Thomas Russell Wilkins was born in Toronto in 1891. He received his B.A. from McMaster University in 1912, and became the Science Master at Woodstock College the following year. In 1916, he and his wife Olive moved to Chicago, where Wilkins was an instructor of Physics at the University of Chicago. The next year he served as a master signal electrician in the U.S. Signal Corps. During World War I, Wilkins completed pioneer research for the United States Navy, which led to the development of pulse sonar devices in the 1920s. He had also been researching the possibilities of a wireless telephone.
Wilkins and his wife moved to Brandon in 1918, where he took up the position of Professor of Physics. During his time at Brandon College, Wilkins introduced the latest technology to classrooms, designed the original Science Building, and along with the Brandon Citizen's Committee, seucured building funds for the Citizen's Science Building.
Receiving his Ph.D. from the University of Chicago in 1921, Wilkins resigned from Brandon College in 1925 to pursue postgraduate study at Cambridge University. In 1926, he began research at the University of Rochester, where he also took up the position of Professor of Physics. From 1930 to 1938, he acted as the Director of the Institute of Optics.
Widely known for his work in the fields of cosmic rays and atomic disintegration, in April 1939, Wilkins announced the perfection of a camera that was able to record the "footprints" of invisible atoms after they collide. In October 1939, he received a medal from the Royal Photographic Society of Great Britain recognizing his work regarding the use of photographic emulsions in the study of radium. The following year, Wilkins perfected a camera that could determine the energy levels inside the nuclei of stable chemical elements. He received a grant from Sigma Xi, the National Society for the Promotion of Scientific Research, in November of 1940.
Wilkins married twice. The first marriage, to Olive Anges Cross took place on June 17, 1913. Olive Wilkins died suddenly on May 13, 1937, at the age of 45. Wilkins married Susan Gwendolyn Whidden, the daughter of former Brandon College president Dr. H.P. Whidden, in 1938.
Thomas Russell Wilkins died suddenly of a heart attack on December 10, 1940, on his way back to his laboratory after a faculty meeting. He was 49 years old.
Custodial History
Records were accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1998. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
T. Russell Wilkins’ reocrds contain correspondence between himself and Mrs. Wilkins and Dr. Whidden concerning their employment with Brandon College. There are letters between the two men regarding the building of the Science Building in 1920. There is also a copy of the Canadian Baptist. Besides programmes and a picture, there is also correspondence between various people. Dr. Wilkins kept the papers he had written for various classes at McMaster University in the years 1911 and 1912. There is a "toast to the ladies" that he delivered at a banquet of some sort, that gives an interesting view on how Wilkins, and possibly other men of his time, viewed women. There are numerous newspapers clippings, and several pages taken from journals such as Popular Mechanics, Popular Electricity and others. Dr. Wilkins was at the top of his field of study. He was an extremely bright man who managed to create some very useful tools of science. His papers are interesting and informative to read.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from Campus News May 1990
Series has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) Dean of Science; (2) Science Faculty Council; (3) Faculty of Science publications; (4) Department of Psychology; and (5) Department of Biology.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
The John R. Brodie Science Centre was completed in 1971, with the official opening on May 7, 1972. It is located in the southeast corner of the campus and houses the Faculty of Science. The Brodie Building was named for John R. Brodie, a Brandon man who donated $250,000 to Brandon College in 1963 with the stipulation that the money be used for a Science Centre.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of photographs of the John R. Brodie Science Centre.
Notes
Additional biographical information on John R. Brodie is available in his bio file in the Reading Room.
The Citizens' Science Building was built in 1922 and financed by Brandon citizens. It was renamed the Knowles-Douglas Student Union Centre c. 1984 in honour of Brandon College graduates Stanley Knowles and Tommy Douglas, both of the Class of 1930. The Knowles-Douglas Addition was completed in 1987.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of photographs of the Citizens' Science Building and the Knowles-Douglas buildings, which include the Knowles-Douglas Student Union Centre and the Knowles-Douglas Addition.
