Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley) Pentland, son of T.J. and Annie Isabel (McVety) Pentland, was born on October 21, 1889 in Justice, MB. He died on September 25, 1981 in Brandon, MB. Wesley married Harriet Mary Brownell on April 14, 1942 in Winnipeg, MB. They had no children.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
2.1 Income tax forms 1939
2.1a Wes Pentland correspondence 1911-1917
2.2 Moore/Thomas deed of land 1886-1906
2.3 Postcards ca.1900 - ca.1910
2.4 Correspondence 1911-1946
2.5 Oil leases (Rio Bravo, Canadian Superior, Imperior) 1949-1950
2.6 Livestock records 1947-1951
2.7 Orange Lodge speech and visitations [1939]; dividend certificates 1939
2.8 Automobile club membership 1937-1944
2.9 Life insurance documents 1919-1945
2.10 Mortgage documents 1914-1922
2.11 School records [1911-1913]
2.12 Mrs. Wes Pentland (Harriet) fur insurance policy 1948
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
Thomas James (T.J.) Pentland, son of John Pentland and Jane Finnegan, was born January 4, 1858. He died January 8, 1919 in Justice, MB. T.J. married Annie Isabel McVety on July 22, 1885 in High Bluff, MB. Together they had six children: John Alfred (Fred); Henry Herbert McVety (Harry); Annie Ethel; Eliza Evelyn; Thomas Elton Wesley (Wesley); and Mary Agnes Grace Isabel (Gracie).
Annie Isabel McVety was born at Seaforth, ON in 1859 and came to High Bluff, MB with her family in 1882. She died in October of 1938 in Justice, MB.
John Alfred (Fred) Pentland was born on July 5, 1886 in Douglas, MB. He was mortally wounded during the Passchedale campaign - 3rd battle of Ypres. He died on September 13, 1917 at Camiers Hospital, France.
Henry Herbert McVety (Harry) Pentland was born on November 10, 1887 in Douglas, MB. He died on June 26, 1948 in Brandon, MB. Harry married Mary Emma Irene (Irene) Fleming, daughter of John Jr. and Martha McLaughlin Fleming on November 22, 1913 in Brandon. Together they had three children: Harry Clare (Clare); Olive Eunice Irene (Eunice); and Shirley Margaret Marie.
Eliza Evelyn (Evelyn) Pentland was bon February 7, 1892 in Justice, MB. She died on May 28, 1986 in Brandon, MB. Evelyn married Norman Wallace Thompson on July 22, 1914 in Justice, MB. Together they had six children: Norman Cecil; Muriel Isabel; Norma Evelyn Jean; James Alfred; Marguerite Beryl; and Helen Elaine.
No biographical information available for Robert and Harry McVety.
Scope and Content
Contains the following files:
[no file number] Mortgage papers 1890-1907
10.1 Fred Pentland insurance documents 1912-1916 (includes 1914 mortgage agreement)
10.2 Fred Pentland correspondence 1910-1916 (2 files)
10.3 Fred Pentland postcards 1916
10.4 Harry Pentland correspondence 1916-1918
10.5 Harry McVety correspondence from Wes Pentland 1912
10.6 Evelyn Pentland correspondence 1910
10.7 Robert McVity correspondence 1920 (includes 1921 will)
10.8 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1930-1936
10.9 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland insurance documents 1917
10.10 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland income tax papers 1917
10.11 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland undated correspondence
10.12 Thomas (T.J.) Pentland corresondence 1882-1911
10.13 Annie I. Pentland insurance documents 1917-1937
10.14 Annie I. Pentland undated correspondence
10.15 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate correspondence 1917-1945
10.16 Annie I. Pentland-McVety estate documents 1922-1931
10.17 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1928-1938 (3 files)
10.18 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1918-1927
10.19 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1917 (2 files)
10.20 Annie I. Pentland correspondence 1908-1916 (2 files)
10.21 Annie I. Pentland income tax forms 1918-1921
10.22 Annie I. Pentland mathematics exam to enter Normal School August 1883
Notes
Part of the Alfred Angus Murray McPherson collection.
