Stuart Duncan Schultz was born on December 24, 1892 in Belmont, MB to Frank Albert Schultz and Margaret Maria MacPhail. He graduated from the Manitoba Medical College and then continued his studies with four years at the London Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons. Schultz served with the 226th Overseas Battalion of the Canadian Expeditionary Force (CEF) during World War I.
Schultz returned from England in 1925, at which point he joined the medical staff of the Brandon Hospital for Mental Diseases (later the BMHC). In 1942, he became Superintendent, and in 1959, he retired. During his time in Brandon, Schultz served fourteen years on city council and was Mayor from 1956-1957. He was also the director of the Brandon Schubert Choir for twenty-five years. Following his retirement Schultz moved to Winnipeg where he was the consulting psychiatrist for Stony Mountain Penitentiary.
Schultz married Jemima Meiklejohn Gibson on August 30, 1920, in Winnipeg, MB. They had one daughter: Sheilea Schultz Taylor.
Stuart Shultz died in Winnipeg, MB on August 10, 1974.
Scope and Content
Item is a portrait of Dr. Stuart Schultz, mayor of the City of Brandon from 1956-1957.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the Manitoba Historical Society website (http://www.mhs.mb.ca/docs/people/schultz_sd.shtml)
Stephen Adolph Magnacca was born December 10, 1902 in Winnipeg, MB. He joined the Winnipeg Highland Cadets in 1914, and at the age of 15, he added two years to his age and joined the Winnipeg Light Infantry. He was commissioned as a Lieutenant on June 15, 1923. In 1933, he was promoted to the rank of Major. In 1956, he was made an honorary Lieutenant Colonel of the 26th Field Artillery Regiment; he was made a Colonel in 1967.
Magnacca married Grace Rosina Jones in 1927 and together they had two children: Patricia and Allan. Grace Jones was born in Cardiff, Wales on November 22, 1901. She came to Winnipeg as a child. For a few years before her marriage she worked as the circulation manager of The Nor'West Farmer. Members of St. Matthew's Church, Grace Magnacca was active in the Anglican Church Women of Canada (ACW). Following her husband's death she moved to Winnipeg. Grace Magnacca died in Winnipeg, MB on December 20, 2004.
The Maganacca family lived in Winnipeg until Magnacca's military career took him to Brandon in 1940; his family followed in 1942. The Magnacca's ran an Officer's Kit Shop and then in 1947, opened a real estate business named Magnacca Agencies.
Magnacca served two terms as Mayor of Brandon (1961-1969). He was also President of the Assiniboine Historical Society. For meritorious community service, Magnacca was given a Manitoba Golden Boy Award (1969) and a Queen Elizabeth II Silver Jubilee Medal.
Stephen Magnacca died on August 4, 1980 in Brandon, MB. He is commemmorated by Magnacca Crescent in Brandon and the Magnacca Research Centre at the Daly House Museum. He was elected a Life member of the Union of Manitoba Municipalities and in 1973, he was made a Member of the Order of Canada.
Scope and Content
Item is a photograph of Mayor Stephen Magnacca and his wife Grace Magnacca dressed in period costumes for Canada's Centennial in 1967.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the Manitoba Historical Society website (http://www.mhs.mb.ca/docs/people/magnacca_sa.shtml) and the December 31, 1969 Brandon Sun article Experience of being the wife of the mayor has brought satisfaction to Mrs. Magnacca.
Duncan Alexander MacGibbon, economist, was born in Lochaber Bay, Quebec, on 12 March 1882. He was educated at McMaster University and then went to Brandon College, Manitoba, to teach. He left Brandon to enrol at the University of Chicago where he received his Ph.D. in economics in 1915. He began to teach at McMaster University but his teaching career was halted by World War I. After the war he joined the University of Alberta as professor and head of the Department of Political Economy. He served as Commissioner for the Alberta Government on banking and credit with respect to the industry of agriculture in 1922. He was a member of the Royal Grain Inquiry Commission, Canada, 1923-1924. He left the University of Alberta in 1929 to become a member of the Canadian Board of Grain Commissioners, a post he held until his retirement in 1949. In 1930 he was attached to the Canadian delegation to Imperial Conference, London; in 1932 he served the same role at the imperial Economic Conference in Ottawa in 1932. After his retirement, he returned to McMaster University to teach part-time. Among his many writings, MacGibbon published two definitive books on the grain trade: The Canadian Grain Trade (1932) and The Canadian Grain Trade, 1931-1951 (1952). He died in Hamilton, Ont. on 10 October 1969.
