 1945 and graduated from Brandon College with a B.Sc. in 1946. He obtained both his MSc (1948) and PhD (1951) in Physical Chemistry from McMaster University.
During his time in Hamilton, Lindsay met Shirley Woolmer and the couple married on September 2, 1950. They moved to Arvida, Quebec in 1951 where Lindsay accepted an offer from Aluminium Laboratories Limited, the research arm of Alcan Aluminium Ltd. The couple remained in Arvida for twenty-two years, during which time they had four children: Sharon, Heather, Geoffrey and David.
In 1973, Lindsay was transferred to Alcan's head office in Montreal where he spent the next three years co-ordinating alumina research in Alcan plants around the world. In 1976, he accepted a transfer to Alcan Jamaica as Chief Technical Officer and Manager of Technical Development. He and Shirley spent nearly eight years in Jamaica before returning to Canada in 1984. After a yaer at Alcan's Research Centre in Kingston, ON Lindsay took early retirement.
During their years in Jamaica Lindsay had been introduced to Rotary and he continued his association with the organization in Kingston where for fifteen years he was Bulletin editor of the Kingston-Frontenac Rotary Club. In addition to Rotary, Lindsay (along with his wife) took up genealogy in his retirement and after fifteen years of extensive travel and research he became his Lindsay family's historian and author of The Lindsays of Dundonald.
For three years in the late 1980s Lindsay served as a representative on the Brandon University Alumni Executive for Eastern Canada. Along with his wife he attended two class reunions at Brandon University including his 50th Re-convocation in 1996.
At present (June 2010) Gordon Lindsay continues to live in Kingston, ON with his wife.
Custodial History
Materials remained in Gordon Lindsay's possession from time of creation until he donated them to the Archives on September 4, 2009.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of copies of the Quill, including:
1942-1943: No. 11 (January 26, 1943)
1943-1944: Nos. 2, 12, 14 (October 20, 1943, February 2, 1944, February 16, 1944)
1944-1945: Nos. 1-5 and 7-12
1945-1946: Nos. 1-10 (11 issues as there are two labelled No. 4)
Notes
History/Bio information provided by Gordon Lindsay. Description by Christy Henry.
Gordon Hume Daly was born on February 1, 1925 in Cartwright, Manitoba. He spent his early years on his parents' farm, taking his primary and high school education in that district. On January 6, 1945 Gordon enlisted in the Infantry Corp, trained at Shilo, Manitoba, and received his discharge in September of the same year. Upon his discharge he registered in second year Arts at Brandon College. He pursued his many interests there - sports (the college hockey team), the literary society, music (the judge in 'Trial by Jury') and was a member of the Honour Society. Upon graduation in Arts in 1947 from Brandon College, Gordon enrolled at United College in Winnipeg and studied Theology. In 1950 he was ordained in the United Church of Canada. His first pastorate was in Brookdale, Manitoba.
Lois Muriel Dickey was born November 4, 1928 to Myrtle and Alvy Dickey who farmed one mile from the town of Crandall, Manitoba. Lois took her primary and high school education (up to Grade XI) in the Consolidated school in Crandall. After graduating from Grade XI with an Isbister Scholarship, Lois registered at Brandon College and for the next four years lived in the residence of Clark Hall. Movies downtown, college hockey excursions, Wheat King games, college dances - all were new and exciting for a young student from a small Manitoba town. Lois registered in the General Science course and in 1948 graduated with a B.Sc. That same year her family sold their farm and moved to Burnaby, B.C.
During the course of the next three years Lois was employed at three firms: Kelly Douglas Ltd., where she worked for a chemist; Canada Rice Mills, where she assisted the engineer and did secretarial work; and finally with Shell Oil Ltd. in Vancouver. During this period she remained in contact with Brandon College, especially with Rev. Gordon Daly, who she married from Burnaby, B.C. on July 12, 1952.
Following her marriage Lois worked with Gordon in the service of the United Church. In 1952, they embarked on a travel and study venture to Edinburgh, Scotland where Gordon furthered his studies in Theology at New College. After two years, Gordon and Lois and their son Bruce returned to Canada to Northwestern Ontario. In this area they ministered to the towns of Balmertown, Cochenour and McKenzie Island. During this time their son Lorne and daughter Marlene were born. In 1963, the family moved to Swan River, Manitoba where son Mark was born. From 1969-1970, the Daly family participated in an exchange ministry to Australia where Gordon served the Australian United Church of Australia in the town of St. Arnaud, Victoria. Most of the 1970's were spent in Thunder Bay, Ontario. The family moved a final time in 1980 when Gordon accepted a call to Calgary, Alberta.