For administrative history see RG 6 (Brandon University fonds), series 2 (Board of Governors).
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of open and closed minutes for general Board of Governors' meetings.
Notes
During the Mallea era, some of the minutes have the name "David" handwritten on them. "David" refers to David Wilke, the executive assistant to the President.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.3. Board agendas, minutes and packages
The A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd. has had a Board of Directors since its incorporation in 1906. The first Board consisted of A. E. McKenzie, S. A. Bedford, the director of the Experimental Farm, H. L. Patmore and W. A. McCracken. Following A.E. McKenzie’s death, the government of Manitoba appointed the members of the Board under the arrangements made with the establishment of the A.E. Mckenzie Foundation.
According to the general by-laws (c. 1960) of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd., the Board of Directors annually, or more often if required, elected from among themselves a President, a Vice-President and a General Manager. They were also responsible for appointing an Assistant General Manager, and a Secretary and a Treasurer. If needed, they would also appoint an Assistant Secretary and an Assistant Treasurer. A majority vote of the Board was required for the election or appointment of the above officers. Those individuals elected or appointed to their offices by the Board could be removed at the pleasure of the Board. The Board also had the power to fix the salaries of all of the officers of the Company. By resolution, it could pass this responsibility to the General Manager.
Custodial History
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This series consists of Board minutes/meetings, management consultant reports, financial records, documents and miscellaneous records.
It has been divided into five sub-series, including: (1) Documents; (2) Minutes/Meetings; (3) Management Consultant Reports; (4) Miscellaneous; and (5) Financial Records.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
This is an artificially created series consisting of blueprints generated by architects in the course of the construction of the principal structures on the campus of Brandon University.
Custodial History
These records were in the possession of the Vice-president Administration and the Physical Plant Office prior to their transfer to the archives.
Scope and Content
This series consisting of blueprints generated by architects in the course of the construction of the principal structures on the Brandon College campus (1899-1967) and the Brandon University campus since 1967. The blueprints are from three construction eras on the campus the records: 1900-1922; 1960-1972 and 1980 to1996.
Notes
Nine blueprints created by the Kewaunee Manufacturing Company, Wisconsin containing plans for various laboratories and domestic science facilities were culled from the collection of blueprints. There is no specific reference to Brandon College on the blueprints. No evidence exists in the administrative records of Brandon College that laboratory equipment or furniture was acquired from this company.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.1 Documents
The “Act to Incorporate Brandon College” was assented to on June 1, 1900 and specified that the Board of Directors would consist of 21 members. The Board was to control all financial matters of the College, though all decisions had to meet the approval of the Baptist Convention.
The first officers of the Board were a Chairman, a Treasurer and a Secretary. The minutes also refer to a “President,” separate from the Principal, but does not define the President’s duties. The Principal was a member ex-officio of the Board. The first duty of the Board was to create an executive consisting of all Brandon members of the Board. The main function of the executive was the operation of the College and transaction of all business arising between Board meetings.
In pursuit of a separate university charter, the Board reorganized its affairs in 1910, appointing an investment committee, a Bursar and a Registrar. The Principal was renamed “President,” and was appointed Chairman of the Executive. The university charter was denied, leading the Board to seek affiliation with McMaster University. The Board of Directors during this time was forced to take a more active role in directing college affairs. In November 1910, the Board moved: ...that the officers of the Board be authorized to make such application for such amendments to the Charter as seem necessary and advisable.
This decision led the Board to draw up the Act to Amend An Act to Incorporate Brandon College which, by 1915, granted the Board authority over all College affairs, following the stated direction of the Baptist Convention.
On May 5, 1916 a nominating committee was struck to name the persons and mandate of all new committees.
During the existence of the Board prior to 1967 the following committees were created:
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
In 1918, the Board defined the functions of the Executive Committee as:
The Board of Brandon College shall at its organization meeting each year appoint from among its members an Executive of not less than seven in number. The Executive shall be responsible to the Board and shall exercise all the powers usually incidental to an Executive other than those delegated to the Finance Committee and Endowment Fund Committee, which two Committees shall also be responsible to the Board direct.
