For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Brandon House No. 2 Cairn
Notes
[Cairn reads: "Brandon House No. 2 established on this site 10 A.M. Oct. 7 1828 by Chief Trader Francis Heron of the H.B. Co.; Abandoned 1832; This cairn Dedicated Oct. 7 1928; Erected by The Brandon Rotary Club" (P.E. 23/07/09).]
Photograph shows the cairn and the plaque on it. There is a skull at the base of the cairn. Plaque reads: Brandon House No. 2 established on this site 10am Oct. 7, 1828 by Chief Trader Francis Heron of the H.B. Co. Abandoned 1832. This cairn dedicated Oct. 7, 1928 - erected by The Brandon Rotary Club.
Repro Restriction
The McKee Archives is the copyright holder for the Stuckey materials.
Photograph was removed from a photo album. Photograph is ripped.
History / Biographical
According the 1911 Henderson's Brandon City Directory, the Brandon Fire Department - headquartered at Seventh Street and Princess Avenue - had 16 permanent firemen. For equipment the department had one steamer, two chemicals, two hose wagons, one hose reel, one aerial aldder, one hook and ladder wagon, and 10 horses. The city had 34 electric fire alarm boxes and 114 fire hydrants. The pumping station had a capacity of 3.5 million gallons in 24 hours. By 1914, the Brandon Fire Department had 19 permanent employees on its roster and added 2 more horses as well as an 80 horsepower combination motor truck.
Custodial History
Photograph was given to Fred McGuinness by Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard) of Lac du Bonnet, MB.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows two horse-drawn fire wagons in front of the Brandon Fire Station No. 2. One wagon has a hose, the other wagon has an extension ladder.
Notes
Writing on the back of photograph reads: Ed Harden, Driver on the left, 1914, 11th McTavish. This picture is the same as the negative in the Lawrence Stuckey collection. Stuckey obtained a copy of the photo from George Lepard, father of Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard).
Photograph was removed from a photo album. Photograph is creased and has tape residue.
Custodial History
Photograph was given to Fred McGuinness by Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard) of Lac du Bonnet, MB.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the interior of Brandon Fire Hall No. 2. The wagon engines are in the foreground. The firemen stand in the background, holding the bridles of the horses that are standing at the entrances of their stalls. The interior of the hall shows a brick floor and tin ceiling. Stairs lead to a wooden door that is likely the entrance to the living quarters and offices on the second floor.
Notes
Writing on the back of photograph reads: Ed Harden, Driver on the left, 1914, 11th McTavish. This picture is the same as the negative in the Lawrence Stuckey collection. Stuckey obtained a copy of the photo from George Lepard, father of Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard).
The Brandon College Students series is an artificially created collection. It contains the private papers of former Brandon College students.
Scope and Content
The series has been divided into the following sub-series:
MG 2 2.1 Kathleen Emily Kenner
MG 2 2.2 Gerald R. Brown
MG 2 2.3 Saul L. Cohen
MG 2 2.4 Paul McKinnon
MG 2 2.5 Verda McDonald
MG 2 2.6 Frances Percival (nee Fraser)
MG 2 2.7 Raymond R. Bailey
MG 2 2.8 Harold Arthur Kinniburgh
MG 2 2.9 Barbara Cooper
MG 2 2.10 Class of 1953
MG 2 2.11 Elizabeth Kovach
MG 2 2.12 Carole Paintin-Dence
MG 2 2.13 Edward Lloyd Bowler
MG 2 2.14 Rev. Einar Egilsson
MG 2 2.15 George Thorman
MG 2 2.16 Robert Dudley Howland
MG 2 2.17 Charles H. Koester
MG 2 2.18 Robert Harvey
MG 2 2.19 Lawrence Skeoch
MG 2 2.20 Edith Laycock
MG 2 2.21 Marion Stone
MG 2 2.22 Margaret Doran Roberts
MG 2 2.23 Georgina (Hill) Matiation
MG 2 2.24 Class of 1950
MG 2 2.25 Donald Freeman
MG 2 2.26 William Archibald Branton
MG 2 2.27 Adelene Monica Bailey
MG 2 2.28 Lois and Gordon Daly
MG 2 2.29 Marionne Scott
MG 2 2.30 Christine Coltart
MG 2 2.31 Bertha Leith (nee Clark)
MG 2 2.32 Margaret Hawley Speers
MG 2 2.33 Ruth and Archie MacLachlan
MG 2 2.34 Fran Sallows
MG 2 2.35 Clare Coburn
MG 2 2.36 Gordon Lindsay
Photograph was given to Fred McGuinness by Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard) of Lac du Bonnet, MB.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the wooden exterior of Brandon Fire Hall No. 2 before it was covered with a brick veneer. The firemen are standing outside the bay doors which are open and blocked with rope. The hose wagon and ladder wagon are parked inside the building. The harnesses for the horses are suspended from the ceiling.