Box contains bound volumes of Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Volumes in this box include:
MPE Minute Book Sept 1953 – July 1959
MPE Minute Book Oct 1959 – July 1964
MPE Minute Book Oct 1964 – Oct 1968
MPE Minute Book Oct 1968 – July 1971
This book contains the minutes of Memorial Gymnasium Committee meetings during the years 1923 to 1932. There is also a subscription card within the book.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 8: Brandon College Students Association
Elphinstone Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Organizational papers: 1927 - 1978 Memorandum of Association and General By-laws, 11 August 1927 Certificate of incorporation, 17 August 1927 Minutes of first general meeting of shareholders, 18 January 1928 Minutes of first permanent Directors' meeting, 18 January 1928 Memorandum of Agreement, By-laws 8, 9, 10 and 11, 12 November 1929 Minutes of the Shareholders' meeting, 25 July 1931 Directors meeting minutes, 25 July 1931 ECEAL By-law no. 12 \& 13, 25 July 1931 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1931 Letter re Supplementary Agreement, 16 November 1933 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 2 February 1933 Letter, 28 June 1944 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1937 Ageement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 November 1937 ECEAL By-law no. 16, 4 November 1939 Letter re By-law no. 16, 24 March 1941 ECEAL By-law to authorize cancellation of share capital, 2 November 1940 Letter, 24 March 1941 ECEAL By-laws 18, 19, 20 and General By-laws, 15 July 1941 MPE General By-laws, 23 October 1941 ECEAL By-law no. 21, 7 November 1947 Letter re By-law no.21, 27 August 1948 Letter re amendment to General By-laws, 6 May 1949 ECEAL By-law no. 22, 20 June 1949 MPEL By-law amending the general By-laws of the Co., 7 March 1950 Agreement between ECEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1951 ECEAL By-law no. 23, 21 November 1921 MPEL By-law no. 1961-148, 12 October 1961 Directors' resolution, 18 October 1961 Agreement between MPEL and ECEAL, 15 December 1966 ECEAL By-law no. 26, 4 April 1967 Letter re Pioneer Grain Co., 23 February 1978 Minutes of Executive Board meetings, volume 1, 4 February 1928 - volume 7, 13 November 1980 Minutes of Shareholders Annual meetings, 1929 - 1968 (37 reports) Financial records and statistics Statement of surplus, 1937 - 1955 (18 reports) Final statements, 1931 - 1952 (24 reports) Auditors' reports, 1929 - 1967 (26 reports) Analysis of operating results, 1951 - 1963 (11 reports) Detail of grain earnings, 1963 - 1967 (4 reports) Capital loan summary, 31 July 1951 Correspondence, 1929 - 1969 Membership list, 1929 - 1930, 1978 Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Strathclair
Notes
File numbering is not congruous between sub-series arranged prior to 2009 and sub-series arranged or added to after 2009. This will be corrected in the future
See fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This artificially created sub-series contains a variety of legal and official documents related to the operation of the Manitoba Wheat Pool and MPE. Records include the following:
1. Agreements, General By-laws, and Contracts 1924-1972
2. General By-laws
3. Incorporations and Dissolutions
4. Operating Agreements, Agreements for Sale 1940-67
5. MPE Complete Legislation
6. Miscellaneous Documents
7. Elevator Policy, Agreements, Incorporation Certificates / Indebtedness
8. Quantitative Appraisal of Wheat Pool Building (left in original binding)
9. 9th Victory Loan Souvenir: A Portfolio of Reproductions of the Documents of Surrender
10a. Federal Agreement 1972 p.1-126
10b. Federal Agreement 1972
11a. Terminal Expansion 1961 – 1963
11b. Terminal Expansion 1961 – 1963
12. By-Laws and Constitutions
13. MPE & Connaught Laboratories Agreements 1964-66
14. MPE & Connaught Laboratories Agreements 1964-66
15. “Pool Pac” Trade Mark 1964, 1971, 1979
16. Patent #501894 Dust Control Apparatus 1954
17. MPE Agreement w/ Daniel Augustus Kane (General Superintendent appointment) 1928, 1933
18. Manitoba Co-operative Wheat Producers Ltd. Agreement w/ Richard M. Mahoney (Manager) 1924, 1925, 1928
19. MPE Acts
20. MPE Acts
21. Party & Supplementary Agreements 1931-1936
22a. Historical Documents of the Manitoba Wheat Pool 1924 - 1927
22b. Historical Documents of the Manitoba Wheat Pool 1927 - 1930
23a. Miscellaneous Documents 1925 -1996
23b. Miscellaneous Documents 1979 -1998
24. Association Documents 1940 - 1966
25. Deed of Trust and Mortage August 2 1928
26. Wheat and Coarse Grains Overpayments 1929-1930
Co-enerco was a co-operative energy company that resulted from the Co-operative Resources Project.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of records pertaining to the formation of Co-enerco.
This box contains general circulars sent out by the MPE central office to the local ssociations. The records include the following:
5b. General Circulars 1931
6a. General Circulars 1932
6b. General Circulars 1932
7. General Circulars 1933
8. General Circulars 1934
9. General Circulars 1935
10. General Circulars 1936
11a. General Circulars 1937
11b. General Circulars 1937
A commission to inquire into the formation and operation of the Manitoba Pool up until 1931. Charges were brought against the Pool by J.R. Murray, then Assistant General Manager of UGG. The four charges were, briefly: (1) producers had been mislead into forming elevator associations, (2) members are bound by contract to the association, (3) financial statements sent out to associations are inaccurate, (4) Pool members are not getting as good a deal as they would on the free market.
The first two charges were deemed provable by the commission, while the last two were not. It was noted by the commissioner that no pool members had come forward with complaints.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
.This sub-series contains volumes 1 - 25 of the Royal Commission on Manitoba Pool Elevators.
