DEANS OF SCIENCE:
D.R. MOIR (1967-1974)
D. Ross Moir obtained his M.Sc. from the University of Manitoba and his Ph.D. from the University of Minnesota. He joined the faculty of Brandon College in the Botany Department in 1966. In 1967, he was appointed as the first Dean of Science of Brandon University. Moir resigned from the Deanship and his position in the Botany Faculty in 1973/74.
J.L. TYMAN (1975)
See MG 3 1.3 (John Tyman fonds) for biographical information on J.L. Tyman.
A.P. MIILLER - acting (1976)
A.P. Miiller was born in 1940 in Lampman, SK. He obtained his B.Sc. (engineering physics) and his M.Sc. (nuclear physics) from the University of Saskatchewan in 1962 and 1964 respectively. He received his Ph.D. (solid state physics) from McMaster University in 1969. Miiller taught in the Physics Department at Brandon Unviersity.
R.A. GILES (1977-1982)
Giles came to Brandon University in 1976, as a Professor of Physics, from Queens University in Belfast, Ireland where he served as Senior Lecturer and Assistant Dean to the Faculty of Science. Giles and his wife had four sons.
P. LETKEMAN (1982-1993/1994)
Peter Letkeman was born on February 12, 1938 in Haskett, Manitoba. He obtained his B.Sc. (Hons) from the University of Manitoba in 1960 and his M.Sc. in 1961 from the same institution. From 1961-1963, Letkeman taught science in Brandon, Manitoba and from 1963-1969, he was a lecturer in the Chemistry Department at Brandon College/University. He received his Ph.D. from the University of Manitoba in 1969, and completed post-doctoral research at the University of California in Riverside (1969). Letkeman was appointed Dean of Science in 1982 (the first year he was Acting Dean), until 1993/94. Following his service as Dean, Letkeman continued to teach in the Chemistry Department until his retirement from Brandon University at the end of February 2003.
He and his wife Mary had two children: Lorne and Myron. At present (January 2006), Peter Letkeman and his wife live in Brandon.
R.F.C. SMITH (1994-1995/1996 and 1998)
Roger F.C. Smith was born in Kapunda, South Australia on March 6, 1940. He attended the University of Adelaide and the University of Alberta, obtaining B.Sc., M.Sc., and Ph.D. degrees in biology. He came to Brandon University in 1973, where he taught in the Zoology Department. Smith was appointed Dean of Science for two short terms. He retired from Brandon University in 2004, and moved to Prince Edward Island.
Smith and his wife Ann had two children, Cameron and Jennifer. Roger F.C. Smith died in Charlottetown, PEI on June 16, 2019.
JANET S. WRIGHT (1999 - September 2005)
Janet Wright was born in Picton, Ontario. She obtained her B.A. Honors (Psychology) from Queen's University in 1977, her M.A. (Learning and Physiological) from the University of Guelph in 1979 and her Ph.D. (Social Psychology) from the University of Manitoba in 1987.
From 1979 to 1985, Wright held a number of teaching positions at the University of Manitoba and the University of Winnipeg. In 1986, she began working at Augustana University College. During her time there, Wright was employed as an Assistant/Associate Professor of Psychology, Chairperson of the Social Sciences Division, Academic Dean and Vice-President for Academic Affairs. Wright came to Brandon University in 1998, where she held the positions of Dean of the Faculty of Science and Associate Professor of Psychology until 2005. From 2005 to 2008, Wright was the Acting Executive Dean, Student & Interantional Affairs/University Registrar at Brandon University. In the fall of 2008, Janet Wright returned to teaching full time in Brandon University's Psychology Department.
AUSTIN GULLIVER (August 1, 2005 to July 31, 2011 - first year as Acting Dean)
Austin F. Gulliver was appointed Dean of Science for a five-year term by the Board of Governors on Febraury 23, 2006. Guilliver has taught at Brandon University since 1985, and was appointed Acting Dean of Science on August 1, 2005. He received his B.Sc. in Mathematics and Physics at the University of Toronto in 1970. His M.Sc. (1971) and Ph.D. (1976) in Astronomy and Astrophysics were also obtained at the University of Toronto. At the time he was named Dean of Science, he was also appointed as Brandon University's Dean of Research.
Scope and Content
There are currently no records in this sub sub series.
Notes
History/Bio information for Robin Giles was taken from the Summer 1981 issue of Alumni News. History/Bio information for Janet Wright was taken from the curriculum vitae she gave to the McKee Archives (May 2008).
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
7.2 Faculty of Science
Photograph is looking northwest probably from the northwest corner of 18th Street and Louise Avenue. The photographer was laying down when s/he took the shot. Photograph shows the field to the south of the Citizens' Science Building, as well as the Citizens' Science Building, part of the Brandon College Building and Clark Hall, and two H-Huts. The photo was taken in summer as the field is full of dandelions.
William Davies, a Baptist meat packer from Toronto, provided money for the construction of the Brandon College Building.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the interior of the Brandon College Chapel. The portraits on the back wall are of William Davies and his wife.
Notes
Negative enclosed.
Related Material
Letters of William Davies: Toronto 1854-1861, edited by William Sherwood Fox, is located in Rare Books (call number CT 310.D3A4). Fox was an Instructor at Brandon College from 1900 to 1909.
View is southwest. Photograph shows Clark Hall, the Brandon College Building, the Citizens' Science Building and the driveway running in front of the buildings. Portions of the front lawn and the Kinsmen Staduim are also visible.
View is northwest from the front lawn. Photograph shows the Citizens' Science Building, an H-Hut, the Brandon College Building, Clark Hall and the original Music Building.
View is south southwest from approximatley the location of the current Health Studies Complex. Photograph shows the large field to the north of Clark Hall, Clark Hall, the Brandon College Building, the Citizens' Science Building and an H-Hut behind Clark Hall.
The podium in the photograph is used during convocation.
Custodial History
Donated by D. Sumner.
Scope and Content
Photograph shows the interior of the Brandon College Chapel, including the podium donated to Brandon College by McMaster University in 1900 and a portrait of Dr. A.P. McDiarmid.
Photograph of Brandon College cheerleaders and spectators. Seated behind the cheerleaders in the white angora hat is Jean Goodwin (faculty memeber). Cheerleaders (L to R): Doreen "Bunny" Fedoruk, Joyce Marie Thordarson (daughter of Professor B. Thordarson), Jerry Jerrett, Val Trent, Dorine Dennison
Portrait of the Brandon College cheerleaders taken in the gymnasium. L to R: Sharon Bailey, Pat Price, Wendy Cory, Georgina Duthie, Bev Boris, Julie Laverty, Sherry Hiscock.
See fonds level of the CKX records for custodial history.
Scope and Content
Image is looking southwest across Brandon College campus. Visible are Clark Hall, the Brandon College Building, the Citizens' Science Building and the A.E. McKenzie Building.