FINANCE COMMITTEE, 1918-1926
The Finance Committee was to consist of no fewer than seven members which:
...shall be responsible to the Board and shall under the Board have the general oversight and control of the financial policy of the College insofar as the raising of funds is concerned. The Finance Committee shall not have the power to make any expenditures except such as it may deem necessary to incur in connection with its efforts in raising funds. The Finance Committee shall report to the Board of the College at each meeting of the Board and for the purpose of keeping the Executive in close touch with its activities and of enabling the two committees to work in closest cooperation shall transmit to the Executive a copy of the minutes of each of its meetings to be read at the regular meetings of the Executive and shall give account of the progress made by the Finance Committee and generally of its plans for the future. Members of the Finance Committee shall not all necessarily be members of the Board.
ENDOWMENT FUND COMMITTEE, 1918-1926
The Endowment Fund Committee was created by the following resolution:
The Board of Brandon College shall at its Organization Meeting each year appoint an Endowment Fund Committee which shall under the Board manage the Endowment Fund and direct the re-investment of its principal. The Endowment Fund Committee shall consist of not less than three members who shall not all necessarily be members of the Board.
The creation of the latter two committees was significant because it was the first time that Brandon citizens, not necessarily Baptists, were brought into the administration.
HOUSE AND GROUNDS COMMITTEE, 1923-1926
NEW INSTRUCTORS COMMITTEE, 1923-1936
ADVERTISING COMMITTEE, 1923-1936
BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION AND ENDOWMENT COMMITTEE, 1926-1936
TEACHERS COMMITTEE, 1929-1936
GENERAL PUBLICITY COMMITTEE, 1930-1936
By 1936, however, all Committees were abandoned as Brandon College struggled for its financial survival. After the Baptist Convention withdrew all of its support in 1938, a Provisional Board was established through the Brandon Board of Trade to negotiate with the government for the transfer of Brandon College to the Government of Manitoba. The provisional board succeeded in gathering the needed support for government intervention, and resurrected the College under “An Act to Incorporate Brandon College Incorporated.”
The new Board of Directors was appointed October 11, 1939 during a general shareholders meeting. The officers of the Board were a Chairman, a Secretary and a Treasurer. There were also six new standing committees appointed, with mandates listed under clause 16 of by-law 1:
FINANCE COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty it shall be to oversee the finances of the Corporation and make recommendations to the Board as to investments of Monies received for endowment or scholarship purposes, and to prepare and submit the annual budget.
PROPERTY COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... who shall have general supervision of the real and personal property of the Corporation.
ENROLLMENT COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to obtain a student body for the College, to co-operate with the President and Faculty for such purpose and report to the Board as may be required from time to time.
FACULTY COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to make preliminary arrangements for the engagement of teachers and who shall make recommendations to the Board for consideration in the engagement of such teachers.
MEMBERSHIP COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to maintain the membership of the Corporation and see that proper records of the same are maintained.
ENDOWMENT COMMITTEE, 1939-1967
... whose duty shall be to obtain endowments for the future operation of the College and to obtain gifts for scholarship purposes.
In 1942 the Public Relations and Progress Committee was established and a Public Relations Officer was hired. A Consultant Committee was appointed in 1948 with the sole purpose of overseeing the transfer of McKenzie Seeds to the provincial government for financial support through the McKenzie Foundation.
Scope and Content
Series consists mainly of minutes of meetings and correspondence between various Board members and the College. It is a very detailed and descriptive compilation of the decision-making processes at a higher education institution. There are copies of minutes from the Executive Committee in amongst the general Board Minutes. Series also contains a copy of an appraisment of Brandon College Inc. by the General Appraisal Company Ltd. (Vancouver) completed in 1957.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 1: Board of Directors
Arrangement
Series has been divided into one sub-series: (1) Minutes of General Board Meetings.