Notes
Writing on the back of photograph reads: Mrs. Ed Harden. No. 2 Firehall, 600 Block 11th Street, Brandon, Man. This picture is the same as the negative in the Lawrence Stuckey collection. Stuckey obtained a copy of the photo from George Lepard, father of Linda Bilkoski (nee Lepard).
The Board of Governors of Brandon University is a body established by the Brandon University Act (1998), a statute of the Province of Manitoba. The Act vests in the Board the authority for governing Brandon University. The members of the Board of Governors, as trustees, hold the University in trust for the people of the Province of Manitoba. Responsibilities for maintaining this trust include: selection of a president, monitoring his/her performance, providing guidance to the University via its policies, and often delegating authority to the administration.
The Board of Governors is a collective representing the entire community (both internal and external of the University). As a collective, the Board of Governors is responsible for ensuring the financial stability of the institution and for seeing that the overall plans of the institution are consistent with the institution’s philosophy, goals, and financial resources.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of records generated and collected by the Brandon University Board of Governors in the course of perfoming its functions. The fonds is divided into six sub-series, incuding: (1) Documents; (2) Board Executive; (3) General Board agendas, minutes and packages; (4) Correspondence and subject files; (5) Board of Governors' committees; and (6) Board projects.
Notes
The information in the History/Bio field was taken from the Brandon University webpage (http://www.brandonu.ca/Administration/Governors/) on December 2, 2005.
Access Restriction
All files in the series are restricted. Researchers are required to contact the Executive Secretary to the Board of Governors to obtain written permission to access the records. Contact:
204-727-9714
board@brandonu.ca
Photograph shows a view of downtown Brandon from the northeast corner of 10th Street and Princess Avenue. Thunderbird Bowl is in the foreground. Painted advertisements on the sides of buildings include: The Mitrou's Cafe and Tea Room and Brandon Musical Supply Ltd. Vehicles parked on 10th Street are facing north.
Notes
Photograph dated from "Tara's Bulba," the movie playing at the Strand Theatre and similiar vehicles captured in the photograph.
Elphinstone Co-operative Elevator Association Limited Organizational papers: 1927 - 1978 Memorandum of Association and General By-laws, 11 August 1927 Certificate of incorporation, 17 August 1927 Minutes of first general meeting of shareholders, 18 January 1928 Minutes of first permanent Directors' meeting, 18 January 1928 Memorandum of Agreement, By-laws 8, 9, 10 and 11, 12 November 1929 Minutes of the Shareholders' meeting, 25 July 1931 Directors meeting minutes, 25 July 1931 ECEAL By-law no. 12 \& 13, 25 July 1931 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1931 Letter re Supplementary Agreement, 16 November 1933 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 2 February 1933 Letter, 28 June 1944 Agreement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1937 Ageement between Elphinstone CEAL and MPEL, 1 November 1937 ECEAL By-law no. 16, 4 November 1939 Letter re By-law no. 16, 24 March 1941 ECEAL By-law to authorize cancellation of share capital, 2 November 1940 Letter, 24 March 1941 ECEAL By-laws 18, 19, 20 and General By-laws, 15 July 1941 MPE General By-laws, 23 October 1941 ECEAL By-law no. 21, 7 November 1947 Letter re By-law no.21, 27 August 1948 Letter re amendment to General By-laws, 6 May 1949 ECEAL By-law no. 22, 20 June 1949 MPEL By-law amending the general By-laws of the Co., 7 March 1950 Agreement between ECEAL and MPEL, 1 August 1951 ECEAL By-law no. 23, 21 November 1921 MPEL By-law no. 1961-148, 12 October 1961 Directors' resolution, 18 October 1961 Agreement between MPEL and ECEAL, 15 December 1966 ECEAL By-law no. 26, 4 April 1967 Letter re Pioneer Grain Co., 23 February 1978 Minutes of Executive Board meetings, volume 1, 4 February 1928 - volume 7, 13 November 1980 Minutes of Shareholders Annual meetings, 1929 - 1968 (37 reports) Financial records and statistics Statement of surplus, 1937 - 1955 (18 reports) Final statements, 1931 - 1952 (24 reports) Auditors' reports, 1929 - 1967 (26 reports) Analysis of operating results, 1951 - 1963 (11 reports) Detail of grain earnings, 1963 - 1967 (4 reports) Capital loan summary, 31 July 1951 Correspondence, 1929 - 1969 Membership list, 1929 - 1930, 1978 Corporate Name: Rural Municipality of Strathclair
Notes
File numbering is not congruous between sub-series arranged prior to 2009 and sub-series arranged or added to after 2009. This will be corrected in the future