Photograph has two small tears and one corner has been bent.
Custodial History
Photograph was accessioned by the McKee Archives in 1997. Prior custodial history is unknown. The photograph may have belonged to Mary Kathleen Hollies as the initials M.K.H. are written on the back of the photo.
Scope and Content
Portrait of the students of Brandon Collegiate Institute (BCI) Form IV class.
Notes
"Dum Vivimus Viscamus" is written on the back of the photo in pencil.
Built in 1991-1992 for $1.4 million, the official opening of the Centre was May 29, 1992. The centre is currently (April 2010) called the Addictions Foundation of Manitoba, Parkwood Centre.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Alcoholism Foundation of Manitoba (AFM), Parkwood Treatment Centre located on Victoria Avenue East.
Built in 1991-1992 for $1.4 million, the official opening of the Centre was May 29, 1992. The centre is currently (April 2010) called the Addictions Foundation of Manitoba, Parkwood Centre.
Custodial History
For custodial history see the collection level description of the Lawrence Stuckey collection.
Scope and Content
Alcoholism Foundation of Manitoba (AFM), Parkwood Treatment Centre.
Pool Insurance Limited was created in 1939 and re-incorporated at Pool Insurance Company in 1940. It was designed to internalize some of the insurance risk of MPE, which had previously been carried by an extenal company.
Co-operative Life Insurance Company was formed in 1945 to offer pool members affordable life insurance tailored to their lives as producers.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of documents and minutes.
This box contains minutes generated by local MPE associations, collected by the central office. Records include the following:
79a. Cromer 1978-1980
79b. Cromer 1977-1978
80a. Dauphin 1977-1978
80b. Dunrea 1977-1980
81a. Gladstone March 1 1979 – Nov 24 1980
81b. Gladstone Feb 2 1977 – Jan 17 1979
82. Edwin Jan 10 1977 – March 3 1981
83a. Isabella Feb 4 1977 – August 28 1980
83b. Lauder April 20 1979 – Nov 13 1980
84. Lyleton Dec 13 1977 – Nov 24 1978
85a. Jordan April 2 1979 – Dec 11 1980
85b. Jordan Jan 31 1977 – Feb 26 1979
86. Moore Park Jan 4 1977 – April 11 1979
87a. Napinka Jan 17 1977 – Nov 14 1980
87b. Nesbitt Feb 8 1979 – Nov 27 1980
87c. Nesbitt Jan 6 1977 – Dec 18 1978
87d. Ninga Feb 16 1977 – July 28 1980
88a. Pierson Dec 20 1978 – Nov 26 1980
88b. Pierson Jan 20 1977 – Dec 20 1978
89a. Souris Jan 10 1975 – Nov 30 1976
89b. Sperling May 8 1978 – Dec 10 1980
89c. Sperling March 21 1977 – Jan 31 1979
90. Tilston June 9 1977 – Nov 16 1978
91. Waskada Jan 10 1977 – Dec 12 1980
92. Bradwardine Feb 11 1981 – Nov 16 1981
93. Cromer Jan 13 1981 – Nov 27 1981
94a. Dunrea Sept 23 1985 – Nov 27 1989
94b. Dunrea March 24 1981 – Feb 14 1985
95a. Beresford July 31 1986 – Nov 14 1986
95b. Beresford Jan 13 1981 – April 3 1986
96a. Gladstone Nov 19 1986 – Nov 28 1989
96b. Gladstone Nov 3 1983 – Oct 11 1986
96c. Gladstone Jan 23 1981 – Jan 4 1984
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph was donated to the Archives in February 2007 by Robert McDonald, who is the nephew of Catherine McDonald, who is pictured in the photograph. Robert McDonald inherited the photograph from his aunt after her death.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the 1908-1909 class at the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
Wheat City Business College was established in 1904, when J.W. Beveridge and F.E. Werry resigned from the Commercial Department of Brandon College to establish the Wheat City Business College. It was located originally in the Commercial Building on 10th Street, owned by Hughes and Co. Wheat City Business College continued to operate until the later 1960s.
Custodial History
The photograph as donated to the McKee Archives by alumni of the Wheat City Business College sometime before 1997.
Scope and Content
Portraits of the students and staff of the Wheat City Business College.
Photo was donated to the McKee Archives by Thelma Fisher in May 2015.
Scope and Content
Composite portrait of the Brandon Normal School class of 1940.
Top Row (L to R): H. Hannah; W. Coulthard; E. Holditch; H. tennant; F. Williams; J. Pettifpher; H. Peterson; A. Embury; I. Campbell; J. Hainsworth; I. Vig; M. Townson
Second Row (L to R): L. Thornton; W. Lochhead; M. Ardron; D. Archibald; Miss M.A. Yeomans, Physical Culture; Mr. C. Moore, Principal; K. Watson; J.S. Caldwell; S. Bradley; J. Christie
Third Row (L to R): M. Witt; H. Mikkelsen; O. Scott; M. Scharff; D. Duncan; Miss B.A. Pilling, Primary Art; I. Duchesneau; E. Hawson; M. Simpson; D. Strath; B. Wiggins
Fourth Row (L to R): E. Henderson; C. Smithson; M. Nelin; J. Campbell; M. Young; V. Brown; G. Wenman; I. Turcotte
Fifth Row (L to R): E. Sommerville; M. Reid; I. Henderson; M. Lychacz; E. Duncan; M. Taylor; J. McPhail; D. Irwin; T.V. Cole; J. Regner; M. Skuce; P. Osman
Bottom Row (L to R): G. Pue; A. Berkhold; D. Pue; B. McLean; E. Nash; J. McFarland; J. Bonner; D. Cousins; E. Pratt; N. Boake; K. Middleton; I. Goldie
Fair. Matting has various pieces missing, tears and stains. Large stain encroaches on the top of the image. Other small stains around the edges for the most part.
