File consists of memos, news releases, a Department of Extension and Adult Education report, a draft of copy for an ad in the Brandon Sun Centennial number and the catalogue, as well as notices for the Gems of Textile Handicraft exhibit from the German Federal Republic (on display in Brandon in 1970).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 4: Office of the Vice-President
4.2 Office of the Vice-President (Administration & Finance)
Box 7
File consists of the Physical Education Club constitution, information regarding applications for BUSU grants, agendas and minutes of the first meeting.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 14: Brandon University Students Union
14.4 BUSU clubs
Box 1
Some of the photographs have discolored lines through them.
History / Biographical
Donkersloot began working at Brandon University in 1971 as the Clerk of Works. From 1973 until his retirement, he was the Director of Physical Plant.
Custodial History
Photographs were taken by Tom Donkersloot during construction and stored in albums in the Physical Plant H-Hut until they were transfered to the McKee Archives by Doug Duncalf in May 2008.
Scope and Content
Seventy seven photographs of the construction of the Education Building.
Notes
Donkersloot recorded the date and time each photograph was taken on the back of the photos.
Sub sub series consists of items published by the Faculty of Education or written by members of the Faculty of Education, including: Faculty of Education Student’s Directory: October 15, 1976, November 27, 1979; Wednesday Newsletter: September 20, 1967 – November 29, 1967, December 6, 1967 – March 27, 1968, April 3, 1968 – November 20, 1968, November 27, 1969 – April 2, 1969; Teacher-Training Programme General Information Academic Season 1959-1960; Teacher-Training Programme General Information Academic Season 1960-1961; BUNTEP Newsletter – volume 1, no. 2 and volume 1, no. 3; and a pamphlet on the Bachelor of Physical Education Studies (three year degree).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
7.3 Faculty of Education
Cooperative democracy through voluntary association of the people as consumers : a discussion of the cooperative movement, its philosophy, methods, accomplishments, and possibilities, and its relation to the state, to science, art, and commerce, and to other systems of economic organization
Photo was donated to the McKee Archives by Thelma Fisher in May 2015.
Scope and Content
Composite portrait of the Brandon Normal School class of 1940.
Top Row (L to R): H. Hannah; W. Coulthard; E. Holditch; H. tennant; F. Williams; J. Pettifpher; H. Peterson; A. Embury; I. Campbell; J. Hainsworth; I. Vig; M. Townson
Second Row (L to R): L. Thornton; W. Lochhead; M. Ardron; D. Archibald; Miss M.A. Yeomans, Physical Culture; Mr. C. Moore, Principal; K. Watson; J.S. Caldwell; S. Bradley; J. Christie
Third Row (L to R): M. Witt; H. Mikkelsen; O. Scott; M. Scharff; D. Duncan; Miss B.A. Pilling, Primary Art; I. Duchesneau; E. Hawson; M. Simpson; D. Strath; B. Wiggins
Fourth Row (L to R): E. Henderson; C. Smithson; M. Nelin; J. Campbell; M. Young; V. Brown; G. Wenman; I. Turcotte
Fifth Row (L to R): E. Sommerville; M. Reid; I. Henderson; M. Lychacz; E. Duncan; M. Taylor; J. McPhail; D. Irwin; T.V. Cole; J. Regner; M. Skuce; P. Osman
Bottom Row (L to R): G. Pue; A. Berkhold; D. Pue; B. McLean; E. Nash; J. McFarland; J. Bonner; D. Cousins; E. Pratt; N. Boake; K. Middleton; I. Goldie
Fair. Matting has various pieces missing, tears and stains. Large stain encroaches on the top of the image. Other small stains around the edges for the most part.
Custodial History
Photo was donated to the McKee Archives by Audrey and Duncan Wadell in 2011.
Scope and Content
Composite portrait of the Brandon Normal School class of 1903.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph was donated to the Archives in February 2007 by Robert McDonald, who is the nephew of Catherine McDonald, who is pictured in the photograph. Robert McDonald inherited the photograph from his aunt after her death.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the 1908-1909 class at the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
The elements of pedagogy : a manual for teachers, normal schools, normal institutes, teachers' reading circles, and all persons interested in school education
Thomas Hector MacDonald McLeod (Tommy) was born in Weyburn, Saskatchewan in August 1918. During his youth in Weyburn, McLeod was a member of Tommy Douglas' Baptist congretation; it was Douglas who encouraged McLeod to attend Brandon College. McLeod attended Brandon College from 1937 to 1940. While there, he received scholarships in Bible, Economics, and General Efficiency, as well as receiving the Medal in Sociology during his final year. Following graduation in 1940, McLeod studied economics at the University of Indiana, receiving his M.A. in 1941. Later that year he returned to Brandon College to teach economics and sociology. From 1941 until 1944, he also acted as the Resident Master. He remained at Brandon College for three years. McLeod married Beryl (Pentland) Thompson c. 1943 and together they had five children: Beth, Ellen, Ian, Brian and Morna.
Following the election of Tommy Douglas as Premier of Saskatchewan, McLeod was employed in a variety of senior positions in the Saskatchewan civil service. In 1952, McLeod was named the Dean of Commerce at the University of Saskatchewan, Regina Campus.
In 1961, he served as the Chief Consultant (Ford Foundation) to the Turkish Government. In 1962, McLeod was the supervisor of an eight man team advising the Iranian government on Economic Planning Activities. He has also served as a Special Advisor in Public Administration and Higher Education for the Canadian Development Agency.
In 1963, he became the chairman of the Saskatchewan Royal Commission on Taxation. McLeod accepted the position of Dean of the College of Arts and Science, Regina Campus at the University of Saskatchewan on May 15, 1964. In May 1965, he became Vice-Principal of the University of Saskatchewan, Regina Campus.
McLeod had a Ph.D. in Government and Economics from Harvard. As well, he was a past recipient of the Vanier Medal (1971) for outstanding contribution to public administration in Canada. In 1987, McLeod wrote a book entitled "Tommy Douglas: the Road to Jerusalem." Also in 1987, McLeod was awarded an honorary degree from Brandon University. In 2003, McLeod was awarded the Order of Canada.
Thomas Hector MacDonald McLeod died on January 1, 2008 in Victoria, BC.
Custodial History
McLeod donated a copy of the paper, subsequently published in Manitoba History, to the McKee Archives c. 1995.
Scope and Content
Thomas McLeod’s records consist of a paper written in 1995, entitled "S.J. McKee of Brandon College: A Biographical Note on a Man and an Institution." This paper is a brief history of Brandon College and S.J. McKee’s role in the formation of it. Beginning with the foundation of the short-lived Canada Baptist College, as well as the foundation of the Canadian Literary Institute, McLeod traces the history of Baptists and higher education. The paper is a fairly good guide to researchers wanting to know a bit of the background behind Brandon College. The bibliography in the back also gives researchers several ideas on where to look for additional information.
Notes
Obituary is in the January 5, 2008 Globe and Mail. H. Clare Pentland and Tommy McLeod studied economics together at Brandon College under W.T. Easterbrook, who later taught at the University of Toronto.
MG 1 Brandon College Teaching and Administration
1.6 Thomas Hector McLeod
Related Material
W. T. Easterbrook, “Clare Pentland-Brandon College, 1937-1940,” Canadian Journal of Political and Social Theory, vol. 3, no. 2 (Spring-Summer 1979), p. 101.