The Board of Governors of Brandon University is a body established by the Brandon University Act (1998), a statute of the Province of Manitoba. The Act vests in the Board the authority for governing Brandon University. The members of the Board of Governors, as trustees, hold the University in trust for the people of the Province of Manitoba. Responsibilities for maintaining this trust include: selection of a president, monitoring his/her performance, providing guidance to the University via its policies, and often delegating authority to the administration.
The Board of Governors is a collective representing the entire community (both internal and external of the University). As a collective, the Board of Governors is responsible for ensuring the financial stability of the institution and for seeing that the overall plans of the institution are consistent with the institution’s philosophy, goals, and financial resources.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of records generated and collected by the Brandon University Board of Governors in the course of perfoming its functions. The fonds is divided into six sub-series, incuding: (1) Documents; (2) Board Executive; (3) General Board agendas, minutes and packages; (4) Correspondence and subject files; (5) Board of Governors' committees; and (6) Board projects.
Notes
The information in the History/Bio field was taken from the Brandon University webpage (http://www.brandonu.ca/Administration/Governors/) on December 2, 2005.
Access Restriction
All files in the series are restricted. Researchers are required to contact the Executive Secretary to the Board of Governors to obtain written permission to access the records. Contact:
204-727-9714
board@brandonu.ca
Fleming School, located at 2320 Louise Avenue, Brandon, MB, was a part of the Brandon School Division from its creation in 1914 until its closure in 2005. The school was named to commemorate the life of pioneer Dr. Alexander Fleming. Fleming, who was a Scottish born immigrant, came to Brandon in 1881, where he worked as Brandon's first medical doctor and pharmacist. He also held the role of chairman for the Brandon School Board. Fleming died in Brandon on November 26, 1897.
Rapid population growth in the City of Brandon in the early part of the 20th century resulted in a need for additional school buildings; Fleming School was among the schools established during this period. Designed by W.H. Shillinglaw, the structure was constructed out of concrete, wood and brick, and included a basement. When the school first opened, it was composed of six classrooms; after two renovations in 1953 and 1962, the school expanded with more classrooms and a gymnasium. At the time of its closure, Fleming School could accommodate seven classes, covering grades kindergarten to grade six.
Around 2004, the Brandon School Division decided to close Fleming Elementary School. Prior to the closure a celebration was held on January 14, 2005, to honour the school's 90th Anniversary. Following the school's official closing, students were reallocated to Earl Oxford Elementary School (540 18th Street). Some of the former staff found work in other schools within the Division, while Craig Manson, the last principal of Fleming School, became principle of Green Acres Elementary School.
The building formerly used as Fleming Elementary School became a high school for the Sioux Valley Dakota Nation in late 2006. The Band bought the building in late 2010.
Custodial History
Records were collected and created by Fleming School staff and administration, many for the 90th anniversary and closing of the school. Craig Manson, the last principal of Fleming School, gave the records to David Wilson, who donated them to the S.J. McKee Archives in 2015.
Scope and Content
Collection consists of records that document the history of Fleming School. Many of the records were created and gathered specifically by Craig Manson and others for the school's 90th anniversary; on November 19, 2006 an ad written by Grant Hamilton was placed in the Brandon Sun with Jean Pickard asking for potential archives from Fleming School to be donated by contacting Keith Heide at the Brandon School Division. The archives were to be used in a display on education in Brandon to be located in the Town Centre in June 2007. Other records were collected and created by the school's staff and administration to document the activities and student of their school.
Textual records include newspaper clippings, staff and administration lists (1914-2005), programs, calendars, correspondence, anecdotes, as well as records related to the events surrounding the 90th anniversary and the closure of the school. The 90th anniversary celebration materials include Craig Manson's speech and agenda, the lyrics to the school song, and a list of people in attendance. The newspaper clippings, with capture the experiences of Fleming students, are evidence of the staff's interest in the lives of their current and former students.
