DEANS OF EDUCATION:
JOHN A.B. MCLEISH (1967-1969)
John Alexander Buchanan McLeish was born in Calgary, AB on December 6, 1913. He received his early education in Winnipeg and Montreal, and obtained his B.A. (History Hons.) at McGill University. His M.A. in Education was later obtained from the same institution. In 1951, he graduated from Cornell University's Graduate School of Education with his Ph.D.
From 1935-1949, McLeish served as a high school teacher and principal at Stanstead College, Verdun High School, Danville High School, Valleyfield High School and Three Rivers High School. From 1951-1954, he acted as Assistant Professor of Education at the University of British Columbia. The next ten years he spent at Carlton University as Registrar (and subsequently Director of Summer School) and Research Associate, Professor of Education.
In 1965, McLeish came to Brandon College to serve as Executive Assistant to president John E. Robbins. In his early years at the College, he also acted as Director of Summer School and Extension and in 1967, he was named Dean of Education. McLeish retired from Brandon University ca. 1970.
In 1977, McLeish founded the Ulyssean Society, which is a group of men and women in their middle and later years who meet regularly for lectures and other educational activities to keep their minds active. The Society is located in Toronto. John A.B. McLeish died in 1995.
G.T. RIMMINGTON (1970-1971)
Gerald Thorneycroft Rimmingtong was born on March 18, 1930, in Leicester, England. He obtained a Certificate in Education for the University of Birmingham's Institute of Education in 1951 and a B.Sc. in Economics from the University of London in 1956. He received his M.A. and Ph.D. in Geography from the University of Leicester (1959) and the University of London (1964) respectively. In 1966, he was a fellow of the College of Preceptors and in 1972 he received his M.Ed. from the University of Nottingham. He was granted his Ph.D. in Education from that same institution in 1975. In 1976, Rimmington passed the Anglican ordination examination and was ordained a deacon.
In 1948-1949, Rimmington was a member of the National Service in the Royal Air Force. From 1951-1959, he taught school in Leicester. Following the completion of his first masters degree, Rimmington was a lecturer in geography at Union College in Bunumbu, Sierra Leone (1959-1960) and the District Education Officer, Dedza and Ncheu, Malawi (1961-1963). From 1963-1967, he was employed at Acadia University in Nova Scotia as a member of the Education faculty.
Rimmington came to Brandon University in 1967, where he served as Assoc. Professor and Director of Educational Research from 1967-1969 and Professor of Education from 1969-1973. He also acted as Dean of the Faculty of Education for a one-year term (1970-1971). Following that term he spent a sabbatical year in England. Gerald Rimmington left Brandon University ca. 1973 for a position in the Department of Education at Mount Allison University.
R.R. PIPPERT (1971 - August 31, 1977 and 1987-1988)
Ralph R. Pippert was born on March 23, 1922 in Sheboygan, Wisconsin to Geroge F. and Louise H. Pippert. He received his B.A. from Mission House College in 1944 and his M.S. and Ph.D. from the University of Wisconsin in 1950 and 1959 respectively. From 1944-1954, Pippert was a public school teacher and from 1954-1959, he was a professor at Lakeland College in Plymouth Wisconsin. In the years leading up to his arrival at Brandon University, Pippert was employed at the University of Massachusets (1959-1967), the University of Manitoba (1967-1970) and Southern Illinois University (1970-1971) in various capacities.
Pippert came to Brandon University in 1971 as Dean of Education, a post which he held until 1977. Following his term as Dean, Pippert taught in the Education Department at BU. While Dean, Pippert helped to establish a number of programs, including PENT (Project for Education of Native Teachers); BUNTEP (Brandon University Northern Tacher Education Project); IMPACTE (Indian, Metis Project for Careers in Teacher Education); and the Winnipeg Centre Project. Although Pippert retired in 1988, he continued to teach as a sessional faculty member until 1998. Pippert also instructed teachers for 10 summers in Malawi.
Pippert married Theresa Ann Fydenkevez on June 24, 1967 (previous marriage, 1946). He has three sons, Eric, Rolf and Mark, and two daughters, Christine and Dianne.
Ralph Pippert died on August 31, 2014 in Kiel, Wisconsin.
