This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
1a. Sub-district #101 Oct 22 1997 – June 15 1999
1b. Sub-district #101 August 5 1993 – August 12 1997
2. Sub-district #102 August 3 1993 – Dec 9 1997
3a. Sub-district #103 Jan 27 1997 – April 14 1999
3b. Sub-district #103 August 4 1993 – Nov 25 1996
4. Sub-district #104 August 4 1993 – April 20 1999
5a. Sub-district #105 Oct 30 1996 – June 29 1999
5b. Sub-district #105 Oct 28 1993 – July 2 1996
6a. Sub-district #201 Nov 4 1996 – July 30 1999
6b. Sub-district #201 Sept 29 1993 – Oct 2 1996
7a. Sub-district #202 Oct 21 1996 – July 8 1999
7b. Sub-district #202 Nov 3 1993 – August 1 1996
8a. Sub-district #203 July 25 1996 – June 28 1999
8b. Sub-district #203 May 31 1993 – April 3 1996
9a. Sub-district #204 Nov 20 1996 – June 24 1999
9b. Sub-district #204 Oct 14 1993 – Oct 31 1996
10a. Sub-district #205 April 1 1996 – July 30 1999
10b. Sub-district #205 August 4 1993 – Nov 27 1995
11a. Sub-district #301 July 5 1996 – August 9 1999
11b. Sub-district #301 July 26 1993 – March 11 1996
12a. Sub-district #302 Jan 9 1996 – June 28 1999
12b. Sub-district #302 Oct 12 1993 – Oct 25 1995
13a. Sub-district #303 Jan 3 1996 – June 29 1998
13b. Sub-district #303 Oct 13 1993 – Oct 24 1995
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE sub-district councils. The records include the following:
14a. Sub-district #304 Oct 8 1996 – June 23 1993
14b. Sub-district #304 August 3 1993 – August 6 1996
15a. Sub-district #305 Oct 2 1996 – April 7 1999
15b. Sub-district #305 August 4 1993 – August 7 1996
16a. Sub-district #401 April 11 1996 – August 10 1999
16b. Sub-district #401 August 10 1993 – Feb 7 1996
17a. Sub-district #402 March 21 1997 – August 16 1999
17b. Sub-district #402 August 4 1993 – Jan 27 1997
18. Sub-district #403 August 3 1993 – August 17 1999
19. Sub-district #404 Nov 2 1993 – April 16 1999
20a. Sub-district #405 Feb 9 1996 – July 12 1999
20b. Sub-district #405 August 5 1993 – Dec 7 1995
21. Sub-district #501 Nov 4 1993 – April 8 1999
22a. Sub-district #502 Nov 16 1995 – Oct 27 1998
22b. Sub-district #502 August 3 1993 – Oct 3 1995
23a. Sub-district #503 April 8 1996 – June 28 1999
23b. Sub-district #503 Nov 24 1992 – Feb 12 1996
24a. Sub-district #504 March 13 1996 – August 18 1999
24b. Sub-district #504 August 11 1993 – Jan 4 1996
25a. Sub-district #505 July 31 1996 – June 29 1999
25b. Sub-district #505 Oct 27 1993 – April 11 1996
26a. Sub-district #601 Oct 28 1996 – July 7 1999
26b. Sub-district #601 August 10 1993 – July 18 1996
27a. Sub-district #602 Oct 24 1996 – Feb 15 1999
27b. Sub-district #602 August 31 1993 – April 3 1996
28. Sub-district #603 August 10 1993 – April 15 1999
This box contains minutes from meeting of MPE district advisory committees. The records include the following:
55. District Advisory Committee 1102 2000-2001
56. District Advisory Committee 1103 2000-2001
57. District Advisory Committee 1104 2000-2001
58. District Advisory Committee 1005 1999-2001
59. District Advisory Committee 1006 2000-2001
60. District Advisory Committee 1007 1999-2001
61. District Advisory Committee 1008 1999-2001
62. District Advisory Committee 1001 1999-2001
63. District Advisory Committee 1002 2000-2001
64. District Advisory Committee 1003 Apr., July 2000
65. District Advisory Committee 1004 1999-2000
66. District Advisory Committee 906 2000-2001
67. District Advisory Committee 907 2000-2001
68. District Advisory Committee 908 2000-2001
69. District Advisory Committee 901 2000-2001
70. District Advisory Committee 902 2000-2001
71. District Advisory Committee 903 April 12 2000
72. District Advisory Committee 904 2000-2001
73. District Advisory Committee 805 1999-2000
74. District Advisory Committee 806 July 7 2000
75. District Advisory Committee 807 July 7 2000
76. District Advisory Committee 801 2000-2001
77. District Advisory Committee 802 2000-2001
78. District Advisory Committee 803 Nov 14 1999
79. District Advisory Committee 804 2000-2001
80. District Advisory Committee 705 March 15 2000
81. District Advisory Committee 708 March 14 2000
82. District Advisory Committee 707 March 15 2000
83. District Advisory Committee 606 (Miscellaneous)
The Office of the Bursar was created in 1910. As head of financial affairs, a Bursar was more compatible to the administrative framework of other universities in Canada. The initial duties of the Bursar were the collection of all fees, control of funds and disbursements, donations, purchasing, supervision of grounds, and progressive measures in the investment of funds and the enlargement of finances. By 1913, the Bursar was also in charge of the book department, boarding, grounds and gardens, buildings and heating plant.