Also included in the textual records is in depth genealogical research for the Fleming family. The research includes birth and death dates, photographs of grave sites and residences of Fleming family members, as well as some correspondence around the school's 90th anniversary. The photographs in the album include both originals and photocopies.
Photographs in the collection, like the newspaper clippings, document the activities and events of Fleming School, its students and staff. They include candid's from the classroom, various ceremonies (including the 90th anniversary), and the celebration of holidays (especially Halloween). There are also a number of class and staff portraits.
The collection also includes audio visual materials. The VHS recording entitled "Fleming School 90th Birthday Tea," runs approximately 75 minutes and was videoed by Ian Carkener. The DVD, which runs 42 minutes, was created by the staff and students for the 90th anniversary celebration. It has three components: "Through the Decades" shows students re-enacting school scenes from earlier decades; "Students at Work and Play," shows the 2004-2005 students in their classroom environment during holiday celebrations, school ceremonies and working on assignments; and "Reflections," which includes a slide show of photographs of Fleming School throughout the years set to music.
Finally, the collection includes four artifacts: one 90th anniversary celebration balloon with an image of the school building and the its years of operation printed on it; a school magnet with the school phone number and an image of the brick school building; and two pins. The first pin is circular with a black background and gold details including the school's name, three silhouettes and three maple leaves. The second pin appears to have a hornet or bee emblem with the number 72.
Notes
History/bio information was taken from the records, as well as the Manitoba Historical Society's website (Alexander Fleming, Fleming School - accessed on September 30, 2016), the Brandon School Division website (Fleming School - accessed on September 30, 2016) and Grant Hamilton's article "Gathering school archives while they can" (Brandon Sun, November 19, 2006). Description by Megan Treloar (September 2016) and Christy Henry.
Sub sub series consists of the following publications:
Department of Music General Information Academic Season 1956-1957; Department of Music General Information Academic Season 1957-1958; Department of Music General Information Academic Season 1959-1960; Department of Music General Information Academic Season 1960-1961; Department of Music General Information Academic Season 1961-1962; School of Music Academic Season 1962-1963; School of Music Academic Season 1963-1964; School of Music Academic Season 1964-1965; School of Music Academic Season 1965-1966; School of Music 1967
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
7.4 School of Music
3.85 m textual records; 880 photographs (220 negatives); 26 slides
Physical Condition
Good
History / Biographical
The Brandon School of Nursing was established in 1921, at the Brandon Hospital for Mental Diseases (hereafter B.H.M.D.). It was first alluded to in 1913, when the Superintendent of the B.H.M.D., J.J. McFadden, recommended it as a means of enhancing the reputation of the hospital. In 1919, the Canadian National Committee for Mental Hygiene released a highly critical report on the state of custodial institutions for the mentally ill in Canada that paved the way for reforms such as the establishment of psychiatric nursing schools. In 1920, the new superintendent, Dr. Charles A. Baragar, in his first annual report, again mentioned the need for trained nurses and instructional facilities in which to train them. Lectures began at B.H.M.D. in October of 1920 for attendants and nurses, but they were not compulsory and were not part of a formal program of studies. This was followed in 1921 with the establishment of the School of Nursing through which courses were offered beginning in 1922. The program consisted of a two year Mental Nurses Diploma Course, and a shorter "demonstrative" course that was required for all employees of the B.H.M.D. who elected not to enroll in the diploma course. The Class of 1923 was the first class of graduates from the Brandon School of Nursing. They were, by all accounts, the first graduates in all of Western Canada with a diploma in Mental Nursing. In 1924, wages at the B.H.M.D. were adjusted to take into account the completion of formal training in psychiatric nursing. In 1925, a short lived affiliation with the St. Boniface General Hospital in Winnipeg, that ended in 1927, was begun. That year also saw the beginning of a graduate studies course. In 1930, the diploma course grew to a three year program. In 1986, as many aspects of the B.H.M.D. - now referred to as the B.M.H.C. (Brandon Mental Health Center) - were phased out in favor of community based care, the B.M.H.C. School of Nursing was incorporated into Brandon University's School of Nursing, which began to offer a 2 year Post-Diploma Degree in Nursing and Mental Health.