Box contains minutes geenrated by local MPE associations, collected and microfilmed by the central office. Rolls in this box include the following:
Roll 13: Oakbank 1940-51; Oakburn 1940-51; Oak Lake 1928-51; Oakland 1928-51; Oakville 1928-51; Osbourne 1927-51; Rapid City 1926-51; Pierson 1928-51; Pilot Mound 1928-51; Pipestone 1929-51; Poplar Point 1947-51; Portage 1927-51; Purves 1928-51
Roll 14: Rapid City 1926-27; Rathwell 1928-51; Regent 1927-51; Reston 1927-51; Rhodes 1928-48; Riverton 1948-51; Sandy Lake 1943-51; Selkirk 1947-51; Roblin 1926-51; Rossburn 1929-51; Roundthwaite 1928-51; Russell 1940-51; Ste Agathe 1946-51; St Jean 1949-51; Sanford 1927-51; Scrick 1944-51
Roll 15: missing
Roll 16: Starbuck 1927-40; Stonewall 1939-51; Strathclair 1947-51; Swan Lake 1928-51; Teulon 1940-51; Thorn Hill 1926-51; Tilston 1928-51; Treherne 1928-51; Vista 1940-51; Warren 1947-51; Waskada 1925-51; Wawanesa 1927-51; Wood Bay 1937-51; Wood Bay 1926-37; Wood North 1928-51
Roll 17: Side 1 Alexander to Birdtail Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Birnie to Cartwright Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 18: Side 1 Chillon to Ebor Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Eden to Fork River Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 19: Side 1 Forrest to Hamiota Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Harding to Kronsgart Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 20: Side 1 Landseer to Maples Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Margaret to Napinka Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 21: Side 1 Neelin to Purvis Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Rapid City to Silverton Oct 1951 – June 1957
Roll 22: Side 1 Sinclair to Warren Oct 1951 – June 1957; Side 2 Waskada to Woodnorth Oct 1951 – June 1957
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1931-32 McA-Wo; 1932-33 A-Ed; 1932-33 El-Md; 1932-33 McA-Wo; 1933-34 A-Ed; 1933-34 El-Md; 1933-34 McA-Wo; 1934-35 A-Ed; 1934-35 El-Ma; 1934-35 McA-Wo
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
14a. Sub-district #304 Oct 8 1996 – June 23 1993
14b. Sub-district #304 August 3 1993 – August 6 1996
15a. Sub-district #305 Oct 2 1996 – April 7 1999
15b. Sub-district #305 August 4 1993 – August 7 1996
16a. Sub-district #401 April 11 1996 – August 10 1999
16b. Sub-district #401 August 10 1993 – Feb 7 1996
17a. Sub-district #402 March 21 1997 – August 16 1999
17b. Sub-district #402 August 4 1993 – Jan 27 1997
18. Sub-district #403 August 3 1993 – August 17 1999
19. Sub-district #404 Nov 2 1993 – April 16 1999
20a. Sub-district #405 Feb 9 1996 – July 12 1999
20b. Sub-district #405 August 5 1993 – Dec 7 1995
21. Sub-district #501 Nov 4 1993 – April 8 1999
22a. Sub-district #502 Nov 16 1995 – Oct 27 1998
22b. Sub-district #502 August 3 1993 – Oct 3 1995
23a. Sub-district #503 April 8 1996 – June 28 1999
23b. Sub-district #503 Nov 24 1992 – Feb 12 1996
24a. Sub-district #504 March 13 1996 – August 18 1999
24b. Sub-district #504 August 11 1993 – Jan 4 1996
25a. Sub-district #505 July 31 1996 – June 29 1999
25b. Sub-district #505 Oct 27 1993 – April 11 1996
26a. Sub-district #601 Oct 28 1996 – July 7 1999
26b. Sub-district #601 August 10 1993 – July 18 1996
27a. Sub-district #602 Oct 24 1996 – Feb 15 1999
27b. Sub-district #602 August 31 1993 – April 3 1996
28. Sub-district #603 August 10 1993 – April 15 1999
The Manitoba Wheat Pool and Manitoba Pool Elevators kept and preserved a chronological record of the meetings of the MPE Board of Directors and annual delegate meetings. The minutes were typed and bound, then placed in the MPE reference library so that employees and members could access them.
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of minutes of organizational meetings and later meetings held by the Central Office of the Manitoba Wheat Co-operative Producers, Ltd (later known as the Manitoba Wheat Pool) from 1923 until it went under in 1934, and of meetings held by the central office of Manitoba Pool Elevators from 1925 until 1997.
Box contains bound volumes of Manitoba Wheat Pool and Manitoba Pool Elevators central office meeting minutes. Volumes in this box include:
Manitoba Wheat Co-operative Producers, Ltd. July 1923 – May 1929; Manitoba Wheat Pool June 1929 – June 1934
MPE Minute Book May 1925 – July 1937
MPE Minute Book Sept 1953 – July 1959
MPE Minute Book August 1946 – July 1953