Four certificates (Congratulations on Brandon University's centennial from the University of Manitoba and McMaster University; congratulations on the 25th Anniversary of Brandon University's charter from the University of Winnipeg; and the centennial organization certificate from the Manitoba Historical Society) were transfered to the McKee Archvies from the President's Office on July 31, 2007.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of invitations, reply cards, some correspondence, and a salary schedule. It also includes agreements, briefs, orders-in-council, bills, memorandums and by-laws dealing with the legislative basis, legal structure and operations of Brandon College Incorporated, Brandon University and BUSU. Sub-series also includes a number of certificates.
Notes
Some of the files in the sub-series pre-date Brandon University. They have been retained in this sub-series to maintain original order.
Sub-series consists of records for various committees of the Board of Governors, which were established to expedite matters in certain areas of the Board's jurisdiction. Some committees have a more or less permanent status while others were created to deal with specific questions or mandates. The sub-series has been divided into six sub sub series, including: (1) Nominating Committee; (2) Finance Committee; (3) Presidential Selection Committee; (4) Membership Committee; (5) Fundraising-Liaison Committee; and (6) Athletic Directorate.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 2: Board of Governors
2.5 Board of Governors' committees
Arrangement
At present (July 2007) all Board Committee files are in one box. As more records are received, the individual committees will be placed into their own boxes.
See fonds level description of custodial history of A. E. McKenzie Seed Co. Ltd.
Scope and Content
This sub-series includes minutes of the Board of Directors of McKenzie Seeds, extracts from minutes of the Board of Directors, information on shareholders of the company, notices of Board meetings, suggested meeting agendas, the President's annual report for 1967, and memos regarding Board meetings/business.
Storage Location
RG 3 A.E. McKenzie Company fonds
McS 1 Board of Directors
Related Material
Additional minutes for the meetings of the Board of Directors of McKenzie
Seeds, dating from the mid 1930's, are held in the Provincial Archives of Manitoba.
Minute excerpts for the Board of Directors are located in the Document sub-series in the file titled By-Laws for 1940-1985.
See series level description (RG 6 Brandon University fonds, series 6: Brandon University Senate) for history/bio information.
Custodial History
Records were transfered to the McKee Archives from the Senate Office in 1998.
Scope and Content
Accession 14-1998 includes minutes, related materials, and committee reports considered during meetings of the Brandon University Provisional Senate from January 1967 to June 1967, as well as Senate minutes, related reports and materials from meetings of Senate in the years 1967 to 1987. In addition, the Senate records include an Index to topics in Senate minutes for the years 1967 to 1977, minutes of the Senate Planning Committee 1970-73, and minutes of the Senate Executive Committee (1969-1987).
Box 1
Files 1-3 Minutes only 1967-1971.
Files 4-5 Provisional Senate January 1967-June 1967.
Files 6-13 Minutes regular Senate meetings August 10, 1967 - October 8, 1970.
Box 2
Senate Index A-Z 1967-1977
Senate Minutes and materials (9 files) October 4, 1970 - January 4, 1973
Minutes Senate Planning Committee February 10, 1970 - February 7, 1973.
Box 3
Senate Minutes and materials (13 files) December 22, 1972 - December 10, 1974.
Senate Only (2 files) 1972-1976
Box 4
Senate minutes and materials (13 files) February 4, 1975 - January 18, 1977
Senate minutes only (2 files) 1977-1981.
Box 5
Senate minutes and materials (12 files) March 29, 1977 - May 6, 1980.
Box 6
Senate minutes and materials (13 files) September 30, 1980 - December 4, 1984
Box 7
Senate Executive Committee minutes (13 files) October 6, 1969 - August 12, 1987.
Box 8
Senate minutes and materials (12 files) January 1985 - October 27, 1987.
Notes
Senate minutes for 2001-2005 are available online on Brandon University's webpage under Faculty and Staff: Senate: Minutes.