Scope and Content
Item is Duncan Alexander MacGibbon's Bachelor of Arts degree (1908) from McMaster University.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the Duncan Alexander MacGibbon fonds (McMaster University Archives.)
Language Note
Diploma is in Latin, although liberties have been taken with the language, particularly in the case of names.
Storage Range
Oversized drawer 2
Related Material
Duncan Alexander MacGibbon fonds (McMaster University Archives)
The City of Brandon (by decree of the Province) went to a ward system of government with the civic elections of October of 1971. Ten aldermen, who had to reside in their wards, were elected by the people of their wards. The Mayor was elected by the city at large. The previous committee system was abolished and individual aldermen henceforth had no specific responsibilities.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
George F. MacDowell was born in 1913, in Prince Edward Island. He studied at Dalhousie University from 1930 to 1933, but did not complete a degree. During WWII, MacDowell served in Canada and Europe as a member of the Royal Canadian Signals Corps. After the war, he returned to Dalhousie University, graduating with a B.A. in 1947. Subsequently, he graduated with a Masters Degree in Economics from Clark University in Worcester, Massachusetts. George McDowell taught at both Mount Allison University and the University of Alberta before coming to Brandon in 1957 to teach at Brandon College. He remained as a professor in the Economic Department until his retirement in 1979.
MacDowell's work was published in the Canadian Journal of Economics and Political Science. In 1971, McClelland & Stewart published his account of the Brandon Packers strike of 1960 titled "The Brandon Packer's Strike: A Tragedy of Errors." In Brandon, MacDowell maintained a relationship with the local Association of Fire Fighters, aiding them with collective bargaining procedures. He also served as Chairman for the MacKenzie Seeds Board, and was a member of the Manitoba Development Corporation Board.
MacDowell never married and had no known children. He passed away on February 26th, 1986.
Custodial History
This collection was in the possesion of George MacDowell until his death. It was then held by the Brandon University Department of Economics until 1997, at which time it was transferred to the McKee Archives at Brandon University.
Scope and Content
The bulk of this fonds falls into five main categories:
1. Records dealing with the Brandon Packers Strike of 1960 and the subsequent legal actions against the owners, including all 2215 pages of the Brandon Packers Strike Commission;
2. Records dealing with the Commission of Inquiry into The Pas Forestry and Industrial Complex, including the complete transcript of the inquiry measuring approximately 5m. This Commission dealt with the conduct of Churchill Forest Industries, a company owned by a Swiss financial firm, which, in the 1960's, was given approximately 93 million dollars by the Roblin Provincial Government to develop The Pas Forestry and Industrial Complex. Churchill Forest Industries and its parent company subsequently came under suspicion of fraud and accused of fradulently transfering The Pas Forestry funds into other foreign business interests;
3. Records dealing with business loans awarded by the Manitoba Development Corporation during the 1970's and 1980's to businesses primarily within Manitoba;
4. Records dealing with McKenzie Seeds, and McKenzie Steele-Briggs Seeds during the early 1980's when George MacDowell was a board member of McKenzie Seeds;
5. Records dealing with Professor MacDowell's career as a Professor at Brandon University, including records relating to his courses and to administrative activities.
To a lesser extent, this collection includes records dealing with the University of Saskatchewan College of Commerce, the publication the "Manitoba New Democrat," issues associated with politics, labor and union in the prairie provinces from the 1960's to the 1980's, articles from various economic periodicals including "Economica" and "Public Finance," a variety of government reports from 1941 to 1981, and records dealing with George MacDowells' relationship with the Brandon Firefighters Association.
Notes
File level inventory available. Description written by Mike White (2002).
Photograph of the Brandon College Literary Society Executive 1911-1912.
Back Row (L to R): F. Freer ’15 (Editor of Critic); H.E. Green, Theo. (Pres.Deb.Soc.); W.Wilkin ’13 (Reading Room Com.); J. Robinson ’13 (2nd Vice Pres.); and H. Wilson (Treas.).
Front Row (L to R): M. Reid ’14 (Pres.C.H. Lit.); K. Johnson ’14 (1st Vice Pres.); J. Evans ’13 (Pres.); and W. Speers ’13 (Sec.).