By 1924, the Bursar had become so involved in the management of College affairs that the Board established a committee to examine the functions of the President and the Bursar “with a view to readjustment for efficiency.” The committee presented its report later that year, clearly defining nine functions of the Bursar. These functions were the keeping of books, banking, general handling of student fees and accounts, general handling of all trade accounts, handling of maintenance and extension movement pledge cards and receipts, general responsibility for the purchase of all supplies, supervision of fireman and janitor, supervision of buildings and grounds and the submission of a monthly report to the Secretary of the Executive. In 1929, the Bursar took on the role of Secretary to the Executive.
At several times during the history of Brandon College the Bursar and the Registrar were combined into one job.
BRANDON COLLEGE BURSARS:
R.J. KENNEDY (1910 - 1911)
No biographical information yet.
S.J. MCKEE (1911-1913, 1914-1915, 1919-1920)
Information about S.J. McKee can be found under the heading MG 1 Brandon College Teaching and Learning.
C.W. JACKSON (1913 - 1914)
No biographical information yet.
JOHN HARRIS MCKEE (1915 - 1918)
J.H. McKee was S.J. McKee’s son. He was born in Ingersoll, Ontario. He moved to Rapid City in 1881 with his family. In 1890 he moved to Brandon where his father opened McKee’s Academy. Harris attended Brandon College, graduating in 1914. When the war broke out he was not medically able to participate. He then took a position as Brandon College Bursar. In 1918, Harris resigned from his job to take up farming. He had several bouts of bad luck: drought, grasshoppers, frost, and other farming catastrophes, and was not too successful, having a list of 50 creditors at one point.
GEORGE H. ROSS (1918 - 1919)
Little is known so far about George Ross. He was a teacher before coming to Brandon College. He taught in Chatham, Ontario for a while, as well as at the Rider Moore College of Business in Trenton, NJ. From 1914-1919 Ross was also the Director of the Business Department at Brandon College.
S. EVERTON (1920 - 1923)
No biographical information yet.
E. SCOTT EATON (1923 - 1931)
E. Scott Eaton was born in Auburn. He graduated from Acadia University in 1903 and the Maritime Business College in 1904. Eaton then taught at the Maritime Business College and the Charlottetown Business College. For a time he was head of the Business Department at Alberta College. Eaton was the owner/manager of the Success Business College in Vancouver before coming to Brandon College. He occupied this position from 1923 until 1931. In 1931 he became purchasing agent and the superintendent of buildings and grounds at Acadia University. He became an accountant at H.T. Warne Ltd. in Digby, NS in 1940. Around 1953, Eaton became the Town Clerk of Digby. Eaton died at the age of 80 around 1962.
M.S. DONOVAN (1931 - 1936, 1939 - 1948)
No biographical information yet.
N. KEITH MCKINNON (1936 - 1939)
Keith McKinnon was born in Weyburn, Saskatchewan. After working in Weyburn he attended Brandon College, specializing in Political Economy. He was very active in all aspects of students affairs and was elected Senior Stick in his final year. He was appointed to the position of Registrar following his graduation from Brandon College.
D.R. MACKAY (1948 - Brandon University)
Information about D.R. MacKay can be found under the Office of the Registrar.
Scope and Content
The Bursar series revolves around the finances of the school. There are invoices from general accounts, letters from businesses, and receipts for payments. There are also numerous student accounts, wage lists and letters regarding teachers’ salaries. The Bursar did a lot of the correspondence regarding mortgages, estates, property, and other legal matters. The series is mainly correspondence to and from the Bursar regarding accounts, overdue accounts, pleas for financial support and numerous other matters. As well, there are financial statements, fundraising lists, and subscription lists. The series is not broken down by Bursar, but instead is grouped together chronologically.