Access Restriction
Closed Session minutes available only with the permission of the University Archivist.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 6: Senate Office
The sub-series contains the minutes from Library Committee meetings. There are also minutes from the meetings of various sub-committees such as the Open Shelf Sub-Committee and the Sub-Committee on Apportionment of Library Funds. Includes minute books and files.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 14: Brandon College Library
The General Faculty Council consists of the following: a) the President, who shall be the Chair; b) the Vice-President (Academic/Research); c) the Dean of each Faculty/School; d) the Director of the Educational Technology Unit; e) the University Librarian; f) the Dean of Students; g) teaching personnel of the Faculties and Schools; h) Professional Associates, Administrative Associates and Instructional Associates; i) the University Registrar or designate.
One regular meeting of the General Faculty Council is held each year in late August or early September, although special meetings of the may be called at the discretion of the Chair or at the request in writing of ten members of the Council. The General Faculty Council can establish its own procedures including the creation of such committees as are necessary to fulfill its functions.
Scope and Content
Sub-series consists of one file of General Faculty Council minutes and meeting materials, including committee reports.
Notes
History/Bio information was taken from the Brandon Univeristy Senate by-laws.
DIRECTORS OF DEVELOPMENT/INSTITUTIONAL ADVANCEMENT:
D.R. MACKAY (1973-1984)
See RG 6 4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration & Finance) for biographical information on D.R. MacKay.
GORDON MCDIARMID (1986 - 1991)
Gordon McDiarmid attended the University of Winnipeg and George Williams College (Chicago). His B.A. included a double major in Social Science and Group Work. His Masters degree was in Counseling Psychology with added course work and aplied research in Organization Dynamics. McDiarmid's psychiatric research and interships were undertaken at Michael Rease and Mount Sinai Hospitals in Chicago.
Prior to taking the posistion of Director of Private Funding at Brandon University, McDiarmid was President and CEO of U-Rent It Ltd. and Wallace & Wallace Fences Ltd. in Winnipeg (1973-1985) and Campaign Director fo the United Way of Calgary (1985-1986).
During his time at Brandon University McDiarmid: established a new University Foundation; organized annual and special gifts campaigns, endowments and the planned gift program; upgraded publications, initiated print standards policy, introduced desktop publishing and managed the media relations program for Communications; and as acting Director of Alumni and External Relations for two and a half years he revitalized the Board, expanded membership, initiated the affinity card program, the alumni directory, the IDC phone/mail program and expanded the national reunion program.
McDiarmid left Brandon University in 1991, to assume the post of Vice-President, Development, at the Banff Centre. He held this position until 1994, when he became the owner of Assiniboine Consulting Group Ltd. (Calgary) and the Vice President Western Canada of Navion Financial Management Ltd. (Vancouver). From 1998-2000, McDiarmid was the Director of Development - Special Projects for Lions Club of Winnipeg Housing Centres. From 2000-2003, he was the Interim Executive Director and an independant consultant for the Art Gallery of Southwestern Manitoba. McDiarmid also owned a private consulting practice from 1995-2006.
As of June 2010, Gordon McDiarmid lives in Winnipeg, MB.
L. JOHNSON (July 15, 1991 - 1994)
Lorraine Johnson was appointed Executive Director, Development and External Relations, effective July 15, 1991. From 1985-1989, she served as Director of University Relations for Mount Saint Vincent University in Halifax. Prior to her appointment at Brandon University she was a partner with a management and fund raising consulting firm in Nelson, BC.
S. DECTER HIRST (1994 - 1997/1998)
No biographical information yet.
BRUCE SHAVERS (1998 - 1999)
No biographical information yet.
B. PROVEN (August 1998 - March 2003)
Beth M. Proven attended high school in Carberry, MB in the late 1980s. In 1991, she graduated from the University of Manitoba with a B.A. She continued her education through an international agricultural exchange program in Kianga, Queensland (1992), an Arts Administration Certificate from Grant MacEwan Community College (1995), Certified Fundraising Executive Accreditation (CFRE) (2004) and a four-year Certificate in Management and Administration (CIM) from the University of Manitoba (2006).
Proven began her marketing and fundraising career in the arts, working for Wanuskewin Heritage Park, the Saskatoon International Fringe festival, the Edmonton Symphony Orchestra and Shakespeare by the Sea. She moved into university fundraising in 1997 as Development Officer for Dalhousie University's Captial Ideas Campaign.