D.T. HAYES (1978-1988)
Dale T. Hayes was born c.1939 and attended Bob Jones University where he recieved his Bachelor of Arts Degree in 1959. He recieved his M.A. in Education (1968) and from Arizona State University, his Ed.D. in Education in 1975. Prior to his appointment as Dean of Education at Brandon University in July 1978, Hayes held the position of Chairman of the Division of Practical Studies at the University of New Brunswick (1975-1978), and served a Professor of Reading at the University of Maine at Portland-Gorham and as co-ordinator of Learning Assitance Programs at Mt. Royal College in Calgary. He was also involved in developing Native Education programs at the University and college level in Alberta and South Dakota. He was re-appointed as Dean for a second five-year term in 1983. Following his stint as Dean, he returned to the Faculty of Education where he continued to teach until his retirement.
Dale Hayes is married with four children.
ROBIN J. ENNS (1989 - 1993/1994 and 2000-2001(Acting Dean))
Robin Enns completed his elementary and secondary education in Quebec. In 1967, he graduated from United College (which became the University of Winnipeg in 1968) with a B.A. Following a brief period as mechanic for the Red River Ex, Enns began teaching English, History and French at Lake of Two Mountains High School. He graduated with his M.A. in English from the University of New Brunswick in 1971. That same year he also taught English at Ryerson Polytechnical Institute in Toronto. In 1973, he obtained his B.Ed. from the University of Toronto.
From 1973-1975, Enns taught at Brampton Centennial Secondary School, northwest of Toronto. In 1975, he was accepted into the Ph.D. program in Educational Theory at the University of Toronto; he completed his degree in 1983. From 1979-1987, Enns taught at the Faculte des sciences de l'education at the Universite de Moncton. During that time he was appointed Francophone Co-chair for the New Brunswick Commission on Decling Enrolments and Teacher Layoffs (1981-1984), was elected as a school trustee for the Moncton English School District (1983-1986) and developed the first maritime provinces distance education bilingual Master's of Education course set (1986-1988). He also served as president of The Canadian Association for Curriculum Studies.
In 1988, Enns, his wife and children, moved to Brandon where he had been appointed Dean of Education (1988-1993) at Brandon University. During his time as Dean, Enns re-wrote the Master's of Education proposal and successfully shephereded it through the Universities Grans Commission process and was the founding Dean of the Brandon University Hutterite Education program. During the same period he also served as president of the Candian Association of Deans of Education, the Chair of the Manitoba Board of Teacher Education and Certification, Vice Chair of the Manitoba Curriculum Committee and Chair of the Manitoba Task Force on Teacher Supply and Demand. In 1992, Enns was a recipient of the 125th Anniversary of Canada Medal for service to education in Canada.
Since his stint as Dean, Robin Enns has continued to teach in the Faculty of Education at Brandon University and in 1996, he received the Alumni Award for Teaching Exellence.
FREDERICK RENIHAN (1994-1995/1996)
Frederick Renihan was born in Ireland and received his elementary education there, before moving to England, where he went to secondary school. He completed his teacher training in Lond, where he also taught for four years. In 1969, Renihan moved to Saskatchewan, where he was active in all levels of education. While in Saskatchewan, he also obtained his M.Ed. and Ph.D at the University of Saskatchewan.
Prior to coming to Brandon University, Renihan taught at the University of Saskatchewan, the University of Regina, and was a visiting professor at the University of Victoria. Renihan left Brandon University after a short time to take the position of Superintendent of Schools in Surrey, B.C. At present (January 2007), he is a member of the Department of Educational Leadership, Faculty of Education, Simon Fraser University.
GERALD RICHARDS (1996-1997/1998)
Gerald Richards, native to Saskatchewan, was born in Midale. He received his public schooling in a four-room school in Halbrite. Upon graduation in 1960, he attended Saskatchewan Teachers College in Regina. By alternating teaching with attendance at university, he earned a B.Ed (With Distinction) from the University of Saskatchewan in 1967. He returned to that institution, graduating with an M.Ed. in 1969. In 1976, he was awarded a Ph.D. in educational theory from the University of Toronto, where he studied at the Modern Language Centre in the Curriculum Department of the Ontario Institute for Studies in Education. Following the completion of his doctorate, Richards returned to classroom teaching for one year before accepting a joint-appointment to the Faculty of Education and the Faculty of Arts at Brandon University in 1978. He taught an introductory French language course and methods courses for the teaching of French. Upon returning from hissabbatical leave, he was given a full-time appointment in the Faculty of Education.