Storage Location
RG 1 Brandon College fonds
Series 3: Office of the Bursar
Arrangement
Series has been divided into seven sub-series, including: (1) R.J. Kennedy; (2) S.J. McKee; (3) C.W. Jackson; (4) John Harris McKee; (5) George H. Ross; (6) S. Everton; and (7) E. Scott Eaton.
As stipulated in "The Brandon University Act (1998)," the president is the chief executive officer and the Vice-Chancellor of the university and has general supervision over and direction of the operation of the university, including the academic work of the university; supervises the teaching staff, officers, employees and students of the university; may consider and make recommendations to the board or the senate about any matter that affects the university; is an ex officio member of every committee of the board and the senate; and has any other powers and duties assigned by the board.
The President reports to the Board of Governors, while receiving direct reports from the: Vice-President (Academic and Research), the Vice-President (Administration and Finance), the Director of Development and Alumni Relations, the Director of University Relations and the Director of International Activities. The president also interacts with the Board of Governors, the Senate, students, faculty members, staff members, unions, alumni, businesses, the Brandon University Foundation, the Brandon community, rural, northern and Aboriginal Communities, donors, government officials (municipal, provincial & federal), the K – 12 school system, and institutions of higher education, in Manitoba, Canada and internationally.
Scope and Content
Series has been divided into two sub-series, including: (1) President's files; and (2) President's reports.
Notes
Administrative information in the History/Bio field was taken from "The Brandon University Act (1998)" at http://web2.gov.mb.ca/laws/statutes/1998/c04898e.php (December 2005) and http://www.brandonu.ca/admin/Policies/Administrative/position%20job%20desc%20President.pdf (December 2005).
The Brandon Assisted Passages Association was created in 1911, for the purpose of providing loans to "english speaking artisans" [sic] who wished to immigrate to Canada and work in Brandon, MB. In 1913, the Association was renamed the Brandon Imperial Home Reunion Association. The Association continued to operate and provided passage assistance in the form of loans to many immigrants until loan defaults mounted during World War I. After 1917, no further loans were given.
Custodial History
This fonds was accessioned in 1997. Its custodial history prior to this is unknown, but it was at one time in the posession of a H.R. Hoffman, and well as Richardson & Bishop Ltd. in Brandon.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a minute book and a single page letter. The minute book is a record of every meeting of the B.A.P.A./B.I.H.R.A. and includes the names of the board members, the names of the applicants (in some cases their addresses), and the amounts loaned. In some instances, the fonds provides a documentary record of loan repayment.
This box contains general circulars sent out by the MPE central office to the local ssociations. The records include the following:
12a. General Circulars 1938
12b. General Circulars 1938
13. General Circulars 1939
14a. General Circulars 1940
14b. General Circulars 1940
15a. General Circulars 1941
15b. General Circulars 1941
16. General Circulars 1942
17a. General Circulars 1943
17b. General Circulars 1943
The Lovstrom locale first came to the attention of Dr. Nicholson through conversations with landowners Mr. and Mrs. Herb Lovstrom in 1985. Lovstrom is a multi-component archaeological locale located 25km south of Brandon overlooking the Souris River channel. The landowner’s surface collection and the presence of bone and artifacts in a cultivated field indicated the presence of one or more sites.
Limited testing was conducted in 1985 and 1986, followed by major excavations in 1987, 1988 and 1991. Eight sites of block excavations with a total of 132 1m2 excavation units were completed. The locale area extends approximately 500m north from the edge of the Souris Valley escarpment and over 200m east from the Jock’s Creek escarpment.
Physical and biological environment As has been noted above, the locale is bounded on the south by the Souris channel and on the west by the incised channel of Jock’s Creek and a till plain extends to the north and the east. This plain is characterized by buff colored glacial till with numerous rocks embedded in the surface. Surrounding these rocky knolls are dark-soil hollows where the various cultural occupations are found. The depth of the topsoil layer suggests a long term grassland cover with the present oak forest likely developing in historic times due to the elimination of bison grazing and the controlling of prairie fires in late historic times. A small cleared patch of farmland is found within the boundaries of the locale area. This area has provided a substantial surface collection of artifacts.
Present vegetation in the area is a mosaic of aspen/oak forest groves and mesic grass prairie that includes introduced species such as brome grass. In poorly drained areas, willow and red osier dogwood are present. The Lovstrom locale is found in a forested area dominated by oak with an under story of saskatoon, chokecherry, pin cherry, and hazelnut brush. Poison ivy is abundant as well as sarsaparilla.