In August 1998, Proven came to Brandon University where she served as the Director of Development and Alumni Relations. In addition, she also managed the activites of the Brandon University Foundation and participated in the Presidents Advisory Committee. She left Brandon University in March 2003. Since that time she has been employed as the Director of Development for St. Paul's College at the University of Manitoba (2003-2004) and as Manager Planned Giving at the University of Manitoba (2004 - present).
Currently (February 2007), Beth Proven lives in Winnipeg, MB.
K. WHELPTON - acting (2003-2004)
Kate Whelpton was born on January 9, 1973 in Windsor, ON. She received her Honours B.A. in Geography and Political Studies from the University of Guelph in 1996, her B.Ed. from the University of Toronto in 1997 and her M.Ed. from Brandon University in 2005.
After teaching in Ontario, New Brunswick and Nova Scotia for a few years, Whelpton returned to working in poast-secondary education as the Sexual Harassment Advisor for Mount Allison and Brandon Universities. Since 2000, Whelpton has assumed the position as the Director of the Office of the President, overseeing the administration of the PResiden'ts Office, including planning and implementing all aspects of the meetings of the Board of Governors, budgets, staff meetings, events, strategic initiatives, and general administrative oversight of the organization. In 2003-2004, she was appointed Acting Executive Director of Institutional Advancement.
MARC DESROSIERS (2003 - July 2007)
No biographical information yet.
CINDY YACYSHEN - acting (July 2007 - October 2009)
Cynthia Hope Yacyshen was born on May 13, 1968 in Brandon, MB. She obtained her Bachelor of Arts (Advanced - Major: Applied Economics, Minor: Business Administration) from the University of Maniotba in 1992. In 2004, she received her "National Certificate in Fundraising Management" from Ryerson University.
Prior to coming to Brandon University in 1997, Yacyshen was Marketing Coordinator for Manitoba Theatre Centre in Winnipeg, MB. At Brandon University she was Campaign Officer for the Brandon College Legacy Campaign and then Senior Development Officer. In July 2007, Yacyshen was named Acting Director of Institutional Advancement. Yacyshen left her position at Brandon University in October 2009.
Notes
A partial file level inventory for this sub-series exists as a Word document. History/Bio information for Beth Proven was taken from the resume and biography she gave to the Archives (February 2007). Kate Whelpton appears in the Brandon University records as Kate Ramsey, Kate Whelpton and Kate Gross. Kate Whelpton provided her own biographical information (August 2007). Cindy Yacyshen provided her own biographical information (September 2007). Gordon McDiarmid provided his own biographical information (May 2010). History/Bio information for Lorraine Johnson taken from the Fall 1991 issue of Alumni News.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 10: Office of Development
See fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
Sub-series MPE B.11 consists of (1) general reports; (2) government related papers; (3) Canadian Wheat Board papers; (4) Manitoba Federation of Agriculture and Co-operatives papers; (5) Co-operative Life Insurance
A copy of a Local Associations (later the Local Pool Committees) would be sent to the Central Office, where it was stored until a microfilm copy could be made. Records were only transferred to microfilm until 1957.
Custodial History
Local Association records recieved by the Central Office dating from 1925 to 1957 are on microfilm. Records subsequent to 1957 are hardcopies.
Scope and Content
Sub-series MPE B.3 consists of Local Association records from the formation of the association until 1993 or said association's closure. See Box level entries for B.3 for detailed contents of records.
Notes
Description by Jillian Sutherland (2009). Records contained in Series B.3 on microfilm or in hardcopy may also be contained in Series A.