Richards' background includes language training in French at Laval University in Quebec, and in German from the Goethe Institute in Passau, Germany, and seven years experience in Saskatchewan classrooms where he taught all subjects from grades seven to eleven, although his teaching field was French. During those years, he served as vice-principal and principal of small rural schools and was elected president of the Saskatchewan Teachers' Federation local on two occassions. At Brandon University, he has filled the roles of department chair and member of faculty and university committees, including a long term on the Curriculum and Academic Standards Committee.
With the sudden departure of Dr. Fred Renihan in 1996, Richards was appointed Acting Dean of Education. During his one-year tenure, the faculty completed the revision of its degree program. At present (January 2007), Gerald Richards continues to teach in the Faculty of Education at Brandon University.
RON COMMON (1998 - ca. 2000)
Ronald Common is a Manitoba native, who attended elementary school in Bradwardine before his family moved to Winnipeg. He received his Bachelor of Arts (1969), Education Certificate (1970), Bachelor of Education (1972) and Master of Education (1976) from the University of Manitoba. He obtained his Ph.D in Education from the University of Ottawa in 1980.
Prior to coming to Brandon University, Common was a professor in the Department of Education Administration, Graduate Studies at Brock University, spent a year in Newfoundland and Labrador as the Program Coordinator for Memorial University's Native and Northern education initiative, was an Assistant Professor at Queens University, a curriculum consultant with the province of Manitoba, and an educator and administrator at the secondary school level in The Pas, Norway House and Winnipeg. He left Brandon University after his term as Dean was over.
Common is married to Dr. Lorraine Frost, with whom he has two daughters, Lauren and MacKenzie. At present (January 2007), Ron Common is employed as the Dean of Education, Faculty of Education at Nipissing University in North Bay, Ontario.
TOM B. MACNEILL (ca. 2001- 2004/2005)
No biographical information yet.
JERRY STORIE - (July 1, 2005 - June 2010)
Jerry Thomas Storie received his B.A. from Brandon University in 1972, his M.A. from the University of Manitoba in 1975 and his Teaching Certificate (Secondary Education) from the University of Manitoba in the same year.
From 1972-1974, Storie was a Research Assistant and then a Teaching Assitant in the Faculty of Arts at the University of Manitoba. The following year he was a Policy Analyst in the Planning & Research Branch of the Department of Education, Government of Manitoba. From 1975-1981, he was employed by the Flin Flon School Division, first as a Guidance Counselor (1975-1978) and then as a Classroom Teacher, Grade 6 (1978-1981). From 1981-1994, Storie was a member of the Legislative Assembly for Flin Flon; during this period he held a number of positions and was appointed to numerous Executive Councils. In the decade 1994-2004, Storie was the Area 4 Superintendent, Frontier School Division (1994-1998) and the Superintendent, Turtle Mountain School Division (1998-2004).
On July 1, 2005, the Brandon University Board of Governors appointed Jerry Storie Acting Dean of Education for a three-year term. Jerry Storie left the position of Dean of Education in June 2010.
SAL BADALI (July 1, 2011 - c. 2013)
Sal Badali recieved his B.A. in history from York University, his B.Ed. from the University of Toronto, his M.Ed from teh University of Western Ontario and his Ph.D. from the University of British Columbia.
Prior to his tenure at Brandon University, Badali was employed at the University of Regina (1999-2011) where he taught various education courses, like curriculum development and the theory and practice of instruction, at the undergraduate and graduate levels. He was a faculty advisor and supervised graduate work as well. During his sabbatical leave in 2006, Badali was a guest lecturer at the Ontario Institute for the Studey of Education/University of Toronto.
HEATHER DUNCAN (2013 - present)
Scope and Content
Accession 2-2011 (3 metres, 1977-2005) consists of: Education Faculty Council meeting packages (1999-2004); Dean's Administrative Committee records (1981-1996); Education Faculty Council records, including a list of motions (1980-2001); Faculty of Education committees (1980-2005); Department chairpersons (1991-2005); Faculty of Education Professional Standards Committee (1989-1992); Faculty of Education Research & Development (1989-1995); and the Faculty of Education Advisory Committe (1995-1996).