Gordon Hume Daly died on March 7, 1989. Following Gordon's death Lois chose to remain in Calgary, AB.
Custodial History
Album was in the possession of Gordon Daly until his death in 1989. At that point it passed to his widow Lois Daly. She donated it, along with her own scrapbook, to the McKee Archives on October 18, 2008 while she was visiting Brandon University for Homecoming.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a leather bound photograph album that belonged to Gordon Daly (Class of 1947). It contains approximately 84 black and white photographs of Brandon College students and faculty. A number of the individuals in the photographs have been identified.
Fonds also contains a scrapbook assembled by Lois Daly (nee Dickey), Class of 1948, during her years as a student at Brandon College. The scrapbook contains newspaper clippings, class election paraphenalia, invitations, pressed corsages, graduation documents and cards, invitations, event programmes (hockey, guest speakers, dramatic and musical productions), place cards, exams, chapel programmes, poetry, tickets (hockey, banquet, graduation, movie), a copy of "Trial by Jury" the major production (1946), notices from the Clark Hall boards, 1940 National Registration Certificate, Oscar Peterson's signature, and notes from Sarah Persis Darrach. There are also documents from the 1998 reconvocation of the Class of 1948 at Brandon University. The scrapbook is inside a blue fabric folder tied with a yellow ribbon. A Brandon College (U of M) crest is attached to the front of the folder and there are two track and field ribbons attached to the back inside of the folder.
Notes
All pencil marks in the album were made by Christy Henry during the preparation of photograph descriptions in October 2008. Beryl McLeod helped identify individuals in the photograph album. Description by Christy Henry. History/Bio information was provided by Lois Daly in March 2009.
15 cm textual records; 48 photographs; 10 medals; 1 plaque
Physical Condition
Good
History / Biographical
See RG 6, series 3, sub sub series 3.1.5 (Office of the President - President's files - John Mallea) for biographical information on John Mallea.
Custodial History
Accession 12-2003 was donated to the McKee Archives by John Mallea on March 15, 2003. The materials in accession 18-2007 were donated to the Archives by Mallea in August 2003 and in 2006. Materials in accession 5-2010 were sent to Charlotte Magee, President's Office, who transferred them to the Archives on December 19, 2007.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a number of accessions.
Accession 12-2003 includes 1 b/w photograph; ca. 40 parchments, many commemorating Dr. Mallea's installation as President of Brandon University in 1985; three books written by, edited by or containing work by Dr. Mallea; five article length publications by Dr. Mallea; one file of press clippings ca. 1985-1986, dealing with Brandon University matters; one file of Presidential correspondence dealing with planning and priorities ca. 1986-1989; one scrapbook from the Chinese University of Hong Kong as a memento for Dr. Mallea on the occasion of a lecture given by him at that institution in 1999.
Accession 18-2007 includes an external review of technical universities in Mexico; several participation certificates; ten medals; a photograph album (30 4 x 6 color photos) of the International Evaluation Team for Technological University System of Mexico 1996; one photograph (7.75 x 5" color) of the 1996 Distinguished Education Award Recipients - The Ontario Institute for Studies in Education, University of Toronto.
Medals include: (1) The Pre-Congres Conference of the Fourth World Congress; (2) Tor Vergata; (3) Beiging Normal University China; (4) Xian Jiaotong University; (5) The People's University of China; (6) Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara; (7) Universiti Kebangsaan Malaysia; (8) Bessenyei Gyorgy Tanarkepzo Foiskola; (9) Universitas Helsingiensis; and (10) Universidad Technologica de Nezahualcoyotl. The majority of the medals are in their original boxes.
Accession 5-2010 Consists of a copy of Mallea's curriculum vitae, three certificates from La Asociacion Mexicana Para la Educacion Internacional otorga el presente and a copy of Las Universidades Tecnologicas Mexicanas - Un modelo eficaz, una inversion publica exitosa, un sistema a fortalecar.
Some materials are in Spanish. Others are in Chinese
Storage Location
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.2 John Mallea
Related Material
Additional material relating to Dr. John Mallea are located in RG 9, series 3, sub sub series 3.1.5 (President's Office - President's files - John Mallea).