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
79a. Cromer 1978-1980
79b. Cromer 1977-1978
80a. Dauphin 1977-1978
80b. Dunrea 1977-1980
81a. Gladstone March 1 1979 – Nov 24 1980
81b. Gladstone Feb 2 1977 – Jan 17 1979
82. Edwin Jan 10 1977 – March 3 1981
83a. Isabella Feb 4 1977 – August 28 1980
83b. Lauder April 20 1979 – Nov 13 1980
84. Lyleton Dec 13 1977 – Nov 24 1978
85a. Jordan April 2 1979 – Dec 11 1980
85b. Jordan Jan 31 1977 – Feb 26 1979
86. Moore Park Jan 4 1977 – April 11 1979
87a. Napinka Jan 17 1977 – Nov 14 1980
87b. Nesbitt Feb 8 1979 – Nov 27 1980
87c. Nesbitt Jan 6 1977 – Dec 18 1978
87d. Ninga Feb 16 1977 – July 28 1980
88a. Pierson Dec 20 1978 – Nov 26 1980
88b. Pierson Jan 20 1977 – Dec 20 1978
89a. Souris Jan 10 1975 – Nov 30 1976
89b. Sperling May 8 1978 – Dec 10 1980
89c. Sperling March 21 1977 – Jan 31 1979
90. Tilston June 9 1977 – Nov 16 1978
91. Waskada Jan 10 1977 – Dec 12 1980
92. Bradwardine Feb 11 1981 – Nov 16 1981
93. Cromer Jan 13 1981 – Nov 27 1981
94a. Dunrea Sept 23 1985 – Nov 27 1989
94b. Dunrea March 24 1981 – Feb 14 1985
95a. Beresford July 31 1986 – Nov 14 1986
95b. Beresford Jan 13 1981 – April 3 1986
96a. Gladstone Nov 19 1986 – Nov 28 1989
96b. Gladstone Nov 3 1983 – Oct 11 1986
96c. Gladstone Jan 23 1981 – Jan 4 1984
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
97. Isabella Jan 28 1981 – July 21 1981
98a. Jordan Oct 23 1984 – Oct 6 1989
98b. Jordan Nov 8 1982 – Oct 3 1984
98c. Jordan Jan 15 1981 – Sept 27 1982
99. Lauder April 21 1981 – March 28 1983
100. Napinka Jan 12 1981 – Oct 28 1985
101. Nesbitt Jan 5 1981 – Nov 24 1982
102a. Pierson Sept 21 1987 – Dec 20 1989
102b. Pierson Sept 21 1983 – April 16 1987
102c. Pierson Jan 9 1981 – June 23 1983
103a. Sperling Jan 8 1987 – Nov 20 1989
103b. Sperling Dec 8 1983 – Jan 8 1987
103c. Sperling Feb 4 1981 – Dec 8 1983
104a. Waskada Sept 12 1984 – Nov 29 1989
104b. Waskada Jan 5 1981 – July 24 1984
105. Dominion City Oct 28 1987 – July 30 1990
106. Fannystelle March 5 1987 – Feb 19 1990
107. Minto Feb 17 1987 – Feb 27 1989
108. Poplar Point Jan 22 1987 – Jan 9 1991
109. Rathwell Feb 5 1987 – March 6 1990
110. Riverton August 5 1983 – Oct 29 1990
111. Silverton Nov 10 1987 – Jan 1990
112a. Brunkild Feb 5 1992 – Nov 29 1993
112b. Brunkild Jan 8 1990 – Jan 8 1992
113a. Brunkild Oct 6 1986 – Dec 11 1989
113b. Brunkild May 18 1984 – Sept 2 1986
113c. Brunkild Jan 5 1981 – Feb 6 1984
114a. Brunkild Dec 4 1978 – Dec 8 1980
114b. Brunkild Jan 4 1977 – Nov 29 1978
114c. Brunkild Jan 6 1975 – Dec 5 1976
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
115a. Brunkild Nov 28 1972 – Dec 2 1974
115b. Brunkild Oct 29 1970 – Nov 8 1972
115c. Brunkild Nov 14 1968 – Nov 9 1970
116a. Beresford Feb 19 1992 – May 13 1998
116b. Beresford August 17 1992 – Dec 14 1991
117. Dunrea Jan 12 1990 – May 31 1993
118a. Jordan Feb 11 1994 – May 27 1996
118b. Jordan Nov 21 1989 – Nov 25 1993
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
119a. Sperling April 24 1995 – July 17 1997
119b. Sperling April 13 1994 – March 31 1995
119c. Sperling Jan 16 1992 – March 21 1994
119d. Sperling Jan 15 1990 – Dec 17 1991
120. Gladstone April 5 1990 – May 31 1993
121. Waskada March 12 1990 – May 26 1993
122. Pierson Feb 15 1990 – March 23 1993
123. Durban Oct 29 1993 – Nov 19 1995
124. Erikson Oct 29 1993 – Dec 15 1994
125. McAuley Nov 18 1993 – Nov 2 1995
126. Morris Dec 1 1993 – Nov 14 1995