The major faunal resources in Precontact times would have been bison, with elk and mule deer playing a minor role. Antelope may have been present also. Small animals included snowshoe hare, cottontails, porcupines and beaver. Canids, including wolf, coyote, fox and domesticated dog were present, as well as mustelids such as badger, mink, and weasel. Fragments from a fisher were also recovered in the excavations.
Summation.
The Lovstrom locale has eight sites. The sites were designated and excavated as Blocks A, B, C, D, E, F, G and H. Many of the sites are multi-occupations.
The Vickers materials are primarily confined to Blocks D, E, F, G and H. Vickers Focus materials overlie Blackduck/Duck Bay materials. Blackduck and Duck Bay materials are found in the lower levels of all excavation blocks and in most test units. The Vickers occupations at the Lovstrom locale, based upon ceramic wares and an overlapping of C14 dates, appear to have been contemporary with the Lowton type site to the east, near Belmont. A small protohistoric occupation was identified overlying part of Block D. Faunal remains are abundant with bison clearly dominating the assemblages. Lesser amounts of canid are present as well as small mammals including beaver, hare and mustelids. Small amounts of avian species are also present.
Publications
Nicholson, B.A.
2011 The Role of Pocket Gophers (Thomomys talpoides) in Restructuring Stratigraphic Relationships at the Lovstrom Site. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 35:323-331.
Nicholson, Bev, Scott Hamilton, Matthew Boyd and Sylvia Nicholson
2008 A Late Plains Woodland Adaptive Strategy in the Northern Parklands: the Vickers Focus Forager-Horticulturists. Invited Paper for Papers in Northeastern Plains Prehistory, eds. Michael G. Michlovic and Dennis L. Toom, North Dakota Journal of Archaeology Vol. 8:19-34.
Nicholson, Bev and Scott Hamilton
2001 Cultural Continuity and Changing Subsistence Strategies During the Late Precontact Period in Southwestern Manitoba. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 25:53-73.
Nicholson, Bev
1996 Plains Woodland Influx and the Blackduck Exodus in South-Western Manitoba During the Late Precontact Period. Manitoba Archaeological Journal 6(1):69-85.
Nicholson, Bev and Mary Malainey
1991 Report on the 1991 Field School Excavations at the Lovstrom Site (DjLx-1), Southwestern Manitoba. Manitoba Archaeological Journal 1(2): 51-93.
Nicholson, Bev and Jane Gibson
1990-91 Lovstrom Site Field Report, 1987 Excavations. Saskatchewan Archaeology 11&12:46-68.
Nicholson, Bev and Ian Kuiijt
1990 Field Report and Interpretations of the 1988 Archaeological Excavations at the Lovstrom Site (DjLx-1) in Southwestern Manitoba. North Dakota Journal of Archaeology 4:166-205.
Nicholson, Bev
1990 Ceramic Affiliations and the Case for Incipient Horticulture in Southwestern Manitoba. Canadian Journal of Archaeology 14:33-60.
Nicholson, Bev
1986 The Lovstrom Site: Culture Contact in Prehistory. Manitoba Archaeological Quarterly 10(1):35-71.
Scope and Content
The Series has been divided into nine sub-series, including (1) Survey (2) Block A; (3) Block B (4) Block C; (5) Block D; (6) Block E; (7) Block F; (8) Block G; (9) Block H
Radiocarbon date reports have been scanned in multi-page PDF files.
History / Biographical
North Lauder Radiocarbon Date report by IsoTrace Laboratory for Atkinson site #TO-13365.
Radiocarbon dating
The technique of radiocarbon dating was developed by Willard Libby and his colleagues at the University of Chicago in 1949.
Radiocarbon dating is used to estimate the age of organic remains from archaeological sites. Organic matter has a radioactive form of carbon (C14) that begins to decay upon death. C14 decays at a steady, known rate of a half life of 5,730 years. The technique is useful for material up to 50,000 years. Fluctuations of C14 in the atmosphere can affect results so dates are calibrated against dendrochronology. Radiocarbon dates are calibrated to calendar years.
Dates are reported in radiocarbon years or Before Present. Before Present refers to dates before 1950. The introduction of massive amounts of C14, due to atomic bomb and surface testing of atomic weapons, has widely increased the standard deviation on all dates after A.D. 1700 causing these dates to be unreliable.
Accelerated mass spectrometry can more accurately measure C14 with smaller samples and can date materials to 80,000 years.
Scope and Content
Sub sub series contains radiocarbon dates from: Atkinson site and Flintstone Hill.