Also consists of a variety of reports, agreements, planning, assessment, policy and review documents. Topics include: internal and external reviews; international educational projects; Roblin Commission; Smith Commission; Shapiro Report; Scurfield Report; Sherlock Report. There are also records related to: the Master's Degree Steering Committee; implimenting the Bachelor of Education After Degree program; the 4 year integrated Bachelor of Education program; campus recreation; and the Athletic Directorate.
Notes
Biographical information for Dale Hayes was taken from two articles in "The Quill" (Febrary 9, 1978 and February 25, 1983). Biographical information for Gerald Richards was provided by Richards. Biographical information for Badali was taken from a Brandon University press release (February 7, 2011).
Finding Aid
Box level inventory is available for accession 2-2011.
Storage Location
RG 6 Brandon University fonds
Series 7: Faculties and Schools
Related Material
A file of miscellaneous newspaper clippings etc. related to the Faculty of Education assembled by Eileen McFadden for the period 1979-1985, is located in the Institutional Files in the Reading Room.
Arrangement
In May 2011, the Archives made an administrative decision to stop using the existing arrangment for the Faculty of Education records. All Faculty of Education records transferred or donated to the Archives prior to 2011, will retain the old numbering system. All accessions recieved from 2011 onward will be arranged chronologically by accession number.
The old arrangement included records in the following sub sub series: (3) Faculty of Education publications; (4) Interoffice; (5) Brandon University Indian Leadership Development (BUILD); (6) Athletics; and (7) Education special projects.
Marion (Marionne) Louise Scott was born January 13, 1913 at Ste. S, Parkview Block, Brandon, MB to Annie Louisa Lawson and David Henry (Harry) Scott. She attended St. Michael's Academy and Brandon College (Arts, Class of 1933), graduating with a teching certificate. At some point following her graduation she moved to Toronto, living with her Aunt and Uncle Olive and Keith Murphy, while working for Massey Harris. Eventually Marionne became Private Secretary to the president James Duncan. She also worked with E.P. Taylor and Colonel Phillips during her duration with the company.
Marionne met her husband Robert (Roy) Warden Jamieson through friends at the Parkdale Canoe Club, which is now the Boulevard Club on Lakeshore Avenue in Toronto. They were married on December 26, 1944. Following their retirement, Marionne and Roy spent their winters in Florida.
Marionne Scott Jamieson died on July 20, 1990 in Mississauga Ontario. Both she and her husband are buried in Park Lawn Cemetery at Bloor Street and Prince Edward Drive in west Toronto.
A number of the individuals identified in the photographs are members of Marionne's extended family or friends. Basic biographical information for both side of her family are below. Additional biographical information on the Lawson and Scott families is available at the McKee Archives.
Maternal relatives:
William Lawson was born c. 1849 in Markham Township, Ontario where his parents had settled from England. In September 1875 he married Alice Brunskill (born c. 1854) in Buttonville, Ontario. The couple settled on a farm at Aurora, Ontario before come west in 1892. Lawson and his family settled in the Hayfield district south of Brandon where he farmed until c. 1916. During his farming years, Lawson made a number of trips to Scotland and Ireland for the Manitoba government to secure immigrants. After retiring from farming, Lawson became an agent for the Manufaturers' Life Insurance Company. Lawson's brother, Reverend Thomas Lawson, organized the first Methodist congregation in Brandon.
William Lawson and Alice Brunskill had seven children:
William Ernest (married Maragret Louise Conling 23/11/1904 in Souris, MB)
Clarkson Brunskill (married Florence?)
Annie Louisa (married David Henry (Harry) Scott 29/06/1910 in Brandon, MB)
Alice May (married Arthur Ferrier Valens 27/06/1912 in Winnipeg, MB)
Fred J. (married Lottie C. Gibb 18/04/1906 in Selkirk, MB)
Frank Hill (married Cora Ethel Cunningham 11/03/1914 in Oakland)
Olive Gertrude (married William Keith Murphy 25/12/1923 in Brandon, MB)
Paternal relatives:
David Hunter Scott was born in 1851 in Brampton, Ontario. After completing his education he became a telegraph operator and then deputy postmaster for his hometown. In 1873, he moved to Manitoba, settling at Meadow Lea, where he took up a homestead. After fifteen years engaged in farming, Scott moved on to become a representitve for an implement manufacturing company. In 1892, he moved to Brandon to become manager of the Brandon Times newspaper. Four years later he founded D.H. Scott and Son, a real estate and insurance business he operated with his son David Henry until his death in September 1943.