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 2000. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series consists of a collection of records dealing with the history of the School of Nursing at the Brandon Mental Health Centre. The records consist primarily of administrative documentation created by the school dealing with various internal issues, such as student recruitment, graduation services - including an almost complete collection of graduation programs - and records dealing with the behavior of the students. Administrative records also refer to external issues faced by the B.H.M.D. as a whole, such as its burgeoning patient population and the constant problem of adaquate accommodations for patients, staff, and student nurses. The collection also includes staff recollections, and correspondence from within and from outside of the B.H.M.D. Also included are documents relating directly to the history of the School of Nursing and of the B.H.M.D. as a whole. A smaller amount of curriculum materials, including instruction manuals, notebooks, and hand-written lecture notes are also included. Publications from within the B.H.M.D.., including "The Opinion" from 1970-1990, and the "The Ego" 1956 - 76 (seven editions) are also included, as well as a collection of outside publications dealing with psychiatric nursing, mental diseases, medical ethics, and heredity. Fonds also includes medical dictionaries and handbooks of different nursing institutions such as the Victorian Order of Canadian Nurses. Lastly, the collection includes approximatley 880 photographs, 220 negatives, and 26 slides, that provide a graphic portrayal of the history of the Brandon Mental Health Centre.
Notes
A detailed inventory for the textual records exists. An inventory for the photo collection is also avaiable. The description for this sub sub series was written by Mike White (2002).
Access to these materials is restricted. Those interested in the collection should consult the Archivist.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
7.5 School of Health Studies
Related Material
Other material relating to the BHMD./BMHC. are housed at the Manitoba Provincial Archives.
Arrangement
The sub sub series is organized into eight sub sub sub series, including: (1) History; (2) Correspondance; (3) Administrative Records; (4) Curriculum Materials; (5) Publications of B.M.H.C.; (6) Outside Publications; (7) Photographs, Slides, and Negatives; and (8) Miscellaneous Items.
The Griswold Protestant School District was established on September 9, 1885, to provide schooling for children residents in the village of Griswold and the surrounding countryside. It became the Griswold School District following school reform in Manitoba in 1890. The District existed until the early 1960s, when it was incorporated first into Brandon School Division #40 and subsequently into Division #41 (La Bosse). The Griswold School was still in operation in 1967. The building is now used as a community center.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned in 1997 by the McKee Archives. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
The single minute book in this fonds contains minutes on meetings held by the Griswold School District, in Griswold, Manitoba from 1907 to 1943. The minutes deal with questions related to teacher hiring and general administration in the school district.
Administrative history for the Basswood School District is currently unavailable.
Custodial History
Accessioned in 2007 by the McKee Archives. Prior custodial history is unknown.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of van driver contracts (1916-33), income tax forms (1919-38), school inspector's reports (1922-29), high school examination results (1926-34), correspondence with Western Seating Co. (1922), school censuses (1919-38), bus route plans (1916-34), caretaker agreemtns (1918-33), transportation expenditure forms (1917-38), equalizaton of taxes forms (1916-34), annual meeting reports (1924, 1927), Department of Education reports (1921-38), secondary school taxes notice to council forms (1926-33), Manitoba income tax employers' returns (1923-32), library reports (1929-34), requisitions for library books (1916-30), assessments (1919-34), teacher's annual reports (1937-38) and a miscellaneous file including records related to pupil promotions, teacher's retirement fund, religious teaching, a hectograph recipe, by-laws and insurance (1922-38).
Notes
Receipts from 1938-1939 were culled. Description by Christy Henry.
Bankburn School was located 1/2 mile west and about three miles north of Oak River, Manitoba. The Bankburn School Literary Society was formed in 1906.
Custodial History
Records were donated to the McKee Archives by Anne Pettapieces in March 1978.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of the minutes of the Literary Society of the Bankburn School (1906-1907) and a copy of Vol.1, No.1 of The Bankburn Star, which includes some information on and two photos of the school.