Custodial History
Photo was donated to the McKee Archives by Audrey and Duncan Wadell in 2011.
Scope and Content
Composite portrait of the Brandon Normal School class of 1903.
Border Fertilizers Ltd was a parnership agreement between the Pool and M.G. Smerchanski to provide better fertilizer services to Pool members. MPE entered the agreement in 1963 but sold their shares in 1969 due to heavy losses.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of legal documents, financial statements, proposals and reports.
Co-enerco was a co-operative energy company that resulted from the Co-operative Resources Project.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
This sub-series consists of records pertaining to the formation of Co-enerco.
Manitoba Pool Elevators was a part of and associated with many other producer co-operatives in Manitoba.
See also fonds level description of RG 4 for history/bio of MPE
Scope and Content
.This sub-series consists of records from the following co-operative organizations: Canadian Poultry Pool Ltd, Canadian Poutry Sales, Manitoba Co-operative Poultry Marketing Association, Manitoba Dairy and Poultry Co-operative Ltd, The Co-operative Promotion Board, Manitoba Fish Products, Pool Co-operative Seed Association, XCAN Grain Pool
Records for the above organizations may include but do not necessarily include the following: financial records, minutes, correpondence, reports, addresses, and memoranda.
Notes
Description by Jillian Sutherland (2010)
Original order in this sub-series was rearranged by Eileen McFadden. The order established by her has been left intact.
This box contains bound volumes of audited financial statements for local MPE associations. The records include the following:
Local Association Financial Statements 1949-50 For-Men; 1949-50 Men-Woo; 1950-51 A-Fan; 1950-51 For-Men; 1950-51 Men-Woo
Photograph shows members of the Brandon University Foundation during a tour of the construction site. Members include: Scott Stewart, Doug Adams, Sheri Decter-Hirst.
Thomas Hector MacDonald McLeod (Tommy) was born in Weyburn, Saskatchewan in August 1918. During his youth in Weyburn, McLeod was a member of Tommy Douglas' Baptist congretation; it was Douglas who encouraged McLeod to attend Brandon College. McLeod attended Brandon College from 1937 to 1940. While there, he received scholarships in Bible, Economics, and General Efficiency, as well as receiving the Medal in Sociology during his final year. Following graduation in 1940, McLeod studied economics at the University of Indiana, receiving his M.A. in 1941. Later that year he returned to Brandon College to teach economics and sociology. From 1941 until 1944, he also acted as the Resident Master. He remained at Brandon College for three years. McLeod married Beryl (Pentland) Thompson c. 1943 and together they had five children: Beth, Ellen, Ian, Brian and Morna.
Following the election of Tommy Douglas as Premier of Saskatchewan, McLeod was employed in a variety of senior positions in the Saskatchewan civil service. In 1952, McLeod was named the Dean of Commerce at the University of Saskatchewan, Regina Campus.
In 1961, he served as the Chief Consultant (Ford Foundation) to the Turkish Government. In 1962, McLeod was the supervisor of an eight man team advising the Iranian government on Economic Planning Activities. He has also served as a Special Advisor in Public Administration and Higher Education for the Canadian Development Agency.
In 1963, he became the chairman of the Saskatchewan Royal Commission on Taxation. McLeod accepted the position of Dean of the College of Arts and Science, Regina Campus at the University of Saskatchewan on May 15, 1964. In May 1965, he became Vice-Principal of the University of Saskatchewan, Regina Campus.
McLeod had a Ph.D. in Government and Economics from Harvard. As well, he was a past recipient of the Vanier Medal (1971) for outstanding contribution to public administration in Canada. In 1987, McLeod wrote a book entitled "Tommy Douglas: the Road to Jerusalem." Also in 1987, McLeod was awarded an honorary degree from Brandon University. In 2003, McLeod was awarded the Order of Canada.
Thomas Hector MacDonald McLeod died on January 1, 2008 in Victoria, BC.
Custodial History
McLeod donated a copy of the paper, subsequently published in Manitoba History, to the McKee Archives c. 1995.
Scope and Content
Thomas McLeod’s records consist of a paper written in 1995, entitled "S.J. McKee of Brandon College: A Biographical Note on a Man and an Institution." This paper is a brief history of Brandon College and S.J. McKee’s role in the formation of it. Beginning with the foundation of the short-lived Canada Baptist College, as well as the foundation of the Canadian Literary Institute, McLeod traces the history of Baptists and higher education. The paper is a fairly good guide to researchers wanting to know a bit of the background behind Brandon College. The bibliography in the back also gives researchers several ideas on where to look for additional information.
Notes
Obituary is in the January 5, 2008 Globe and Mail. H. Clare Pentland and Tommy McLeod studied economics together at Brandon College under W.T. Easterbrook, who later taught at the University of Toronto.
MG 1 Brandon College Teaching and Administration
1.6 Thomas Hector McLeod
Related Material
W. T. Easterbrook, “Clare Pentland-Brandon College, 1937-1940,” Canadian Journal of Political and Social Theory, vol. 3, no. 2 (Spring-Summer 1979), p. 101.