21 pages of textual records; approximately 4500 slides
Physical Condition
Excellent
History / Biographical
John Welsted was born in Norwich, England on December 6, 1935. In 1958, he received his B.Sc. from the University of Bristol. He obtained his M.Sc. from McGill University in 1960, and his post-graduate certificate in Eduction from the University of Bristol in 1961. He completed his Ph.D. at the University of Bristol in 1971.
In the early 1960s, Welsted taught at high schools in Midenhead, England and in Oromocto, New Brunswick. In 1964-1965, he was an Instructor in the Geography Department at the University of Bristol, and in the summers of 1965-1967, he completed fieldwork in New Brunswick and Nova Scotia. Welsted joined the faculty of Brandon College/University in 1965, as a member of the Geography Department. There he taught courses and served as Acting Head in 1968. John Welsted retired from Brandon University in 1997.
With his wife June, Welsted had two children: Alison and Ian. He later married Kathleen Georgison and became stepfather to Kjirsten, Paul, Peter and Hayley. John Welsted died in Victoria, BC on September 21, 2009.
Custodial History
The document was donated to the Archives on November 5, 2001 by Dr. John Welsted of the Geography Department. The slides were donated by Welsted in August 2006.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a paper, 21 pages in length, titled "Geography at Brandon University: 1962-2001."
It also contains human and physical geography slides of Manitoba and areas other than Manitoba. The slides were created by John Welsted as visual aids for use in his teaching and for use in publications by himself and the Geography Department. They constitute a unique record of the geography of southwestern Manitoba in the later half of the twentieth century.
Notes
All commercially produced slides were culled. An inventory by subject and by box is available.
A copy of Warkentin's convocation address can be found in the "Campus News 1987" file in RG 6, series 10 (Office of Development), sub-series 10.2 (Public Communications).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 6: Senate Office
6.5 Convocation Services, Baccalaureates Services, Banquets
Dr. John Everett Robbins was born 9 October 1903 in Hampton, Ontario the son of John and Gertrude (Brown) Robbins. He married Catherine St. Denis on 11 June 1934 in Ogdens, New York. John Robbins was raised in Darlingford, Manitoba. He attended the University of Manitoba graduating with a B.A. Hon 1928 and M.A.in 1929. Dr. Robbins completed a Ph.D at the University of Ottawa in 1935. From 1936-1951 he was Director of the Education Division, Dominion Bureau of Statistics.
Dr. Robbins helped to found the Canadian Association for Adult Education, the Social Science Research Council of Canada, the Humanities Research Council of Canada, the United Nations Association in Canada, and the Canadian Citizenship Council. In 1942 he became a member of the Board of Directors of Carlton University. Dr. Robbins was active in UNESCO work: he was a member of Canadian Government delegations to foreign conferences, and, in 1951-52, he spent a year as Director of an educational project for Palestinian Refugees in the Middle East.
In 1960, while editor-in-chief of the newly compiled “Encyclopedia Canadiana,” Dr. Robbins was asked to become President of Brandon College. From 1960 to 1967, he oversaw construction of the Arts and Library Building and Lecture Theatre, a Men's Residence, a Dining Hall, a Heating Plant, a Ladies’ Residence, a Music Building, a Physical Education Building and an Education Building. After the university charter was granted in 1967, Dr. Robbins was installed as the first President of Brandon University.
After his retirement from Brandon University Dr. Robbins was appointed Canadian Ambassador to the Vatican 1970-73. In the years after his departure from Brandon, he held many positions including President of World Federalists of Canada 1977-79 and President of the Canadian Writers Foundation
1976-78. Dr. Robbins served as Executive Chairman and Treasurer of Amnesty International in Canada 1973-75.
He was the recipient of an honorary LLD from the University of Manitoba (1967), Carleton University ( 1969) and Brandon University (1974). In 1994, the title President Emeritus of Brandon University was conferred on John Robbins by the Board of Governors of the University. Dr. Robbins died in 1995, at the age of 91.
Scope and Content
Dr. Robbins' administrative records are located in the Brandon University fonds.