David Hunter Scott married Anne Jane Lipsett (born 1854) of Meadow Lea, MB on May 24, 1876. Together they had ten children:
John Frederick
Robert Wesley
David Henry (Harry) (married Annie Louise Lawson 26/06/1910 in Brandon, MB)
William James
Caroline (married Christopher Russell Heise)
Annie Louise (married Alexander Ferguson (died 1927), married Nettleton Whitby Kerr)
Mary Emaline (married David Gordon Bawtinheimer)
Lillian Georgina (died August 9, 1931)
Josiah Aikens (died during World War I)
Reginald Jacob (married Norma May Hughes 16/08/1915 (Reginald died during World War I))
Custodial History
The photograph album and graduate's book were sent to Alumni Relations by Ruth L. Murphy on March 31, 2004. Both items had been in the possession of Marionne Scott, passing to her husband Robert Jamieson upon her death. When Jamieson died the items came into the possession of Ruth Murphy, whose husband was Marionne's first cousin. Carla Eisler, Alumni Relations, transfered the photograph album to the Archives on January 15, 2008, and the graduate book on January 8, 2009.
Scope and Content
Fonds consists of a photograph album created by Marionne Scott. The majority of the photographs cover the period 1926-1933, and are of family members, friends, and classmates at both St. Michael's Academy and Brandon College. They were taken in Brandon and at a number of other locations that Marionne visited. There are three loose photographs, taken by R.M. Coleman, that were taken at the wedding of Vivian Eva? and Reginald Stanley Stark, June 7th, 1941 at St. Matthews Cathedral and the Prince Edward Hotel.
The graduate's book consists of notes, signatures, newsclippings, photographs, programs, convocation documents, graduation cards, reunion descriptions and the 1932 general information booklet for Brandon College.
Notes
History/Bio information taken from the Brandon Daily Sun, the 1901 and 1911 Canadian Census, the Manitoba Vital Statistics website, and the Brandon Cemetery website. Additional biographical information provided by Ruth Murphy. Description by Christy Henry.
The original photograph remains in the custody of the donor, who scanned the digital copy and sent it to the McKee Archives in 2014. The donor's paternal grandmother graduated from Brandon Normal School in the Spring of 1912.
Scope and Content
Portrait of the students of Brandon Normal School Spring 1912 class.
Composite portrait of the Brandon Normal School Fall Term 1917 class. B.J. Hales, Principal, W. Beer, Vice-Principal, M. Reid, Asst. Teacher, M. Yeomans, Drill Instructor.
Composite portrait of the Wheat City Business College class, 1920. F.A. Wood, Principal, Instructors: Mr. D.S. Forsyth; Miss. J. H. Snider; Miss. M.D. Cowan; Miss. I.E. McKewer.
Some warping. Small hole in background on middle left
Custodial History
Photo was donated to the McKee Archives by Bernice La Buick in 2012. She bought it that summer at a yard sale as part of a box of miscellaneous items.
Scope and Content
Composite portrait of the Brandon Collegiate 3B class of 1920.
Top Row (L to R): M. Harris; Daisy Patmore; H. Warren, Secretary Treasurer; R. McDorman; M. Abey; K. Cantelon
Second Row (L to R): R. Baldwin; D. McDougall, Principal; J. Gibson
Third Row (L to R): C. Anderson; M. Muller; G. Coristine, Class President; E. Grentham; M. Dorrett; A. Hepinstall
Fourth Row (L to R): M. Skene; M. Davidson; F. Merrell; V. Fielding
Fifth Row (L to R): E. Dorrett; L. Mummery; F. Adolph; M. Maxwell; H. White; E. Kennedy
Sixth Row (L to R): I. Powell; M. Price; F. Green; E. Chalmers
Bottom Row (L to R): J. Mazer; H. Waluk; L. Harper; Miss MacMorine, Class Teacher; Marjorie McKenzie; J. Campell; J. Bolton
Photograph has two small tears and one corner has been bent.
Custodial History
Photograph was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1997. Prior custodial history is unknown. The photograph may have belonged to Mary Kathleen Hollies as the initials M.K.H. are written on the back of the photo.
Scope and Content
Portrait of the students of Brandon Collegiate Institute (BCI) Form IV class.
Notes
"Dum Vivimus Viscamus" is written on the back of the photo in pencil.