Notes
Dr. John E. Robbins archival papers are held at the Library and Archives Canada.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains mainly physical and human geography (of Manitoba) slides. Slide subjects in this box include:
Assiniboine flooding in date order - Brandon; Brandon - the Assiniboine; dams; Brandon Hills; land forms - SW - Manitoba; Bald Head Hills - Spruce woods; Flin Flon; Manitoba flooding; floods/flood protection - Maniotba; Manitoba, areas of; signs and monuments; landforms of SW Manitoba; Souris River; Assiniboine at Brandon; towns and villages - Manitoba; barns; Brandon - Ukrainian area; Manitoba satellite views; and Hutterites.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains mainly physical and human geography (of Manitoba) slides. Slide subjects in this box include:
Fieldwork; floods and flood protection - Canada; Manitoba physical airphotos; Manitoba small water projects; weather and climate - for archives; Lake Agassiz; Canada Games 1997; Winnipeg; Souris River; pelican lake paper; clouds - Manitoba; Lake of the Prairies; Pelican Lake; Manitoba flooding; Brandon and the Assiniboine; vegetation - Manitoba; Portage diversion; Souris-Pembina trench; Red River; Riding Mountain; and Devils Lake.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains physical and human geography (of Manitoba), as well as physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) slides.
Physical and human geography (of Manitoba) subjects in this box include:
Brandon housing; Brandon - the Assiniboine; atmospheric pollution - Brandon; brandon; Brandon commerce and industries; Brandon - Prince Eddy; Brandon - Rosser Ave.; Brandon - 9th and 10th Streets; Brandon elevators; views from BU (Brandon University); Brandon maps and diagrams; Manitoba maps; Assiniboine - other than Brandon; "animals" - Manitoba; and Riding Mountain - West Lake, Interlake.
Physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) subjects in this box include:
Coastal erosion and protection; coasts - general; beaches; tidal deposits; Ottawa-Hull; Saskatoon; Regina; Montreal; Newfoundland; New Brunswick; Nova Scotia; St. Johns; Halifax; Toronto; Ontario; Alberta and British Columbia; Canadian cities; Canadian landforms; St. Lawrence Seaway; Table Mountain - Newfoundland; hydro Canada; remote sensing; sewage; periglacial; coasts - air views; log transport; dunes; deltas; floods and flood protection - others; highland coasts; and water erosion and transport.
Notes
Physical and human geography (of Manitoba) slides from original box 1. Physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) slides from original box 2.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) slides. Slide subjects in this box include:
Saskatchewan; Quebec; Luxembourg; Belgium; Introduction to Denmark; Netherlands; Italy; England - Norfolk and Suffolk; England - Cambridge; England; English landforms; Eire, Scotland, Wales, Sweden; Eastern Europe and USSR; Australia; striations, grooves, gouges etc.; shore platforms; rainsplash; stacks; rain gully erosion; caves and arches; archaeology; cliffs; mass wasting; Brisbane dams; volcanic cones and craters; springs; gorges and canyons; and terraces.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) slides. Slide subjects in this box include:
Australia; New Zealand; U.S.A.; St. Pierre and Miquelon; France; Germany; Vancouver; London; Britain - mainly coasts; clouds; vegetation; water erosion and deposition; coasts; waterfalls and rapids; coasts - erosion; glaciation; Bay of Fundy; rivers - meandering and braiding; and irrigation.
Notes
Slides up to and including "vegetation " are from original box 3. Remaining slides are from original box 4.
See MG 3 1.7 John Welsted fonds for History/Bio information.
Custodial History
See MG 3 1.7 for Custodial History.
Scope and Content
Box contains physical and human geography (other than Manitoba) slides. Slide subjects in this box include:
S. Saskatchewan scheme; mass wasting; limestone scenery; 160? glaciers; measurement water; badlands and hoo doos; weathering; 278 mass wasting; 278 coasts deposition and vegetation; 291 water and wind soil erosion; and 278 rocks and relief.
John Cater Everitt was born on March 7, 1946 in Epping, Essex, England. He obtained his B.A. (Honours) from the University of Leicester in 1967, his M.A. from Simon Fraser University in 1969 and his Ph.D. from the University of California in 1972. All of his degrees are in Geography.
For 1972-1973, Everitt was an Instructor in Geography at Illinois State University. In 1973, he came to Brandon University, where he was employed in the Geography Department until his retirement in January 2008. During his time at BU, Everitt was President of the Brandon University Faculty Association (1981-1982), served as chair of the Geography Department from 1982-1992, and was a member of the Advisory Committee to Foster Internationalisation of Brandon University (1994-1995). Since 1986, he has also been a consultant for the WESTARC Group Inc. in Brandon, Manibota.
Everitt married Donna Shimamura, with whom he has a daughter.
Custodial History
Everitt transfered the records to the McKee Archives in the spring and summer of 2007.
Scope and Content
The records in the collection have not been processed as of yet.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
MG 3 Brandon University Teaching and Administration
1.16 John Everitt